Matheson v. Intel Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Linda Matheson
Defendant: Robert H. Swan, George S. Davis and Intel Corporation
Case Number: 5:2020cv05780
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Referring Judge: Edward J Davila
2 Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO CLOSE MEMBER CASES. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/17/2020. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2020)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING (16) STIPULATION IN CASE 5:20-cv-05194-EJD CONSOLIDATING RELATED ACTIONS AND VACATING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/16/2020. Associated Cases: 5:20-cv-05194-EJD, 5:20-cv-05549-EJD, 5:20-cv-05780-EJD(ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
September 10, 2020 Filing 13 Certificate of Interested Entities by George S. Davis, Intel Corporation, Robert H. Swan (Dell Angelo, Robert) (Filed on 9/10/2020)
September 10, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory P. Stone Robert L. Dell Angelo and John M. Gildersleeve (Stone, Gregory) (Filed on 9/10/2020)
September 9, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINTS (CIVIL LOCAL RULE 6-1) filed by George S. Davis, Intel Corporation, Robert H. Swan. (Dell Angelo, Robert) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 2, 2020 Filing 10 (Text Only) CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/29/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/5/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Hon. Edward J. Davila. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Edward J. Davilafor all further proceedings re #8 Order Relating Cases. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Judge William Alsup no longer assigned to case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RELATING CASE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/2/2020. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to George S. Davis, Intel Corporation, Robert H. Swan. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 6 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER SEC CLASS ACTION Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. SEC Class Action Notice due by 9/8/2020. Case Management Statement due by 11/12/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2020 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge William Alsup. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Linda Matheson (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Linda Matheson . (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Violations of the Federal Securities Laws against George S. Davis, Intel Corporation, Robert H. Swan ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14823880.). Filed byLinda Matheson. (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 8/17/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matheson v. Intel Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert H. Swan
Represented By: Robert Leo Dell Angelo
Represented By: Gregory P. Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George S. Davis
Represented By: Robert Leo Dell Angelo
Represented By: Gregory P. Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intel Corporation
Represented By: Robert Leo Dell Angelo
Represented By: Gregory P. Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Matheson
Represented By: Shawn A. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?