National Urban League et al v. Ross et al
Plaintiff: City of Los Angeles, California, League of Women Voters, Adrian Garcia, King County, Washington, National Urban League, Harris County, Texas, City of San Jose, California, Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Salinas, California, Rodney Ellis, Navajo Nation, County of Los Angeles, California, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, City of Chicago, Illinois and Gila River Indian Community
Defendant: U.S. Census Bureau, Wilbur L. Ross, Steven Dillingham, U.S. Department of Commerce, Wynn Coggins, Dr. Ron Jarmin and Gina Raimondo
Petitioner: State of Louisiana and State of Mississippi
Amicus Curiae: Lush Cosmetics LLC, Zendesk Inc., State of New York, Postmates Inc., Cummins Inc., Levi Strauss & Co., Mara Hoffman Inc., Minneapolis Regional Chamber of Commerce, General Assembly Space, Inc., Univision Communications Inc., LivHOME, Inc., Knotel, Inc., County of Santa Clara and Workplace Options, LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv05799
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Lucy H Koh
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 490 ORDER of USCA as to #210 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit, filed by U.S. Census Bureau, Wilbur L. Ross, U.S. Department of Commerce, Steven Dillingham. Appellants unopposed motion for voluntary dismissal of this appeal is granted. This appeal is dismissed. See Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). All pending motions are denied as moot. This order served on the district court shall act as and for the mandate of this court. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2021)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 489 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #488 Stipulation of Dismissal.(lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2021)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 488 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Stipulated Order Regarding Dismissal) filed by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 4/22/2021)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 487 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 4/22/2021)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 486 NOTICE of Change of Address by Lily E. Hough (Hough, Lily) (Filed on 4/19/2021)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 485 Per #484 Order, the Further Case Management Conference is CONTINUED from April 16, 2021 to April 23, 2021 at 10:00 AM. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lhk General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconferen ce are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2021)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 484 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part #483 Stipulation to Stay Proceedings and Continue Case Management Conference. (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2021)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 483 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 4/15/2021)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 482 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 4/15/2021)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 481 Per #480 Order, the Further Case Management Conference is CONTINUED from April 2, 2021 to April 16, 2021 at 10:00 AM. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lhk General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconferen ce are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2021)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 480 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part #478 Stipulation.(lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2021)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 479 CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING START TIME OF APRIL 2, 2021 FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The April 2, 2021 Further Case Management Conference remains as set, but the start time is continued from 10:00 AM to 2:00 PM. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lhk General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no docume nt associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2021)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 478 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 4/1/2021)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 477 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 4/1/2021)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 476 Per #475 Order, the Further Case Management Conference is CONTINUED from March 19, 2021 to April 2, 2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Lucy H. Koh. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lhk General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by te lephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2021)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 475 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting #474 Stipulation Staying Proceedings and Continuing Case Management Conference. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2021)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 474 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 3/17/2021)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 473 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 3/17/2021)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 472 Per #471 Order, the Further Case Management Conference set for February 26, 2021 is CONTINUED to Friday, March 19, 2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Lucy H. Koh. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lhk General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceed ings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2021)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 471 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting #470 Stipulation to Stay Case Until March 19, 2021 and to Continue the Case Management Conference. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2021)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 470 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 2/24/2021)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 469 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 2/24/2021)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 468 Per #467 Order, the Further Case Management Conference set for February 5, 2021 is CONTINUED to Friday, February 26, 2021 at 10:00 AM. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lhk General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (Related documents(s) #467 ) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2021)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 467 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting #466 Stipulation to Stay Case Until February 26, 2021 and to Continue Case Management Conference. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2021)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 466 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of San Jose, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 2/3/2021)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 465 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of San Jose, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 2/3/2021)
January 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 464 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting #463 Stipulation Regarding Stay of Further Proceedings on Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2021)
January 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 463 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Stay of Further Proceedings on Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel filed by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 1/30/2021)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 462 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion to Compel; DEFERRING Ruling on Sanctions. Re: ECF #433 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2021)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 461 NOTICE by Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce of Executive Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Executive Order)(Avallone, Zachary) (Filed on 1/21/2021)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 460 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary Anthony Avallone on behalf of Defendants (Avallone, Zachary) (Filed on 1/21/2021)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 459 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by John V Coghlan (Coghlan, John) (Filed on 1/19/2021)
January 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 458 Transcript of Proceedings held on 1-15-21, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge, e-mail: lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #453 Transcript Order, ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/19/2021. (Related documents(s) #453 ) (lasS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2021)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 457 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lucy H. Koh: Further Case Management Conference held on 1/15/2021 from 12:05 PM - 1:01 PM (56 minutes). Further Case Management Conference SET for Friday, February 5, 2021 at 10:00 AM. A Joint Case Management Statement is due February 3, 2021. Total Time in Court: 56 minutes. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. Attorneys for Plaintiffs National Urban League; League of Women Voters; Black Alliance for Just Immigration; Harris County, Texas; King County, Washington; City of San Jose, California; Rodney Ellis; Adrian Garcia; and NAACP: Sadik Huseny, Melissa Arbus Sherry, and Anne Robinson.Attorneys for above Plaintiffs and Navajo Nation: Ezra Rosenberg and Thomas Wolf. Attorney for Plaintiff Navajo Nation: Jason Searle.Attorney for Plaintiff City of Los Angeles: Danielle Goldstein.Attorney for Plaintiff County of Los Angeles: David Holtzman. Attorney for Plaintiff City of Salinas: Michael Mutalipassi.Attorney for Plaintiff City of Chicago: Rebecca Hirsch.Attorney for Plaintiff Gila River Indian Community: Merrill Godfrey.Attorneys for Defendants: Elliott Davis, Diane Kelleher, Brad Rosenberg, and Alexander Sverdlov. For transcript orders, please visit https://cand.uscourts.gov/transcripts. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/15/2021)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 456 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting #455 Stipulation Regarding Census and Population Counts and 21-Day Stay of Proceedings. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2021)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 455 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Census and Population Counts and 21-Day Stay of Proceeding filed by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brad P. Rosenberg)(Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 1/15/2021)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 454 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 1/15/2021 before Judge Lucy H. Koh by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of San Jose, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Lankenau, Shannon) (Filed on 1/15/2021)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 453 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on January 15, 2021 before Judge Lucy H. Koh by Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce, for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Ehrlich, Stephen) (Filed on 1/15/2021)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 452 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 1/15/2021)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 451 RESPONSE re #444 Order by Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Diane Kelleher)(Zee, Michael) (Filed on 1/14/2021)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 450 RESPONSE re #444 Order by U.S. Department of Commerce. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kathleen Styles, #2 Attachment to Declaration)(Sverdlov, Alexander) (Filed on 1/14/2021)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 449 Transcript of Proceedings held on 1-11-21, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge, e-mail: lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #442 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/13/2021. (Related documents(s) #442 ) (lasS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2021)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 448 RESPONSE re #444 Order by Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Megan Heller, #2 Declaration of Diane Kelleher)(Zee, Michael) (Filed on 1/12/2021)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 447 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #413 MOTION to Convene a Three-Judge Court ) filed byBlack Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 1/12/2021)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 446 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING JANUARY 15, 2021 FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Per #444 Case Management Order, a Further Case Management Conference is SET for Friday, January 15, 2021 at 12:00 PM before Judge Lucy H. Koh. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lhk General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document as sociated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2021)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 445 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lucy H. Koh: Further Case Management Conference held on 1/11/2021 from 3:07 PM - 4:38 PM (1 hour, 31 minutes). #444 Case Management Order memorializes all relevant information, deadlines, and rulings from the Conference. Total Time in Court: 1 hour, 31 minutes. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. Attorneys for Plaintiffs National Urban League; League of Women Voters; Black Alliance for Just Immigration; Harris County, Texas; King County, Washington; City of San Jose, California; Rodney Ellis; Adrian Garcia; and NAACP: Sadik Huseny, Melissa Arbus Sherry, Anne Robinson, and Steven Bauer. Attorneys for above Plaintiffs and Navajo Nation: Ajay Saini and Thomas Wolf. Attorney for Plaintiff Navajo Nation: Jason Searle. Attorney for Plaintiff City of Los Angeles: Danielle Goldstein. Attorney for Plaintiff County of Los Angeles: David Holtzman. Attorney for Plaintiff City of Salinas: Michael Mutalipassi. Attorney for Plaintiff City of Chicago: Rebecca Hirsch. Attorney for Plaintiff Gila River Indian Community: Merrill Godfrey. Attorneys for Defendants: John Coghlan, Diane Kelleher, Brad Rosenberg, and Alexander Sverdlov. For transcript orders, please visit https://cand.uscourts.gov/transcripts. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/11/2021)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 444 Case Management Order. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 1/11/2021. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2021)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 443 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 1/11/2021 before Judge Lucy H. Koh by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of San Jose, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Lankenau, Shannon) (Filed on 1/11/2021)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 442 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 1/11/2021 before Judge Lucy H. Koh by Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce, for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Ehrlich, Stephen) (Filed on 1/11/2021)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 441 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 1/11/2021)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 440 Order re: Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion to Compel and for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 1/8/2021. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2021)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 439 Declaration of Amit Makker in Support of #438 Reply to Opposition/Response,, filed by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Rodney Ellis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5)(Related document(s) #438 ) (Makker, Amit) (Filed on 1/8/2021) Modified on 1/8/2021 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 438 REPLY (re #433 MOTION to Compel (Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion to Compel and for Sanctions) ) filed byBlack Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 1/8/2021)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 437 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #433 MOTION to Compel (Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion to Compel and for Sanctions) ) filed bySteven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Abowd, #2 Declaration of D. Stempowski, #3 Exhibit A - A. Makker email)(Davis, Elliott) (Filed on 1/7/2021)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 436 NOTICE of Appearance by Elliott M. Davis (Davis, Elliott) (Filed on 1/7/2021)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 435 RESPONSE re #428 Order After Audit of Withheld Documents by Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian DiGiacomo)(Zee, Michael) (Filed on 1/6/2021)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 434 Transcript of Proceedings held on 1-4-21, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge, e-mail: lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #431 Transcript Order, ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/6/2021. (Related documents(s) #431 ) (lasS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2021)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 433 MOTION to Compel (Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion to Compel and for Sanctions) filed by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. Responses due by 1/7/2021. Replies due by 1/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amit Makker, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 1/5/2021)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 432 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 1/4/2021 before Judge Lucy H. Koh by Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce, for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Ehrlich, Stephen) (Filed on 1/5/2021)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 431 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 1/4/2021 before Judge Lucy H. Koh by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of San Jose, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Lankenau, Shannon) (Filed on 1/5/2021)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 430 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING JANUARY 11, 2021 FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Per #427 Case Management Order, a Further Case Management Conference is SET for Monday, January 11, 2021 at 3:00 PM before Judge Lucy H. Koh. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lhk General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document as sociated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2021)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 429 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lucy H. Koh: Further Case Management Conference held on 1/4/2021 from 2:32 PM - 3:13 PM (41 minutes). #427 Case Management Order memorializes all relevant information, deadlines, and rulings from the Conference. Total Time in Court: 41 minutes. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. Attorneys for Plaintiffs National Urban League; League of Women Voters; Black Alliance for Just Immigration; Harris County, Texas; King County, Washington; City of San Jose, California; Rodney Ellis; Adrian Garcia; and NAACP: Sadik Huseny, Melissa Arbus Sherry, and Anne Robinson. Attorneys for above Plaintiffs and Navajo Nation: Ezra Rosenberg and Thomas Wolf. Attorney for Plaintiff Navajo Nation: Jason Searle. Attorney for Plaintiff City of Los Angeles: Michael Dundas. Attorney for Plaintiff County of Los Angeles: David Holtzman. Attorney for Plaintiff City of Salinas: Michael Mutalipassi. Attorney for Plaintiff City of Chicago: Rebecca Hirsch. Attorney for Plaintiff Gila River Indian Community: Merrill Godfrey. Attorneys for Defendants: John Coghlan, Diane Kelleher, Brad Rosenberg, and Alexander Sverdlov. For transcript orders, please visit https://cand.uscourts.gov/transcripts. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/4/2021)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 428 ORDER After Audit of 2,268 Documents Withheld by Defendants (Cousins, Nathanael) (Filed on 1/4/2021)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 427 Case Management Order. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 1/4/2021. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2021)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 426 CLERK'S NOTICE CHANGING START TIME OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO 2:30 PM. The January 4, 2021 Further Case Management Conference remains as set, but the start time is CONTINUED by 30 minutes to 2:30 PM. This proceeding will still be held via a Zoom webinar, and the access information remains the same:Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lhk General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2021)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 425 RESPONSE re #423 Order for Defendants to Check Certain Materials by Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - DOC_0024808)(Zee, Michael) (Filed on 1/4/2021)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 424 STATUS REPORT (Joint Discovery Status Report) by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 1/4/2021)
January 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 423 ORDER Requesting Additional Information From Defendants About Materials Submitted For In Camera Audit (Cousins, Nathanael) (Filed on 1/3/2021)
January 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 422 NOTICE by Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce re #421 Order Notice of Ongoing Efforts Related to ECF No. 421 (Zee, Michael) (Filed on 1/3/2021)
December 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 421 Order Granting Plaintiffs' Request in #419 December 31, 2020 Status Update. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/31/2020. (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/31/2020)
December 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 420 ORDER as to Audit Procedures as to 2,477 Withheld Documents (Cousins, Nathanael) (Filed on 12/31/2020)
December 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 419 STATUS REPORT (Status Update on #416 Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiffs' Requests for Relief in December 29, 2020 Joint Status Report) by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 12/31/2020)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 418 ANSWER to Amended Complaint bySteven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce. (Zee, Michael) (Filed on 12/30/2020)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 417 STATUS REPORT by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 12/30/2020)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 416 Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiffs' Requests for Relief in December 29, 2020 Joint Status Report. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/29/2020. (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2020)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 415 STATUS REPORT (Plaintiffs' Addendum to Joint Status Report on Defendants' Motion for Partial Relief from Non-Dispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judges [Dkts. 409, 411, 414]) by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 12/29/2020)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 414 STATUS REPORT (Joint Status Report on #408 Defendants Motion For Partial Relief From #407 Non-Dispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judges) by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 12/29/2020)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 413 MOTION to Convene a Three-Judge Court filed by Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce. Motion Hearing set for 1/28/2021 01:30 PM before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 1/12/2021. Replies due by 1/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ehrlich, Stephen) (Filed on 12/29/2020)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 412 Pursuant to #411 Order, the Further Case Management Conference is CONTINUED from December 28, 2020 to January 4, 2021 at 2:00 PM before Judge Lucy H. Koh. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lhk General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedin gs held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 411 Order Continuing Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/28/2020. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 410 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #408 MOTION Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judges re #407 Order ) (re #409 Order) filed byBlack Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 409 Order re: Response to Defendants' Motion for Partial Relief from Non-Dispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judges. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/26/2020. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2020)
December 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 408 MOTION Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judges re #407 Order filed by Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce. Responses due by 1/11/2021. Replies due by 1/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian DiGiacomo, #2 Proposed Order)(Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 12/26/2020)
December 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 407 ORDER After Review of December 21 Privilege Log and In Camera Documents (Cousins, Nathanael) (Filed on 12/24/2020)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 406 NOTICE by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People re #404 Response ( Non Motion ),, (Plaintiffs' Notice of Clarification to Plaintiffs' Privilege Objections to December 21 Log and Related Disputes Dkt. 404]) (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 12/23/2020)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 405 NOTICEOF CORRECT EXHIBIT by Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Megan Heller)(Robinson, John) (Filed on 12/23/2020) Modified text on 12/24/2020 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 404 RESPONSE (Plaintiffs' Privilege Objections to December 21 Log [Dkt. 383]) by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 12/23/2020)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 403 RESPONSE to Plaintiffs' Privilege Objections by Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Robinson, John) (Filed on 12/23/2020)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 402 STATUS REPORT (Joint Discovery Status Report [Dkt. 396]) by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 12/22/2020)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 401 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying Defendants' #354 Motion to Dismiss and #355 Motion for Stay of Proceedings. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2020)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 400 RESPONSE (Plaintiffs' Response to Order to Show Cause [Dkt. 392]) by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 12/18/2020)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 399 ORDER denying without prejudice Dkt. No. 388, proposed clawback order. (Cousins, Nathanael) (Filed on 12/18/2020)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 398 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce . (Zee, Michael) (Filed on 12/18/2020)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 397 Pursuant to #396 Order, the Further Case Management Conference is CONTINUED from December 18, 2020 to December 29, 2020 at 2:00 PM before Judge Lucy H. Koh. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lhk General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedi ngs held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2020)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 396 Order Continuing Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/18/2020. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2020)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 395 NOTICE of Appearance by John Robinson on behalf of Defendants (Robinson, John) (Filed on 12/18/2020)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 394 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 12/18/2020)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 393 RESPONSE (Plaintiffs' Opposition to Request for Rule 502(d) Order [Dkt. 388]) by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 12/17/2020)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 392 ORDER to Defendants to Show Cause Re: Privilege Waiver for Failure to Provide Privilege Log (Cousins, Nathanael) (Filed on 12/17/2020)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 391 CLERK'S NOTICE RE: Dkt. #388 Response re 383 Order Request for Rule 502(d) Order. Plaintiffs must file response to Dkt. #388 by 07:00 PM tonight. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2020)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 390 RESPONSE re #389 Statement,, re: Privilege Logs by Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce. (Zee, Michael) (Filed on 12/17/2020)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 389 Statement (Plaintiffs' Statement re: Privilege Logs [Dkt. 383]) by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 12/17/2020)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 388 RESPONSE re #383 Order Request for Rule 502(d) Order by Wilbur L. Ross, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Redline of Clawback Agreement, #2 Proposed Order)(Ehrlich, Stephen) (Filed on 12/17/2020)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 387 ORDER DENYING Defendants' Emergency Motion for Protective Order. Re: ECF #384 . Signed by Magistrate Judges Nathanael Cousins, Susan van Keulen, and Thomas S. Hixson. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2020)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 386 RESPONSE (Plaintiffs' Response to Emergency Motion for a Protective Order [Dkt. 384]) by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 12/16/2020)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 385 Order re: Motion for a Protective Order. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/16/2020. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2020)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 384 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order filed by Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce. Responses due by 12/30/2020. Replies due by 1/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Proposed Order)(Zee, Michael) (Filed on 12/16/2020)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 383 ORDER ON FURTHER PROCEDURES for In Camera Review of Documents on Privilege Logs. Re: ECF #382 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins, Judge Susan van Keulen, Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 12/15/2020. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2020)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 382 Statement (Joint Statement re: Privilege Log and Disputes [Dkt. #380 ) by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 12/14/2020)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 381 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/13/2020 before Judge Lucy H. Koh by Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce, for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Zee, Michael) (Filed on 12/14/2020)
December 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 380 Amended Order Denying #376 Motion for Reconsideration and Clarifying Order to Compel. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/13/2020. (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2020)
December 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 378 RESPONSE (Plaintiffs' Response to Motion for Leave to File an Emergency Motion for Reconsideration, or in the Alternative, for a Protective Order [Dkt. 376]) by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 12/13/2020)
December 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 377 Order Re: Response to Emergency Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/12/2020. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2020)
December 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 376 MOTION for Leave to File , Emergency MOTION for Reconsideration re #372 Order on Motion to Compel filed by U.S. Department of Commerce. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Motion, #2 Declaration of Brian DiGiacomo, #3 Proposed Order)(Sverdlov, Alexander) (Filed on 12/12/2020)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 375 **CLERK'S NOTICE** VACATING December 17, 2020 Hearing on #354 MOTION to Dismiss and #355 MOTION to Stay. Matter to be determined on the papers without oral argument. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2020)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 374 Pursuant to #373 Order, the Further Case Management Conference is CONTINUED from December 11, 2020 to December 18, 2020 at 2:00 PM before Judge Lucy H. Koh. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lhk General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proce edings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Fi led on 12/11/2020)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 373 Order Continuing Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/10/2020. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2020)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 372 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting #368 Motion to Compel. (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2020)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 371 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #368 MOTION to Compel Timely Production of Documents and for Related Relief ) filed byU.S. Department of Commerce. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Dillingham Declaration, #2 Declaration Abowd Declaration, #3 Appendix Abowd Declaration appendix)(Sverdlov, Alexander) (Filed on 12/10/2020)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 370 Order re: Opposition to Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/9/2020. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2020)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 369 MOTION to Shorten Time and Expedite #368 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel filed by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amit Makker, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Proposed Order)(Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 12/9/2020) Modified on 12/10/2020 (lhklc3, COURT STAFF).
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 368 MOTION to Compel Timely Production of Documents and for Related Relief filed by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. Motion Hearing set for 12/11/2020 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 12/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Amit Makker, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Proposed Order)(Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 12/9/2020)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 367 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 12/9/2020)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 366 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #363 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2020)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 365 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #355 MOTION to Stay Proceedings ) filed byBlack Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 11/24/2020)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 364 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #354 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) filed byBlack Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Sherry, Melissa) (Filed on 11/24/2020)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 363 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Christine C. Smith ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15238064.) filed by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of San Jose, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Smith, Christine) (Filed on 11/24/2020)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 362 Certificate of Interested Entities by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People and Corporate Disclosure Statement by National Urban League, League of Women Voters, NAACP, and Black Alliance for Just Immigration (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 11/19/2020)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 361 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/13/2020, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, telephone number summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #359 Transcript Order, ) Redaction Request due 12/8/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/18/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/16/2021. (Related documents(s) #359 ) (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 11/17/2020)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 360 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Merrill C Godfrey substituting for Dario J. Frommer (Godfrey, Merrill) (Filed on 11/17/2020)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 359 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/13/20 before Judge Lucy H. Koh by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of San Jose, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Lankenau, Shannon) (Filed on 11/16/2020)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 358 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lucy H. Koh: Further Case Management Conference held on 11/13/2020 from 1:35 PM - 2:08 PM; 2:32 PM - 3:06 PM (1 hour, 7 minutes). #357 Case Management Order memorializes all relevant information, deadlines, and rulings from the Conference. The Court SET a case schedule through trial. Further Case Management Conference set for December 11, 2020 at 1:30 PM via Zoom videoconference. Hearing on Motions for Summary Judgment set for February 18, 2021 at 1:30 PM. Final Pretrial Conference set for March 11, 2021 at 1:30 PM. Bench Trial (5 days) set for March 19, 2021 at 9:00 AM each day. See #357 for details. Total Time in Court: 1 hour, 7 minutes. Court Reporter: Summer Fisher. Attorneys for Plaintiffs National Urban League; League of Women Voters; Black Alliance for Just Immigration; Harris County, Texas; King County, Washington; City of San Jose, California; Rodney Ellis; Adrian Garcia; and the NAACP: Steven Bauer, Sadik Huseny, and Melissa Sherry. Attorneys for all Plaintiffs above, plus Navajo Nation: Ezra Rosenberg and Thomas Wolf. Attorney for Plaintiff Navajo Nation: Jason Searle. Attorney for Plaintiff City of Los Angeles, California: Danielle Goldstein. Attorney for Plaintiff City of Salinas, California: Michael Mutalipassi. Attorney for Plaintiff City of Chicago: Rebecca Hirsch. Attorney for Plaintiff County of Los Angeles: David Holtzman. Attorney for Plaintiff Gila River Indian Community: Donald Pongrace. Attorneys for Defendants: Alexander Sverdlov, Brad Rosenberg, and John Coghlan. For transcript orders, please visit https://cand.uscourts.gov/transcripts. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/13/2020)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 357 Case Management Order. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/13/2020. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2020)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 356 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 11/12/2020)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 355 MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce. Motion Hearing set for 12/17/2020 01:30 PM before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 11/24/2020. Replies due by 12/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zee, Michael) (Filed on 11/10/2020)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 354 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce. Motion Hearing set for 12/17/2020 01:30 PM before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 11/24/2020. Replies due by 12/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zee, Michael) (Filed on 11/10/2020)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 353 CLERK'S NOTICE CONFIRMING NOVEMBER 13, 2020 FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Further Case Management Conference remains as set on Friday, November 13, 2020 at 1:30 PM. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lhk General Order 58. Persons granted acces s to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2020)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 352 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce. Filed byCity of Salinas, California, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, County of Los Angeles, California, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Navajo Nation, City of Chicago, Illinois, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, City of Los Angeles, California, Black Alliance For Just Immigration, Rodney Ellis, City of San Jose, California, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 10/27/2020) Modified text on 10/28/2020 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 348 Order Granting #206 Motion to Expedite by Louisiana and Mississippi and Denying #204 Their Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 10/26/2020. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2020)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 347 ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 10/26/2020. (lhklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2020)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 346 NOTICE of Appearance by John V Coghlan (Coghlan, John) (Filed on 10/26/2020)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order ***Set Deadlines/Hearings per #347 Order: Further Case Management Conference CONTINUED from 10/28/2020 to 11/13/2020 at 1:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 11/12/2020 at 2:00 PM. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2020)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 344 Statement re #339 Order (Plaintiffs' Statement Regarding United States Supreme Court's Stay Pending Appeal) by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 343 RESPONSE re #339 Order by U.S. Department of Commerce. (Sverdlov, Alexander) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 351 Letter from David Andrew Christenson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2020)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 350 Letter from David Andrew Christenson (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2020)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 349 Letter from David Andrew Christenson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2020)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 342 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting #341 Stipulation re: Deadlines Related to Second Amended Complaint.(lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2020)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 341 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Deadlines Related to Second Amended Complaint filed by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sadik Huseny, #2 Proposed Order)(Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 340 RESPONSE re #337 Order by U.S. Department of Commerce. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Fifteenth Declaration of James Christy)(Sverdlov, Alexander) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 339 Order re: United States Supreme Court's Stay and Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 10/13/2020. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2020) Modified on 10/13/2020 (lhklc3, COURT STAFF).
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 338 Email from Chase Springer to court staff dated 10/13/2020. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2020)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 337 Order Compelling Defendants' Response. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 10/13/2020. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2020)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 336 Email from John Rogers to court staff dated 10/13/2020. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2020)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order ***Set Deadlines/Hearings per #339 Order: Further Case Management Conference CONTINUED from 10/16/2020 to 10/27/2020 at 1:30 PM via Zoom webinar. All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lhk. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2020)
October 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 335 Email from Hari Naidu to the Court dated 10/12/2020. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2020)
October 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 334 Email to court staff dated 10/12/2020. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2020)
October 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 333 Email from Daniel Bachmann to court staff dated 10/10/2020. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2020)
October 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 332 Email from Christopher Burns to court staff. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2020) Modified on 10/12/2020 (kedS, COURT STAFF).
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 331 Statement (Plaintiffs' Preliminary Identification of Potentially Key Documents in Defendants' October 4, 2020 Production) by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Attachments: #1 Key Documents)(Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 10/9/2020)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 330 NOTICE by Gila River Indian Community of Filing of Declaration of Sheila Valenzuela (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sheila Valenzuela)(Pongrace, Donald) (Filed on 10/9/2020)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 329 RESPONSE to Court's Instruction During October 6, 2020 Case Management Conference by Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce. (Attachments: #1 1 of 2, #2 2 of 2)(Zee, Michael) (Filed on 10/9/2020)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 328 Emails from Peter Singer to court staff dated 10/9/2020. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2020)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 327 Email to court staff dated 10/9/2020. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2020)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 326 RESPONSE re #322 Order by Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce. (Attachments: #1 Fourteenth Declaration James T. Christy)(Ehrlich, Stephen) (Filed on 10/9/2020)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 325 Email from Peter Singer to court staff dated 10/8/2020. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2020)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 324 Email from William Polmanteer to court staff dated 10/9/220. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2020)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 323 RESPONSE to the Court's October 6, 2020 Order by Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Albert E. Fontenot, Jr.)(Ehrlich, Stephen) (Filed on 10/8/2020)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 322 Order Compelling Defendants' Response. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 10/7/2020. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2020)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 321 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #204 MOTION to Intervene ) filed byBlack Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 10/7/2020)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 320 USCA ORDER for PUBLICATION (SUSAN P. GRABER, WILLIAM A. FLETCHER and MARSHA S. BERZON) as to #210 Notice of Appeal filed by Defendants, Commerce Secretary Wilbur L. Ross, Jr., the U.S. Department of Commerce, the Director of the U.S. Census Bureau Steven Dillingham, and the U.S. Census Bureau. To the extent that the district court enjoined the Defendants from attempting to meet the December 31 date, that injunction is stayed pending appeal. Emergency Motion for a Stay DENIED IN PART and GRANTED IN PART. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2020)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 319 Email to court staff dated 10/7/2020. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2020)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 318 Email from Dan Weisman to court staff dated 10/7/2020. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2020)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 317 Email from Jesse Granato to court staff dated 10/7/2020. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2020)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 316 Email from Jeff Williams to court staff dated 10/7/2020. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2020)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 315 Email to court staff dated 10/7/2020. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2020)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 314 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/06/2020, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, telephone number summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #312 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 10/28/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/9/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/5/2021. (Related documents(s) #312 ) (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 10/7/2020)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 313 Order re: Communications with the Court. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 10/7/2020. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2020)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 312 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on October 6, 2020 before Judge Lucy H. Koh by Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce, for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Zee, Michael) (Filed on 10/7/2020)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 311 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/6/2020 before Judge Lucy H. Koh by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of San Jose, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Lankenau, Shannon) (Filed on 10/6/2020)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 310 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lucy H. Koh: Further Case Management Conference held on 10/6/2020 from 2:03 PM - 3:11 PM (1 hour, 8 minutes). Further Case Management Conference SET for 10/16/2020 at 1:30 PM via Zoom videoconference. Total Time in Court: 1 hour, 8 minutes. Court Reporter: Summer Fisher. For Plaintiffs National Urban League; League of Women Voters; Black Alliance for Just Immigration; Harris County, TX; King County, Washington; City of San Jose, California; Rodney Ellis; Adrian Garcia; and NAACP: Melissa Sherry, Sadik Huseny, and Steven Bauer. For Plaintiffs National Urban League; League of Women Voters; Black Alliance for Just Immigration; Harris County, TX; King County, Washington; City of San Jose, California; Rodney Ellis; Adrian Garcia; NAACP; and Navajo Nation: Ezra Rosenberg and Thomas Wolf. For Plaintiff Navajo Nation: Jason Searle. For Plaintiff City of Los Angeles: Danielle Goldstein. For Plaintiff City of Salinas: Michael Mutalipassi. For Plaintiff City of Chicago: Rebecca Hirsch. For Plaintiff County of Los Angeles: David Holtzman. For Plaintiff Gila River Indian Community: Donald Pongrace. For Defendants: August Flentje and Brad Rosenberg. For transcript orders, please visit https://cand.uscourts.gov/transcripts. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/6/2020)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 309 Letter from Brett Pruit to Court Staff on October 6, 2020. (lhklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2020)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 308 RESPONSE re #306 Order Defendants' Response to Court's October 6, 2020 Order by Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce. (Attachments: #1 Documents)(Zee, Michael) (Filed on 10/6/2020)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 307 RESPONSE re #302 Order by Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce. (Attachments: #1 Thirteenth Declaration of James T. Christy)(Ehrlich, Stephen) (Filed on 10/6/2020)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ORDER AFTER IN CAMERA REVIEW of Documents Identified on Defendants' October 4 Privilege Log. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins and Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 10/6/2020. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2020).
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 305 RESPONSE re #304 Response ( Non Motion ),, #299 Order by Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Megan Heller)(Ehrlich, Stephen) (Filed on 10/5/2020)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 304 RESPONSE re #299 Order (Plaintiffs' Privilege Objections) by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 10/5/2020)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 303 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting #145 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2020)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 302 Order Compelling Defendants' Response. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 10/5/2020. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2020)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 301 Email from Steven Anderson to court staff on October 4, 2020. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2020)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 300 RESPONSE to Court's October 1, 2020 Order by Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven Dillingham, #2 Attachments)(Zee, Michael) (Filed on 10/5/2020)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER on Procedures for In Camera Review of Documents on October 4 Privilege Log. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins, Judge Thomas S. Hixson, Judge Susan van Keulen on 10/5/2020. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2020).
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 298 RESPONSE re #291 Order by Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce. (Attachments: #1 Twelfth Declaration of James T. Christy)(Ehrlich, Stephen) (Filed on 10/5/2020)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 297 CLERK'S NOTICE CONFIRMING 10/6/2020 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE VIA ZOOM. A Further Case Management Conference is set for Tuesday, October 6, 2020 at 2:00 PM. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lhk General Order 58. Persons granted access to court procee dings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Fil ed on 10/5/2020)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 296 ORDER of USCA as to #210 Notice of Appeal filed by U.S. Department of Commerce. Appellants and appellees shall appear by telephone for oral argument on the pending emergency motion to stay the district courts September 24, 2020 order on Monday, October 5, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. PDT. The argument will be live-streamed and shall take place in courtroom 4 in San Francisco. Only one attorney for each side shall be permitted to argue, and each side will be permitted 20 minutes of argument time. Call-in instructions will be provided to the appearing parties. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2020)
October 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 295 NOTICE by Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce Notice of Filing Documents in Response to Court's September 10, 2020 Order and Directive at September 28, 2020 Case Management Conference (Attachments: #1 Attachment A - Index, #2 Attachment B - Privilege Log, #3 Declaration of Megan Heller, #4 1 of 5, #5 2 of 5, #6 3 of 5, #7 4 of 5, #8 5 of 5)(Zee, Michael) (Filed on 10/4/2020)
October 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 294 Emails to Court Staff dated 10/2/2020 and 10/3/2020. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2020)
October 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 293 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Ehrlich on behalf of Defendants (Ehrlich, Stephen) (Filed on 10/3/2020)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 292 RESPONSE re #289 Order by U.S. Department of Commerce. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Sverdlov, Alexander) (Filed on 10/2/2020)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 291 Order Compelling Defendants' Response. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 10/2/2020. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2020)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 290 NOTICE by U.S. Department of Commerce re #288 Order ; Notice of Compliance (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James T. Christy)(Sverdlov, Alexander) (Filed on 10/2/2020)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 289 Order Compelling Defendants' Response. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 10/2/2020. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2020)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order ***Set Deadlines/Hearings per #288 Order: Further Case Management Conference set for 10/6/2020 02:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2020)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 288 Order re: Clarification of Stay and Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 10/1/20. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2020)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 287 Email from Jeff Williams to court staff dated 10/1/2020. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2020)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 286 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #265 MOTION to Compel and for Sanctions ) filed byU.S. Department of Commerce. (Sverdlov, Alexander) (Filed on 10/1/2020)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 285 Email from Stefanie Villalobos to court staff dated 10/1/2020. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2020)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 284 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #279 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Pending Ruling on Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel and for Sanctions ) filed byU.S. Department of Commerce. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Sverdlov, Alexander) (Filed on 10/1/2020)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 283 RESPONSE re #274 Order Response to the Court's Order by Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James T. Christy)(Zee, Michael) (Filed on 9/30/2020)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 282 RESPONSE (Plaintiffs' Response to Order for Response to Emails [Dkt. 274]) by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 9/30/2020)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 281 Email from Gregory Dillon to court staff dated 9/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2020)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 280 Order Re: Opposition to Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/30/2020. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2020)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 279 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Pending Ruling on Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel and for Sanctions filed by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 9/30/2020) Modified on 10/5/2020 (lhklc3, COURT STAFF).
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 278 RESPONSE re #269 Order by U.S. Department of Commerce. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Sverdlov, Alexander) (Filed on 9/30/2020)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 277 FILED ORDER of USCA for PUBLICATION (JOHNNIE B. RAWLINSON, MORGAN B. CHRISTEN and PATRICK J. BUMATAY) (Dissent by Judge Bumatay) Because the status quo would be upended, rather than preserved, if an administrative stay is issued, the governments request for an immediate administrative stay is denied. Appellees response to the emergency motion is due October 2, 2020. Appellants optional reply is due by October 3, 2020, as to #210 Notice of Appeal filed by U.S. Department of Commerce. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2020)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 276 Email from Bob Ross to court staff dated 9/30/2020. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2020)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 275 RESPONSE (Plaintiffs' Response to Order for Response to Emails [Dkts. 258, 263, 269]) by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 9/30/2020)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 274 Order for Response to Emails. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on September 30, 2020. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2020)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 273 Email from Anthony Smith to court staff dated 9/30/2020. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2020)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 272 Email to court staff dated 9/30/2020. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2020)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 271 Email from Jan Rice to court staff dated 9/30/2020. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2020)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 270 Email from Marcus Pun to court staff dated 9/30/2020. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2020)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 269 Order For Response to Email. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on September 30, 2020. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2020)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 268 Email to court staff dated 9/30/2020. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2020)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 267 RESPONSE (Plaintiffs' Response to Order for Response to Emails [Dkt. 255]) by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 9/30/2020)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 266 RESPONSE re #258 Order, #263 Order, #255 Order by U.S. Department of Commerce. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Sverdlov, Alexander) (Filed on 9/30/2020)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 265 MOTION to Compel and for Sanctions filed by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. Motion Hearing set for 10/2/2020 03:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 10/1/2020. Replies due by 10/2/2020. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 9/30/2020) Modified on 10/5/2020 (lhklc3, COURT STAFF).
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 263 Order for Response to Email. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on September 30, 2020. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2020)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 262 Email from Joshua Harkins dated 9/30/2020. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2020)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 261 RESPONSE (Plaintiffs' Response to Order for Response to Emails [Dkt. 238]) by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 9/30/2020)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 260 RESPONSE re #238 Order by U.S. Department of Commerce. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Sverdlov, Alexander) (Filed on 9/30/2020)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 264 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lucy H. Koh: Further Case Management Conference held on 9/29/2020 from 3:09 PM - 3:30 PM; 4:08 - 4:27 PM (40 minutes). Plaintiffs shall file any motion to compel by September 30, 2020 by 11:00 AM Pacific Time. A hearing on the anticipated motion is SET for Friday, October 2, 2020 at 3:00 PM before Judge Lucy H. Koh via Zoom videoconference. Total Time in Court: 40 minutes. Court Reporter: Irene Rodriguez. For Plaintiffs National Urban League; League of Women Voters; Black Alliance for Just Immigration; Harris County, TX; King County, Washington; City of San Jose, California; Rodney Ellis; Adrian Garcia; and NAACP: Melissa Sherry, Richard Bress, Sadik Huseny, and Steven Bauer. For Plaintiffs National Urban League; League of Women Voters; Black Alliance for Just Immigration; Harris County, TX; King County, Washington; City of San Jose, California; Rodney Ellis; Adrian Garcia; NAACP; and Navajo Nation: Ezra Rosenberg and Thomas Wolf. For Plaintiff Navajo Nation: Jason Searle. For Plaintiff City of Los Angeles: Danielle Goldstein. For Plaintiff City of Salinas: Michael Mutalipassi. For Plaintiff City of Chicago: Rebecca Hirsch. For Plaintiff County of Los Angeles: David Holtzman. For Plaintiff Gila River Indian Community: Donald Pongrace. For Defendants: Alexander Sverdlov, August Flentje, and Brad Rosenberg. For transcript orders, please visit https://cand.uscourts.gov/transcripts (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/29/2020)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 258 Order for Response to Email. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/29/2020. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 257 Email to court staff dated 9/29/2020. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 256 RESPONSE re #253 Order by U.S. Department of Commerce. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Sverdlov, Alexander) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 255 Order for Response to Emails. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on September 29, 2020. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 254 Email to court staff dated 9/29/2020. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER AFTER IN CAMERA REVIEW OF DOCUMENTS IDENTIFIED ON DEFENDANTS' SEPTEMBER 29 PRIVILEGE LOG. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 9/29/2020. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 252 Email from Paul Costa to court staff dated 9/29/2020. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 251 RESPONSE re #242 Response ( Non Motion ),, Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Privilege Objections by Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce. (Zee, Michael) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 250 Email from Zoltan Boka to court staff dated 9/29/2020. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 249 Email to court staff dated 9/29/2020. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 248 Email from Jared Hautamaki to court staff dated 9/29/2020. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 247 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/29/2020 before Judge Lucy H. Koh by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of San Jose, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (Lankenau, Shannon) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 246 RESPONSE (Plaintiffs' Response to Orders Re: Communications with the Court [Dkts. 220, 221, 224, 229]) by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 245 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/29/2020 before Judge Lucy H. Koh by U.S. Department of Commerce, for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (Sverdlov, Alexander) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 244 NOTICE by Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce re #221 Order, #220 Order, #229 Order, #224 Order Notice of Filing in Response to the Court's Orders of September 28, 2020 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James T. Christy)(Zee, Michael) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 243 Statement re #225 Order (Plaintiffs' Statement In Advance of the September 29, 2020 Hearing) by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Sherry, Melissa) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 242 RESPONSE re #236 Order (Plaintiffs' Privilege Objections) by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 241 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/28/2020 before Judge Lucy H. Koh by U.S. Department of Commerce, for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (Sverdlov, Alexander) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 240 RESPONSE re #236 Order by U.S. Department of Commerce. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Privilege Log)(Sverdlov, Alexander) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 239 NOTICE of Appearance by August Flentje (Flentje, August) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 238 Order for Response to Emails. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/29/2020. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 237 Transcript of Proceedings held on 09/28/2020, before Judge Koh. Court Reporter Irene L. Rodriguez, email address Irene_Rodriguez@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/28/2020. (irodS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER CONCERNING DEFENDANTS' SEPTEMBER 29 PRIVILEGE LOG. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins, Judge Susan van Keulen, Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 9/29/2020. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 235 Email from TaMarra Cooley to court staff dated 9/29/2020. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 234 NOTICE by Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce Notice of Filing of Declaration in Response to Directive at September 28, 2020 Case Management Conference (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James T. Christy, #2 Attachments)(Zee, Michael) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 233 EXHIBITS re #232 Response ( Non Motion ) filed byU.S. Department of Commerce. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part 2, #2 Exhibit Part 3)(Related document(s) #232 ) (Sverdlov, Alexander) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 232 RESPONSE re #225 Order by U.S. Department of Commerce. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Privilege Log, #2 Declaration DiGiacomo Declaration)(Sverdlov, Alexander) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 231 Email from Robert Cohen to court staff dated 9/29/2020. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 230 Email from Jeff Williams to court staff dated 9/28/2020. SEE ATTACHMENT #1 FOR READABLE VERSION. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2020) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/29/2020: #1 Readable Version) (kedS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/29/2020 (kedS, COURT STAFF).
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 229 Order re: Communications with the Court. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/28/2020. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2020)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 228 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/28/2020 before Judge Lucy H. Koh by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of San Jose, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (Lankenau, Shannon) (Filed on 9/28/2020)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 227 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING ZOOM CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Pursuant to the Minute Entry at ECF No. 226, a Further Case Management Conference is set for Tuesday, September 29, 2020 at 3:00 PM before Judge Lucy H. Koh. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lhk Gen eral Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document ass ociated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2020)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 226 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lucy H. Koh: Further Case Management Conference held on 9/28/2020 from 2:04 PM - 2:36 PM; 2:48 PM - 3:28 PM (1 hour, 12 minutes). Further Case Management Conference SET for Tuesday, September 29, 2020 at 3:00 PM. Total Time in Court: 1 hour, 12 minutes. Court Reporter: Irene Rodriguez. For Plaintiffs National Urban League; League of Women Voters; Black Alliance for Just Immigration; Harris County, TX; King County, Washington; City of San Jose, California; Rodney Ellis; Adrian Garcia; and NAACP: Melissa Sherry, Richard Bress, Sadik Huseny, and Steven Bauer. For Plaintiffs National Urban League; League of Women Voters; Black Alliance for Just Immigration; Harris County, TX; King County, Washington; City of San Jose, California; Rodney Ellis; Adrian Garcia; NAACP; and Navajo Nation: Ezra Rosenberg and Thomas Wolf. For Plaintiff Navajo Nation: Jason Searle. For Plaintiff City of Los Angeles: Danielle Goldstein. For Plaintiff City of Salinas: Michael Mutalipassi. For Plaintiff City of Chicago: Lily Hough. For Plaintiff County of Los Angeles: David Holtzman. For Plaintiff Gila River Indian Community: Donald Pongrace. For Defendants: Alexander Sverdlov and Brad Rosenberg. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/28/2020)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 225 Order to Produce the Administrative Record. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/28/2020. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2020)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 224 Order for Response to Email to the Courtroom Deputy. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/28/2020. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2020)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 223 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #206 MOTION to Expedite ) (Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Shorten Time and to Expedite by States of Louisiana and Mississippi) filed byBlack Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sadik Huseny)(Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 9/28/2020)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 222 Email from Gregory Dillon to the Courtroom Deputy dated 9/28/2020. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2020)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 221 Order re: Communications with the Court. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/28/2020. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2020)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 220 Order re: Communications with the Court. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/28/2020. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2020)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 219 RESPONSE re #215 Order by U.S. Department of Commerce. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James T. Christy)(Sverdlov, Alexander) (Filed on 9/28/2020)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 218 RESPONSE re #215 Order (Plaintiffs' Response to Allegation of Noncompliance with Preliminary Injunction) by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 9/28/2020)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 217 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting #148 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2020)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 216 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting #139 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2020)
September 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 215 Order re: Response to Allegation of Non-Compliance with Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/27/2020. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2020)
September 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 214 Order re: Communications with the Court. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/27/2020. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2020)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 213 USCA Case Number 20-16868 Ninth Circuit for #210 Notice of Appeal filed by U.S. Department of Commerce. The schedule to be set. Preliminary Injunction Appeal. C.R. 3-3. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2020)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 212 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying #211 Motion to Stay Pending Appeal. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2020)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 211 MOTION to Stay re #208 Order filed by Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce. Responses due by 10/9/2020. Replies due by 10/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zee, Michael) (Filed on 9/25/2020)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 210 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Defendants, Commerce Secretary Wilbur L. Ross, Jr., the U.S. Department of Commerce, the Director of the U.S. Census Bureau Steven Dillingham, and the U.S. Census Bureau. Appeal of Order #208 (Appeal fee FEE WAIVED.) (Sverdlov, Alexander) (Filed on 9/25/2020) Modified on 10/7/2020 to add names of all filers (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 209 CLERK'S NOTICE CONFIRMING 9/28/2020 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE VIA ZOOM. Pursuant to the Minute Entry at ECF No. 200, a Further Case Management Conference is set for Monday, September 28, 2020 at 2:00 PM. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lhk General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated wit h this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2020)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 208 Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Stay and Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/24/2020. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2020)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 206 MOTION to Expedite filed by The State of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph Scott St. John, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Order)(St. John, Joseph) (Filed on 9/23/2020)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 205 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/22/2020 before Judge Lucy H. Koh by U.S. Department of Commerce, for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (Sverdlov, Alexander) (Filed on 9/23/2020)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 204 MOTION to Intervene filed by The State of Louisiana. Responses due by 10/7/2020. Replies due by 10/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph S. St. John, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Proposed Answer, #20 Proposed Order)(St. John, Joseph) (Filed on 9/23/2020)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 203 RESPONSE to Court Request During September 22, 2020 Hearing Regarding Historical Censuses by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 9/22/2020)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 202 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/22/2020 before Judge Lucy H. Koh by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of San Jose, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (Lankenau, Shannon) (Filed on 9/22/2020)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 201 RESPONSE to Court Request During September 22, 2020, Hearing by U.S. Department of Commerce. (Sverdlov, Alexander) (Filed on 9/22/2020)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 200 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lucy H. Koh: Hearing on #36 MOTION to Stay and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction held on 9/22/2020 from 2:08 PM - 3:48 PM; 4:03 PM - 4:22 PM (1 hour, 59 minutes). The Court set a Further Case Management Conference for Monday, September 28, 2020 at 2:00 PM. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lhk Total Time in Court: 1 hour, 59 minutes. Court Reporter: Irene Rodriguez. For Plaintiffs National Urban League; League of Women Voters; Black Alliance f or Just Immigration; Harris County, TX; King County, Washington; City of San Jose, California; Rodney Ellis; Adrian Garcia; and NAACP: Melissa Sherry, Richard Bress, Sadik Huseny, and Steven Bauer. For Plaintiffs National Urban League; League of Women Voters; Black Alliance for Just Immigration; Harris County, TX; King County, Washington; City of San Jose, California; Rodney Ellis; Adrian Garcia; NAACP; and Navajo Nation: Ezra Rosenberg and Thomas Wolf. For Plaintiff City of Los Angeles: Michael Dundas. For Plaintiff County of Los Angeles: David Holtzman. For Plaintiff City of Salinas: Michael Mutalipassi. For Plaintiff City of Chicago: Rebecca Hirsch. For Plaintiff Gila River Indian Community: Donald Pongrace. For Defendants: Alexander Sverdlov and Brad Rosenberg. For transcript orders, please visit https://cand.uscourts.gov/transcripts (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/22/2020)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 199 NOTICE by Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce re #182 Order, #179 Order, #184 Order, #174 Order Defendants' Notice of Filing Documents in Response to Court's Orders of September 20, 2020 (Attachments: #1 13 of 23, #2 14 of 23, #3 15 of 23, #4 16 of 23, #5 17 of 23, #6 18 of 23, #7 19 of 23, #8 20 of 23, #9 21 of 23, #10 22 of 23, #11 23 of 23)(Zee, Michael) (Filed on 9/22/2020)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 198 NOTICE by Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce re #182 Order, #179 Order, #184 Order, #174 Order Defendants' Notice of Filing Documents in Response to Court's Orders of September 20, 2020 (Attachments: #1 1 of 23, #2 2 of 23, #3 3 of 23, #4 4 of 23, #5 5 of 23, #6 6 of 23, #7 7 of 23, #8 8 of 23, #9 9 of 23, #10 10 of 23, #11 11 of 23, #12 12 of 23)(Zee, Michael) (Filed on 9/22/2020)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 197 Supplemental Brief re #36 MOTION to Stay and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byBlack Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Related document(s) #36 ) (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 9/22/2020)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 196 Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Preliminary Injunction filed byU.S. Department of Commerce. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Sverdlov, Alexander) (Filed on 9/22/2020)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 195 RESPONSE re #194 Order Defendants' Response to Court's September 21, 2020 Order re: Secretary Ross Documents by Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A - Documents)(Zee, Michael) (Filed on 9/21/2020)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 194 Order Re: Supplemental Preliminary Injunction Briefs and Production of Secretary Ross Documents. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/21/2020. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2020)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 193 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/18/2020 before Judge Lucy H. Koh by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of San Jose, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Lankenau, Shannon) (Filed on 9/21/2020)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 192 Transcript of Proceedings held on 9-18-20, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge, telephone number e-mail: lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #181 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/21/2020. (Related documents(s) #181 ) (lasS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2020)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 191 RESPONSE re #167 Order by U.S. Department of Commerce. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Albert E. Fontenot, Jr.)(Sverdlov, Alexander) (Filed on 9/21/2020)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 190 Statement (Plaintiffs' Preliminary Identification of Potentially Key Documents in Defendants' September 18, 2020 Production - Integrated Fifth Set) by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 9/21/2020)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 189 NOTICE by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People (Notice Regarding Just-Released Office of Inspector General Report; Request for Clarification Regarding Supplemental Briefing) (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 9/21/2020)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 188 Statement (Plaintiffs' Preliminary Identification of Potentially Key Documents in Defendants' September 18, 2020 Production - Integrated Fourth Set) by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 9/21/2020)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 187 Per #173 Order, the hearing on #36 MOTION to Stay and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction remains as set on 9/22/2020, but will begin at 2:00 PM PT. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lhk General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings h eld by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9 /21/2020)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 186 Statement re #183 Order (Plaintiffs' Statement of Compliance with Dkt. 183) by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 9/21/2020)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 185 RESPONSE re #183 Order by U.S. Department of Commerce. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part 1, #2 Exhibit Part 2)(Sverdlov, Alexander) (Filed on 9/21/2020)
September 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 184 THIRD ORDER AFTER IN CAMERA REVIEW AS TO DELIBERATIVE PROCESS PRIVILEGE ASSERTED BY DEFENDANTS. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins, Judge Susan van Keulen, Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 9/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A 9.13, #2 Exhibit B 9.18)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2020)
September 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 183 Order Re: Identification of Key Documents and Supplemental Preliminary Injunction Briefs. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/20/2020. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2020)
September 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 182 SECOND ORDER AFTER IN CAMERA REVIEW AS TO DELIBERATIVE PROCESS PRIVILEGE ASSERTED BY DEFENDANTS; ADDENDUM ON FORMAT OF PRODUCTION. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins, Judge Susan van Keulen, Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 9/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2020)
September 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 181 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/18/2020 before Judge Lucy H. Koh by U.S. Department of Commerce, for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Sverdlov, Alexander) (Filed on 9/20/2020)
September 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 180 NOTICE by U.S. Department of Commerce re #179 Order (Sverdlov, Alexander) (Filed on 9/20/2020)
September 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 179 FIRST ORDER AFTER IN CAMERA REVIEW AS TO DELIBERATIVE PROCESS PRIVILEGE ASSERTED BY DEFENDANTS. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins, Judge Susan van Keulen, Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 9/20/2020. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2020)
September 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 178 Supplemental Brief re Preliminary Injunction filed byBlack Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 9/20/2020)
September 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 177 RESPONSE re #169 Order by U.S. Department of Commerce. (Sverdlov, Alexander) (Filed on 9/20/2020)
September 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 176 Supplemental Brief In Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction filed byU.S. Department of Commerce. (Sverdlov, Alexander) (Filed on 9/20/2020)
September 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 175 DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF RELEASE OF DOCUMENTS PURSUANT TO THE COURTS SEPTEMBER 20, 2020, by Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce re #174 Order (Attachments: #1 Attachment A - Documents)(Zee, Michael) (Filed on 9/20/2020) Modified on 9/21/2020 to correct misspelling (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
September 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER AFTER IN CAMERA REVIEW AS TO ATTORNEY-CLIENT PRIVILEGE ASSERTED BY DEFENDANTS. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins, Judge Susan van Keulen, Judge Thomas S. Hixson. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2020)
September 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 173 Order Continuing September 22, 2020 Preliminary Injunction Hearing from 10 a.m. to 2 p.m. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/20/2020. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2020)
September 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 172 RESPONSE re #170 Statement,, Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Privilege Objections by Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A - Responses to Privilege Challenges, #2 Attachment B - Supplement Privilege Information)(Zee, Michael) (Filed on 9/20/2020)
September 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 171 Statement (Plaintiffs' Preliminary Identification of Potentially Key Documents in Defendants' September 18, 2020 Production - Integrated Third Set) by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 9/20/2020)
September 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 170 Statement (Plaintiffs' Privilege Objections) by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 9/19/2020)
September 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 169 Order to Confirm Number of Documents in September 13 and 18, 2020 Productions. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/19/2020. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2020)
September 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 168 RESPONSE re #165 Order Defendants' Response to the Court's September 19, 2020 Order by Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce. (Zee, Michael) (Filed on 9/19/2020)
September 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 167 Order Re: Supplemental Preliminary Injunction Briefs, Identification of Key Documents, and General Accounting Office Production. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/19/2020. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2020)
September 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 166 Statement (Plaintiffs' Preliminary Identification of Potentially Key Documents in Defendants' September 18, 2020 Production - Integrated Second Set) by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 9/19/2020)
September 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER, Supplementing Procedures on Privilege Review, and Advancing One Deadline for Defendants to Confirm Earlier Production (Cousins, Nathanael) (Filed on 9/19/2020)
September 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 164 RESPONSE re #163 Order, #160 Order Defendants' combined response by U.S. Department of Commerce. (Sverdlov, Alexander) (Filed on 9/19/2020)
September 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER on Procedures for In Camera Privilege Review by Magistrate Judges (Cousins, Nathanael) (Filed on 9/19/2020)
September 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 162 Statement (Plaintiffs' Preliminary Identification of Potentially Key Documents in Defendants' September 18, 2020 Production) by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 9/19/2020)
September 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 161 RESPONSE re #160 Order by U.S. Department of Commerce. (Sverdlov, Alexander) (Filed on 9/19/2020)
September 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 160 Order to Identify Key Documents in Defendants' September 18, 2020 Production. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 09/19/2020. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2020)
September 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 159 AFFIDAVIT Declaration of Megan Heller by Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce. (Zee, Michael) (Filed on 9/19/2020)
September 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 158 AFFIDAVIT Declaration of Allyson Deitrick by Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce. (Zee, Michael) (Filed on 9/19/2020)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 157 NOTICE by Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce re #132 Order Notice of Filing Documents in Response to Court's September 15, 2020 Order (Parts 31-37) (Attachments: #1 31 of 37, #2 32 of 37, #3 33 of 37, #4 34 of 37, #5 35 of 37, #6 36 of 37, #7 37 of 37)(Zee, Michael) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 156 NOTICE by Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce re #132 Order Notice of Filing Documents in Response to Court's September 15, 2020 Order (Parts 21-30) (Attachments: #1 21 of 37, #2 22 of 37, #3 23 of 37, #4 24 of 37, #5 25 of 37, #6 26 of 37, #7 27 of 37, #8 28 of 37, #9 29 of 37, #10 30 of 37)(Zee, Michael) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 155 NOTICE by Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce re #132 Order Notice of Filing Documents in Response to Court's September 15, 2020 Order (Parts 11-20) (Attachments: #1 11 of 37, #2 12 of 37, #3 13 of 37, #4 14 of 37, #5 15 of 37, #6 16 of 37, #7 17 of 37, #8 18 of 37, #9 19 of 37, #10 20 of 37)(Zee, Michael) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 154 NOTICE by Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce re #132 Order Notice of Filing Documents in Response to Court's September 15, 2020 Order (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael A. Cannon, #2 Att A - Index and Privilege Log, #3 1 of 37, #4 2 of 37, #5 3 of 37, #6 4 of 37, #7 5 of 37, #8 6 of 37, #9 7 of 37, #10 8 of 37, #11 9 of 37, #12 10 of 37)(Zee, Michael) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 153 Order re: Privilege Declaration and Documents for In Camera Review. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/18/2020. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 152 CLERK'S NOTICE CONFIRMING 9/22/2020 HEARING VIA ZOOM. The hearing on #36 MOTION to Stay and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction remains as set on Tuesday, September 22, 2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Lucy H. Koh. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lhk General Or der 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 151 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lucy H. Koh: Further Case Management Conference held on 9/18/2020 from 10:08 AM - 11:38 AM (1 hour, 30 minutes). Total Time in Court: 1 hour, 30 minutes. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. For Plaintiffs National Urban League; League of Women Voters; Black Alliance for Just Immigration; Harris County, TX; King County, Washington; City of San Jose, California; Rodney Ellis; Adrian Garcia; and NAACP: Melissa Sherry, Richard Bress, and Sadik Huseny. For Plaintiffs National Urban League; League of Women Voters; Black Alliance for Just Immigration; Harris County, TX; King County, Washington; City of San Jose, California; Rodney Ellis; Adrian Garcia; NAACP; and Navajo Nation: Ezra Rosenberg and Thomas Wolf. For Plaintiff City of Los Angeles: Michael Dundas. For Plaintiff County of Los Angeles: David Holtzman. For Plaintiff City of Salinas: Michael Mutalipassi. For Plaintiff City of Chicago: Rebecca Hirsch. For Plaintiff Gila River Indian Community: Donald Pongrace. For Defendants: Alexander Sverdlov and Brad Rosenberg. For transcript orders, please visit https://cand.uscourts.gov/transcripts (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/18/2020)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 150 RESPONSE re #140 Order Defendants' Response to the Court's September 16, 2020 Order by Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Census Bureau Personnel, #2 Exhibit 2 - Commerce Department Personnel, #3 Exhibit 3 - Census Bureau Organizational Chart, #4 Exhibit 4 - Census Bureau Staff Roster)(Zee, Michael) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 149 PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM RE: PRIVILEGE DISPUTES re #140 Order , by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 9/18/2020) Modified text on 9/21/2020 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 148 First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14959122.) filed by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of San Jose, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Clarke, Kristen) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 147 CLERK'S NOTICE CONFIRMING 9/18/2020 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE VIA ZOOM. The Further Case Management Conference remains as set on Friday, September 18, 2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Lucy H. Koh. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lhk General Order 58. Pe rsons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entr y.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 146 NOTICE by The State of Louisiana NOTICE OF INTENT TO INTERVENE AND REQUEST TO PARTICIPATE IN STATUS CONFERENCE (Benbrook, Bradley) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 145 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14954912.) filed by The State of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(St. John, Joseph) (Filed on 9/17/2020)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 144 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley A. Benbrook as counsel for proposed intervenor, The State of Louisiana (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Benbrook, Bradley) (Filed on 9/17/2020)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 143 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 9/17/2020)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 142 Order Extending Temporary Restraining Order for Defendants' Partial Production of the Administrative Record. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/17/2020. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2020)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 141 Transcript of Proceedings held on 9-15-20, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge, telephone number e-mail: lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #134 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/15/2020. (Related documents(s) #134 ) (lasS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 140 Order re: Privilege Disputes. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/16/2020. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 139 First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Jason Searle ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14949223.) filed by Navajo Nation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service NM Bar Certificate of Good Standing)(Searle, Jason) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 138 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/4/2020 before Judge Lucy H. Koh for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 136 NOTICE of Appearance by Pooja Chaudhuri (Chaudhuri, Pooja) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 135 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/15/2020 before Judge Lucy H. Koh by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of San Jose, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Lankenau, Shannon) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 134 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/15/2020 before Judge Lucy H. Koh by U.S. Department of Commerce, for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Sverdlov, Alexander) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 137 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lucy H. Koh: Further Case Management Conference held on 9/15/2020 from 2:08 PM - 3:37 PM; 3:55 PM - 4:10 PM (1 hour, 45 minutes). The Court STAYED its September 10, 2020 Order to Produce the Administrative Record (ECF No. #96 ). The Court SET a Further Case Management Conference for Friday, September 18, 2020 at 10:00 AM. The Court also CONTINUED the hearing on Plaintiffs' #36 Motion for Stay and Preliminary Injunction from Thursday, September 17, 2020 to Tuesday, September 22, 2020 at 10:00 AM. Both the Further Case Management Conference and the Motion Hearing will be held via Zoom webinar. A Clerk's Notice will be issued before each hearing with the Zoom information; this Court's Zoom information can also be found anytime at cand.uscourts.gov/LHK and cand.uscourts.gov/zoom. Total Time in Court: 1 hour, 45 minutes. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. For Plaintiffs National Urban League; League of Women Voters; Black Alliance for Just Immigration; Harris County, TX; King County, Washington; City of San Jose, California; Rodney Ellis; Adrian Garcia; and NAACP: Melissa Sherry, Richard Bress, Steven Bauer, and Sadik Huseny. For Plaintiffs National Urban League; League of Women Voters; Black Alliance for Just Immigration; Harris County, TX; King County, Washington; City of San Jose, California; Rodney Ellis; Adrian Garcia; NAACP; and Navajo Nation: Ezra Rosenberg and Thomas Wolf. For Plaintiff City of Los Angeles: Michael Dundas. For Plaintiff County of Los Angeles: David Holtzman. For Plaintiff City of Salinas: Michael Mutalipassi. For Plaintiff City of Chicago: Rebecca Hirsch. For Plaintiff Gila River Indian Community: Donald Pongrace. For Defendants: Alexander Sverdlov and Brad Rosenberg. For transcript orders, please visit https://cand.uscourts.gov/transcripts (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/15/2020)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 133 RESPONSE to the Court's Directive During September 15, 2020 Hearing by Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James T. Christy)(Zee, Michael) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 132 Order to Produce Inspector General Document Production. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/15/2020. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 131 Declaration of Sadik Huseny in Support of #130 Reply to Opposition/Response,, re Plaintiffs' Motion for Stay and Preliminary Injunction filed byBlack Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 16, #2 Exhibit 17, #3 Exhibit 18, #4 Exhibit 19, #5 Exhibit 20, #6 Exhibit 21, #7 Exhibit 22, #8 Exhibit 23, #9 Exhibit 23-B, #10 Exhibit 24, #11 Exhibit 25, #12 Exhibit 26, #13 Exhibit 27, #14 Exhibit 28, #15 Exhibit 29, #16 Exhibit 30, #17 Exhibit 31, #18 Exhibit 32)(Related document(s) #130 ) (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 130 REPLY (re #36 MOTION to Stay and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) filed byBlack Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Sherry, Melissa) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 129 Statement (Plaintiffs' Statement Regarding Case Management Issues) by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Sherry, Melissa) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 128 Order re: Document Production. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/15/2020. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 127 RESPONSE re #113 Order by U.S. Department of Commerce. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James T. Christy)(Sverdlov, Alexander) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 126 Transcript of Proceedings held on 9-14-20, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge, telephone number e-mail: lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #120 Transcript Order, ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/14/2020. (Related documents(s) #120 ) (lasS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 125 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/14/2020 before Judge Lucy H. Koh by U.S. Department of Commerce, for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Sverdlov, Alexander) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 124 Plaintiffs' Submission Regarding Production of OIG Documents [Corrected Docket Text] by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of San Jose, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 9/15/2020) Modified on 9/15/2020 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 123 Plaintiffs' Submission Regarding Production of OIG Documents by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of San Jose, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 9/14/2020) Modified text on 9/15/2020 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 122 RESPONSE re #119 Order by U.S. Department of Commerce. (Sverdlov, Alexander) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 121 Statement Plaintiffs' Listing of Plaintiffs and Corresponding Representation by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 120 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/14/2020 before Judge Lucy H. Koh by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of San Jose, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Makker, Amit) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 119 Order re: Production of Inspector General Document Production. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/14/2020. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 118 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lucy H. Koh: Further Case Management Conference held on 9/14/2020 from 2:09 PM - 3:44 PM; 4:30 PM - 5:02 PM (2 hours, 5 minutes). Total Time in Court: 2 hours, 5 minutes. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. For Plaintiffs National Urban League; League of Women Voters; Black Alliance for Just Immigration; Harris County, TX; King County, Washington; City of San Jose, California; Rodney Ellis; Adrian Garcia; and NAACP: Melissa Sherry, Richard Bress, Steven Bauer, and Sadik Huseny. For Plaintiffs National Urban League; League of Women Voters; Black Alliance for Just Immigration; Harris County, TX; King County, Washington; City of San Jose, California; Rodney Ellis; Adrian Garcia; NAACP; and Navajo Nation: Ezra Rosenberg and Thomas Wolf. For Plaintiff City of Los Angeles: Michael Dundas. For Plaintiff County of Los Angeles: David Holtzman. For Plaintiff City of Salinas: Michael Mutalipassi. For Plaintiff City of Chicago: Lily Hough and Rebecca Hirsch. For Plaintiff Gila River Indian Community: Donald Pongrace. For Defendants: Alexander Sverdlov and Brad Rosenberg. For transcript orders, please visit https://cand.uscourts.gov/transcripts (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/14/2020) Modified on 9/16/2020 (kedS, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 117 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Hirsch on behalf of Plaintiff City of Chicago (Hirsch, Rebecca) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 116 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting #95 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 115 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Pursuant to #113 Order re: Allegations of Potential Non-Compliance with Court's Temporary Restraining Order, a hearing is SET for Tuesday, September 15, 2020 at 2:00 PM. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lhk Gener al Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document assoc iated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 114 RESPONSE re #103 Order Plaintiffs' Response to Order to Identify Key Documents in Administrative Record by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 113 Order re: Allegations of Potential Non-Compliance with Court's Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/14/2020. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 112 Order re: Communications with the Court. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/14/2020. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 111 RESPONSE re #101 Order Plaintiffs' Response re: Briefing and Deadline Production by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Anne W. Robinson, #2 Annex A)(Robinson, Anne) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 110 RESPONSE re #103 Order by U.S. Department of Commerce. (Sverdlov, Alexander) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 109 RESPONSE re #101 Order by U.S. Department of Commerce. (Sverdlov, Alexander) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 108 RESPONSE re #100 Order Plaintiffs Response to Courts Order Re: Communications with Court by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 107 RESPONSE re #100 Order by U.S. Department of Commerce. (Sverdlov, Alexander) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 106 NOTICE by U.S. Department of Commerce re #105 Exhibits, #104 Notice (Other) Notice of Corrected Index and Privilege Log (Sverdlov, Alexander) (Filed on 9/13/2020)
September 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 105 EXHIBITS re #104 Notice (Other) Documents Produced in Response to the Court's September 10, 2020 Order filed byU.S. Department of Commerce. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part 2, #2 Exhibit Part 3, #3 Exhibit Part 4)(Related document(s) #104 ) (Sverdlov, Alexander) (Filed on 9/13/2020)
September 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 104 NOTICE by U.S. Department of Commerce re #96 Order Notice of Filing Documents (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian D. DiGiacomo)(Sverdlov, Alexander) (Filed on 9/13/2020)
September 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 103 Order to Identify Key Documents in the Administrative Record. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/12/2020. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2020)
September 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 102 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald R Pongrace (Pongrace, Donald) (Filed on 9/12/2020)
September 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 101 Order re: Briefing and Deadline for Production. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/12/2020. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2020)
September 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 100 Order re: Communications with the Court. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/12/2020. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2020)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 99 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 9/11/2020)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Transcript of Zoom Videoconference Proceedings held on 9/8/2020, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter Ana M. Dub, CSR 7445, RDR, CRR, telephone number 415-290-1651; ana_dub@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #90 Transcript Order, #87 Transcript Order, ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/10/2020. (Related documents(s) #90 , #87 ) (amdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2020)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 97 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING SEPTEMBER 14, 2020 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Further Case Management Conference remains as set on Monday, September 14, 2020 at 2:00 PM before Judge Lucy H. Koh. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lhk Court Appearances: A dvanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at lhkcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than September 11, 2020 at 3:00 PM PST.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2020)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 96 Order to Produce the Administrative Record. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/10/2020. (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2020)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Rebecca Hirsch ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14921210.) filed by City of Chicago, Illinois. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Hirsch, Rebecca) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 93 Order re: Communications with the Court. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/9/2020. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 92 Statement re #88 Brief, #91 Order (Plaintiffs' Submission Regarding Scope of Administrative Record) by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 94 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lucy H. Koh: Further Case Management Conference held on 9/8/2020 from 10:03 AM - 10:14 AM; 10:18 AM - 11:13 AM; 11:30 AM - 12:00 PM (1 hour, 36 minutes). Total Time in Court: 1 hour, 36 minutes. Court Reporter: Ana Dub. For Plaintiffs National Urban League; League of Women Voters; Black Alliance for Just Immigration; Harris County, TX; King County, Washington; City of San Jose, California; Rodney Ellis; Adrian Garcia; and NAACP: Melissa Sherry, Richard Bress, Steven Bauer, Ezra Rosenberg, Ajay Saini, Thomas Wolf, and Sadik Huseny. For Plaintiff Navajo Nation: Ezra Rosenberg and Thomas Wolf. For Plaintiff City of Los Angeles: Michael Dundas. For Plaintiff County of Los Angeles: David Holtzman. For Plaintiff City of Salinas: Michael Mutalipassi. For Plaintiff City of Chicago: Lily Hough. For Plaintiff Gila River Indian Community: Donald Pongrace. For Defendants: Alexander Sverdlov and Brad Rosenberg. For transcript orders, please visit https://cand.uscourts.gov/transcripts (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/8/2020) Modified on 9/9/2020 (kedS, COURT STAFF).
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Order to Respond to Defendants' Objections as to the Scope of the Administrative Record. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/8/2020. (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 90 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/8/2020 before Judge Lucy H. Koh by U.S. Department of Commerce, for Court Reporter Ana Dub. (Sverdlov, Alexander) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 89 Brief Plaintiffs Submission Regarding Administrative Record filed byBlack Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 88 Brief in Response to Court's Request at Conference filed byU.S. Department of Commerce. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian DiGiacomo)(Sverdlov, Alexander) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 87 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/8/2020 before Judge Lucy H. Koh by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of San Jose, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, for Court Reporter Ana Dub. (Makker, Amit) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 86 NOTICE by U.S. Department of Commerce re #84 Order on Motion for TRO Defendants' Notice Regarding Compliance (Sverdlov, Alexander) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
September 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting #64 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2020)
September 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting #66 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2020)
September 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 83 REPLY (re #66 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ) filed byBlack Alliance For Just Immigration, City of San Jose, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 9/5/2020)
September 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 82 Transcript of Proceedings held on 09/04/2020, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, telephone number summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #78 Transcript Order, ) Redaction Request due 9/28/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/6/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/4/2020. (Related documents(s) #78 ) (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 9/5/2020)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #36 MOTION to Stay and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) filed bySteven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Albert E. Fontenot, Jr.)(Zee, Michael) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Order re: Reply. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/4/2020. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/4/2020 before Judge Lucy H. Koh by Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce, for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Mauler, Daniel) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/04/2020 before Judge Lucy H. Koh by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of San Jose, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Makker, Amit) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 **CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING ZOOM CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE** During the September 4, 2020 hearing on Plaintiffs' motion for temporary restraining order, the Court set a Further Case Management Conference for Tuesday, September 8, 2020 at 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lhk General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/.< /p< (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael David Mutalipassi for plaintiff City of Salinas (Mutalipassi, Michael) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lucy H. Koh: Hearing on #66 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order held on 9/4/2020 via Zoom Videoconference. The Court SET a Case Management Conference on Tuesday, September 8, 2020 at 10:00 AM. The Further Case Management Conference will be held via Zoom Videoconference; details will be included in a Clerk's Notice on the docket. Total Time in Court: 51 minutes. Court Reporter: Summer Fisher. Attorneys for Plaintiffs National Urban League; League of Women Voters; Black Alliance for Just Immigration; Harris County, Texas; King County, Washington; City of San Jose, California; Rodney Ellis; and Adrian Garcia: Melissa Sherry, Richard Bress, Ezra Rosenberg, Thomas Wolf, Steven Bauer, and Sadik Huseny. Attorney for Plaintiff City of Los Angeles, California: Danielle Goldstein. Attorney for Plaintiff City of Salinas, California: Michael Mutalipassi. Attorney for Plaintiff City of Chicago, Illinois: Lily Hough.Attorney for Plaintiff Gila River Indian Community: Donald Pongrace. Attorneys for Defendants: Alexander Sverdlov and Andrew Zee. For transcript orders, please visit https://cand.uscourts.gov/transcripts (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 74 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #66 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ) filed byU.S. Department of Commerce. (Sverdlov, Alexander) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Andrew Zee (Zee, Michael) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance by Rafey Sarkis Balabanian on behalf of Plaintiff City of Chicago (Balabanian, Rafey) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by Lily E. Hough on behalf of Plaintiff City of Chicago (Hough, Lily) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Sverdlov for all Defendants (Sverdlov, Alexander) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 **CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING HEARING ON #66 MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER** Pursuant to this notice, a hearing on #66 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order is SET for today, September 4, 2020, at 3:00 PM before Judge Lucy H. Koh. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #http s://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lhk General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry g enerated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Order re: Communications with the Court. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/4/2020. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 NOTICE by Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce re #66 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Defendants' Notice of Intent to Respond Today to Plaintiffs' Motion for TRO) (Mauler, Daniel) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Amit Makker, #3 Exhibits A-D to Makker Decl., #4 Copy of First Amended Complaint [Dkt. 61], #5 Copy of Motion for Stay and Preliminary Injunction and Expert and Fact Decl. [Dkt. 36], #6 Copy of Huseny Decl. in support of Mot. for Stay and PI [Dkt. 37])(Sherry, Melissa) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Transcript of Proceedings held on 8-26-20, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge, telephone number e-mail: lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #47 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/2/2020. (Related documents(s) #47 ) (lasS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14896569.) filed by Gila River Indian Community. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Pongrace, Donald) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STATUS REPORT (Defendants' Statement on Status of Field Operations) by Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce. (Mauler, Daniel) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by David Ilan Holtzman on Behalf of the County of Los Angeles (Holtzman, David) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce. Filed byCity of Salinas, California, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Adrian Garcia, City of Los Angeles, California, Black Alliance For Just Immigration, Rodney Ellis, City of San Jose, California, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, City of Chicago, Illinois, County of Los Angeles, California, Gila River Indian Community. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 9/1/2020)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 STIPULATION Regarding Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 9/1/2020)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 08/26/2020 before Judge Lucy H. Koh by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of San Jose, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Lankenau, Shannon) (Filed on 9/1/2020)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Brief re #57 Brief, Corrected version of Amicus Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay and for Preliminary Injunction on behalf of coalition of 32 States, Counties, Cities and U.S. Conference of Mayors filed byState of New York. (Related document(s) #57 ) (McCabe, Gavin) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Brief re #36 MOTION to Stay and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Amicus Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay and for Preliminary Injunction on behalf of coalition of 32 States, Counties, Cities and U.S. Conference of Mayors filed byState of New York. (Related document(s) #36 ) (McCabe, Gavin) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Gavin Geraghty McCabe on behalf of State of New York. (McCabe, Gavin) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Gavin Geraghty McCabe (McCabe, Gavin) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Brief of Amici Curiae County of Santa Clara and 19 Additional Local Governments and Officials in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byCounty of Santa Clara. (Rajendra, Raphael) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Raphael N. Rajendra on behalf of the County of Santa Clara, California and 19 Additional Local Governments and Officials (Rajendra, Raphael) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting #51 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14882496.) filed by Cummins Inc., General Assembly Space, Inc., Knotel, Inc., Levi Strauss & Co., LivHOME, Inc., Lush Cosmetics LLC, Mara Hoffman Inc., Minneapolis Regional Chamber of Commerce, Postmates Inc., Univision Communications Inc., Workplace Options, LLC, Zendesk Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Southwell, Alexander) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Brief re #36 MOTION to Stay and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction of Amicus Curiae 12 Businesses and Business Organizations filed byCummins Inc., General Assembly Space, Inc., Knotel, Inc., Levi Strauss & Co., LivHOME, Inc., Lush Cosmetics LLC, Mara Hoffman Inc., Minneapolis Regional Chamber of Commerce, Postmates Inc., Univision Communications Inc., Workplace Options, LLC, Zendesk Inc.. (Related document(s) #36 ) (Kleinbrodt, Julian) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Julian Wolfe Kleinbrodt (Kleinbrodt, Julian) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 8/26/2020 before Judge Lucy H. Koh by Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce, for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Mauler, Daniel) (Filed on 8/27/2020)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lucy H. Koh: Initial Case Management Conference held on 8/26/2020 from 2:02 PM - 3:24 PM (1 hour, 22 minutes). #45 Case Management Order memorializes all relevant information, deadlines, and rulings from the Conference. Further Case Management Conference SET for Monday, September 14, 2020 at 2:00 PM. The parties shall file their joint case management statement by September 11, 2020 at 5:00 PM. Total Time in Court: 1 hour, 22 minutes. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. Attorneys for Plaintiffs National Urban League; League of Women Voters; Black Alliance for Just Immigration; Harris County, Texas; King County, Washington; City of San Jose, California; Rodney Ellis; and Adrian Garcia: Melissa Sherry, Richard Bress, Ezra Rosenberg, Thomas Wolf, Ajay Saini, and Kelly Percival. Attorney for Plaintiff City of Los Angeles, California: Danielle Goldstein. Attorney for Plaintiff City of Salinas, California: Michael Mutalipassi. Attorneys for Defendants: Daniel Mauler and Brad Rosenberg. For transcript orders, please visit https://cand.uscourts.gov/transcripts (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/26/2020)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting #44 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Case Management Order. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/26/2020. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14860453.) filed by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of San Jose, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Saini, Ajay) (Filed on 8/25/2020)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting #35 Stipulation Regarding Preliminary Injunction Briefing, Page Counts, and Defendants' Response to Complaint. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2020)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Amit Makker on behalf of Plaintiffs National Urban League; League of Women Voters; Black Alliance for Just Immigration; Harris County, Texas; King County, Washington; City of San Jose, California; Rodney Ellis and Adrian Garcia (Makker, Amit) (Filed on 8/25/2020)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 8/25/2020)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Alice Kenealy (Kenealy, Kathleen) (Filed on 8/25/2020)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Joseph Dundas (Dundas, Michael) (Filed on 8/25/2020)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting #34 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2020)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Declaration of Sadik Huseny in Support of #36 MOTION to Stay and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byBlack Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15)(Related document(s) #36 ) (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 8/25/2020)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MOTION to Stay and, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League. Motion Hearing set for 9/17/2020 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 9/8/2020. Replies due by 9/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of John Thompson, #3 Declaration of D. Sunshine Hillygus, Ph.D., #4 Declaration of Dr. Thomas A. Louis, #5 Declaration of Andrew J. Westall, #6 Declaration of Maria de la Luz Garcia, #7 Declaration of Umair A. Shah, #8 Declaration of Adrian Garcia, #9 Declaration of Jared R. Briggs, #10 Declaration of Paul Wilden, #11 Declaration of Elizabeth Soto, #12 Declaration of Monica Gurmilan, #13 Declaration of Dwight Dively, #14 Declaration of Nana Gyamfi, #15 Declaration of Celina Stewart, #16 Declaration of Jeri Green, #17 Declaration of Rodney Ellis)(Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 8/25/2020) Modified on 10/5/2020 (lhklc3, COURT STAFF).
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Preliminary Injunction Briefing Schedule, Page Counts, and Defendants' Response to Complaint filed by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sadik Huseny, #2 Proposed Order)(Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 8/25/2020)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14856733.) filed by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of San Jose, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Rosenberg, Ezra) (Filed on 8/25/2020)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel D. Mauler on behalf of Defendants (Mauler, Daniel) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING ZOOM INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Per #31 Order, an Initial Case Management Conference is SET for 8/26/2020 at 2:00 PM. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lhk Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at lhkcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 8/25/2020 at 12:00pm noon PST.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Order Requiring Appearance and Setting Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/21/2020. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed by City of Los Angeles, California, Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Salinas, California, Rodney Ellis, League of Women Voters, City of San Jose, California, Harris County, Texas, National Urban League, Adrian Garcia, King County, Washington. Steven Dillingham served on 8/20/2020, answer due 10/19/2020; Wilbur L. Ross served on 8/20/2020, answer due 10/19/2020; U.S. Census Bureau served on 8/20/2020, answer due 10/19/2020; U.S. Department of Commerce served on 8/20/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. (Bauer, Steven) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to case Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 8/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER RELATING CASES by Judge Lucy H. Koh. The Court RELATES Case No. 5:20-cv-05799-NC, National Urban League et al v. Ross et al, to Case Nos. 5:20-cv-05167-LHK, City of San Jose, et al v. Donald J. Trump, et al, and 5:20-cv-05169 LHK, State of California, et al v. Donald J. Trump, et al. The Clerk shall reassign National Urban League et al v. Ross et al to Judge Lucy H. Koh. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING #16 APPLICATION of Attorney Gemma Donofrio Pro Hac Vice representing Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING #15 APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney Genevieve P. Hoffman Pro Hac Vice representing Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING #14 APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney Tyce R. Walters Pro Hac Vice representing Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING #12 APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney Anne W. Robinson Pro Hac Vice representing Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING #11 APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney Melissa Arbus Sherry Pro Hac Vice representing Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING #10 APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney Richard P. Bress representing Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING #5 APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney Wendy Weiser Pro Hac Vice representing Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING #4 APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney Kelly M. Percival Pro Hac Vice representing Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING #2 APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney Thomas P. Wolf Pro Hac Vice representing Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020).
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Summons Issued as to Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon Greenbaum (Greenbaum, Jon) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Gemma Donofrio ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14832380.) filed by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of San Jose, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Donofrio, Gemma) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Genevieve P. Hoffman ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14832370.) filed by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of San Jose, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Hoffman, Genevieve) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Tyce R. Walters ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14832361.) filed by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of San Jose, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Walters, Tyce) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon Danielle Lankenau on behalf of Plaintiffs National Urban League; League of Women Voters; Black Alliance for Just Immigration; Harris County, Texas; King County, Washington; City of San Jose, California; Rodney Ellis and Adrian Garcia (Lankenau, Shannon) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Anne W. Robinson ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14832323.) filed by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of San Jose, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Robinson, Anne) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Melissa Arbus Sherry ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14832288.) filed by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of San Jose, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Sherry, Melissa) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Richard P. Bress ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14832247.) filed by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of San Jose, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Bress, Richard) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Mark Bauer on behalf of Plaintiffs National Urban League; League of Women Voters; Black Alliance for Just Immigration; Harris County, Texas; King County, Washington; City of San Jose, California; Rodney Ellis and Adrian Garcia (Bauer, Steven) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Proposed Summons. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/11/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/18/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUA SPONTE Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Case 5:20-cv-05799 NC with 5:20-cv-05167 LHK and 5:20-cv-05169 LHK. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 8/18/2020. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Wendy Weiser ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14830320.) filed by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of San Jose, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service certificate of good standing)(Weiser, Wendy) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14830168.) filed by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of San Jose, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Percival, Kelly) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/1/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14829876.) filed by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of San Jose, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Wolf, Thomas) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0971-14828740) against Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce. Filed byCity of Los Angeles, California, Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Salinas, California, Rodney Ellis, League of Women Voters, City of San Jose, California, Harris County, Texas, National Urban League, Adrian Garcia, King County, Washington. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 8/18/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Urban League et al v. Ross et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Los Angeles, California
Represented By: Danielle Luce Goldstein
Represented By: Anne Wylde Robinson
Represented By: Melissa Arbus Sherry
Represented By: Steven Mark Bauer
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Represented By: Michael Joseph Dundas
Represented By: Kathleen Alice Kenealy
Represented By: Jon Greenbaum
Represented By: Michael Nelson Feuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: League of Women Voters
Represented By: Wendy R Weiser
Represented By: Anne Wylde Robinson
Represented By: Shannon Danielle Lankenau
Represented By: Richard P. Bress
Represented By: Thomas Patrick Wolf
Represented By: Gemma Donofrio
Represented By: Melissa Arbus Sherry
Represented By: Tyce Randall Walters
Represented By: Kelly Marita Percival
Represented By: Genevieve P. Hoffman
Represented By: Steven Mark Bauer
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Represented By: Ajay P Saini
Represented By: Pooja Chaudhuri
Represented By: Kristen Clarke
Represented By: Amit Makker
Represented By: Ezra D Rosenberg
Represented By: Jon Greenbaum
Represented By: Christine Casey Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Garcia
Represented By: Wendy R Weiser
Represented By: Anne Wylde Robinson
Represented By: Shannon Danielle Lankenau
Represented By: Richard P. Bress
Represented By: Thomas Patrick Wolf
Represented By: Gemma Donofrio
Represented By: Melissa Arbus Sherry
Represented By: Tyce Randall Walters
Represented By: Kelly Marita Percival
Represented By: Genevieve P. Hoffman
Represented By: Steven Mark Bauer
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Represented By: Ajay P Saini
Represented By: Kristen Clarke
Represented By: Amit Makker
Represented By: Ezra D Rosenberg
Represented By: Pooja Chaudhuri
Represented By: Jon Greenbaum
Represented By: Christine Casey Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: King County, Washington
Represented By: Wendy R Weiser
Represented By: Anne Wylde Robinson
Represented By: Shannon Danielle Lankenau
Represented By: Richard P. Bress
Represented By: Thomas Patrick Wolf
Represented By: Gemma Donofrio
Represented By: Melissa Arbus Sherry
Represented By: Tyce Randall Walters
Represented By: Kelly Marita Percival
Represented By: Genevieve P. Hoffman
Represented By: Steven Mark Bauer
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Represented By: Ajay P Saini
Represented By: Kristen Clarke
Represented By: Amit Makker
Represented By: Ezra D Rosenberg
Represented By: Pooja Chaudhuri
Represented By: Jon Greenbaum
Represented By: Christine Casey Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Urban League
Represented By: Wendy R Weiser
Represented By: Anne Wylde Robinson
Represented By: Shannon Danielle Lankenau
Represented By: Richard P. Bress
Represented By: Thomas Patrick Wolf
Represented By: Gemma Donofrio
Represented By: Melissa Arbus Sherry
Represented By: Tyce Randall Walters
Represented By: Kelly Marita Percival
Represented By: Genevieve P. Hoffman
Represented By: Steven Mark Bauer
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Represented By: Ajay P Saini
Represented By: Kristen Clarke
Represented By: Amit Makker
Represented By: Ezra D Rosenberg
Represented By: Pooja Chaudhuri
Represented By: Jon Greenbaum
Represented By: Christine Casey Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harris County, Texas
Represented By: Wendy R Weiser
Represented By: Anne Wylde Robinson
Represented By: Shannon Danielle Lankenau
Represented By: Richard P. Bress
Represented By: Thomas Patrick Wolf
Represented By: Gemma Donofrio
Represented By: Melissa Arbus Sherry
Represented By: Tyce Randall Walters
Represented By: Kelly Marita Percival
Represented By: Genevieve P. Hoffman
Represented By: Steven Mark Bauer
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Represented By: Ajay P Saini
Represented By: Kristen Clarke
Represented By: Amit Makker
Represented By: Ezra D Rosenberg
Represented By: Pooja Chaudhuri
Represented By: Jon Greenbaum
Represented By: Christine Casey Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of San Jose, California
Represented By: Wendy R Weiser
Represented By: Anne Wylde Robinson
Represented By: Shannon Danielle Lankenau
Represented By: Richard P. Bress
Represented By: Thomas Patrick Wolf
Represented By: Gemma Donofrio
Represented By: Melissa Arbus Sherry
Represented By: Tyce Randall Walters
Represented By: Kelly Marita Percival
Represented By: Genevieve P. Hoffman
Represented By: Steven Mark Bauer
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Represented By: Ajay P Saini
Represented By: Kristen Clarke
Represented By: Amit Makker
Represented By: Ezra D Rosenberg
Represented By: Pooja Chaudhuri
Represented By: Mark Dale Rosenbaum
Represented By: Jon Greenbaum
Represented By: Christine Casey Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Black Alliance For Just Immigration
Represented By: Wendy R Weiser
Represented By: Anne Wylde Robinson
Represented By: Shannon Danielle Lankenau
Represented By: Richard P. Bress
Represented By: Thomas Patrick Wolf
Represented By: Gemma Donofrio
Represented By: Melissa Arbus Sherry
Represented By: Tyce Randall Walters
Represented By: Kelly Marita Percival
Represented By: Genevieve P. Hoffman
Represented By: Steven Mark Bauer
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Represented By: Ajay P Saini
Represented By: Kristen Clarke
Represented By: Amit Makker
Represented By: Ezra D Rosenberg
Represented By: Pooja Chaudhuri
Represented By: Jon Greenbaum
Represented By: Maryum Jordan
Represented By: Christine Casey Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Salinas, California
Represented By: Christopher Alan Callihan
Represented By: Anne Wylde Robinson
Represented By: Melissa Arbus Sherry
Represented By: Steven Mark Bauer
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Represented By: Michael David Mutalipassi
Represented By: Jon Greenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Ellis
Represented By: Wendy R Weiser
Represented By: Anne Wylde Robinson
Represented By: Shannon Danielle Lankenau
Represented By: Richard P. Bress
Represented By: Thomas Patrick Wolf
Represented By: Gemma Donofrio
Represented By: Melissa Arbus Sherry
Represented By: Tyce Randall Walters
Represented By: Kelly Marita Percival
Represented By: Genevieve P. Hoffman
Represented By: Steven Mark Bauer
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Represented By: Ajay P Saini
Represented By: Kristen Clarke
Represented By: Amit Makker
Represented By: Ezra D Rosenberg
Represented By: Pooja Chaudhuri
Represented By: Jon Greenbaum
Represented By: Christine Casey Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Navajo Nation
Represented By: Anne Wylde Robinson
Represented By: Melissa Arbus Sherry
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Represented By: Pooja Chaudhuri
Represented By: Kristen Clarke
Represented By: Doreen McPaul
Represented By: Jason M Searle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Los Angeles, California
Represented By: Anne Wylde Robinson
Represented By: Melissa Arbus Sherry
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Represented By: David Ilan Holtzman
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Kappes
Represented By: Jacqueline Nicole Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People
Represented By: Anne Wylde Robinson
Represented By: Shannon Danielle Lankenau
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Represented By: Kelly Marita Percival
Represented By: Melissa Arbus Sherry
Represented By: Thomas Patrick Wolf
Represented By: Pooja Chaudhuri
Represented By: Kristen Clarke
Represented By: Amit Makker
Represented By: Wendy R Weiser
Represented By: Christine Casey Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Chicago, Illinois
Represented By: Anne Wylde Robinson
Represented By: Melissa Arbus Sherry
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Represented By: Mark Flessner
Represented By: Rafey Sarkis Balabanian
Represented By: Lily E. Hough
Represented By: Rebecca Hirsch
Represented By: Stephen J Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gila River Indian Community
Represented By: Anne Wylde Robinson
Represented By: Melissa Arbus Sherry
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Represented By: Donald R Pongrace
Represented By: Dario Joseph Frommer
Represented By: Merrill C Godfrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Census Bureau
Represented By: Jeffrey Bossert Clark
Represented By: Daniel D. Mauler
Represented By: Michael Andrew Zee
Represented By: Brad Prescott Rosenberg
Represented By: Alexander Sverdlov
Represented By: August Flentje
Represented By: Alexander Kenneth Haas
Represented By: Stephen Ehrlich
Represented By: Diane Kelleher
Represented By: John V Coghlan
Represented By: David Michael Morrell
Represented By: Ethan Price Davis
Represented By: Elliott M. Davis
Represented By: John Robinson
Represented By: Zachary Anthony Avallone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilbur L. Ross
Represented By: Jeffrey Bossert Clark
Represented By: Daniel D. Mauler
Represented By: Michael Andrew Zee
Represented By: Brad Prescott Rosenberg
Represented By: Alexander Sverdlov
Represented By: August Flentje
Represented By: Alexander Kenneth Haas
Represented By: Stephen Ehrlich
Represented By: Diane Kelleher
Represented By: David Michael Morrell
Represented By: Ethan Price Davis
Represented By: Elliott M. Davis
Represented By: John V Coghlan
Represented By: John Robinson
Represented By: Zachary Anthony Avallone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Dillingham
Represented By: Daniel D. Mauler
Represented By: Michael Andrew Zee
Represented By: Alexander Sverdlov
Represented By: August Flentje
Represented By: Stephen Ehrlich
Represented By: Brad Prescott Rosenberg
Represented By: Elliott M. Davis
Represented By: John V Coghlan
Represented By: John Robinson
Represented By: Zachary Anthony Avallone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Commerce
Represented By: Jeffrey Bossert Clark
Represented By: Daniel D. Mauler
Represented By: Michael Andrew Zee
Represented By: Brad Prescott Rosenberg
Represented By: Alexander Sverdlov
Represented By: August Flentje
Represented By: Alexander Kenneth Haas
Represented By: Stephen Ehrlich
Represented By: Diane Kelleher
Represented By: John V Coghlan
Represented By: David Michael Morrell
Represented By: Ethan Price Davis
Represented By: Elliott M. Davis
Represented By: John Robinson
Represented By: Zachary Anthony Avallone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wynn Coggins
Represented By: Alexander Sverdlov
Represented By: Alexander Kenneth Haas
Represented By: Brad Prescott Rosenberg
Represented By: Diane Kelleher
Represented By: Elliott M. Davis
Represented By: John Robinson
Represented By: Michael Andrew Zee
Represented By: Stephen Ehrlich
Represented By: Zachary Anthony Avallone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Ron Jarmin
Represented By: Alexander Sverdlov
Represented By: Alexander Kenneth Haas
Represented By: Brad Prescott Rosenberg
Represented By: Diane Kelleher
Represented By: Elliott M. Davis
Represented By: John Robinson
Represented By: Michael Andrew Zee
Represented By: Stephen Ehrlich
Represented By: Zachary Anthony Avallone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gina Raimondo
Represented By: Alexander Sverdlov
Represented By: Alexander Kenneth Haas
Represented By: Brad Prescott Rosenberg
Represented By: Diane Kelleher
Represented By: Elliott M. Davis
Represented By: John Robinson
Represented By: Michael Andrew Zee
Represented By: Stephen Ehrlich
Represented By: Zachary Anthony Avallone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Lush Cosmetics LLC
Represented By: Alexander H. Southwell
Represented By: Julian Wolfe Kleinbrodt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Zendesk Inc.
Represented By: Alexander H. Southwell
Represented By: Julian Wolfe Kleinbrodt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of New York
Represented By: Gavin Geraghty McCabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Postmates Inc.
Represented By: Alexander H. Southwell
Represented By: Julian Wolfe Kleinbrodt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Cummins Inc.
Represented By: Alexander H. Southwell
Represented By: Julian Wolfe Kleinbrodt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Levi Strauss & Co.
Represented By: Alexander H. Southwell
Represented By: Julian Wolfe Kleinbrodt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Mara Hoffman Inc.
Represented By: Alexander H. Southwell
Represented By: Julian Wolfe Kleinbrodt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Minneapolis Regional Chamber of Commerce
Represented By: Alexander H. Southwell
Represented By: Julian Wolfe Kleinbrodt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: General Assembly Space, Inc.
Represented By: Alexander H. Southwell
Represented By: Julian Wolfe Kleinbrodt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Univision Communications Inc.
Represented By: Alexander H. Southwell
Represented By: Julian Wolfe Kleinbrodt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LivHOME, Inc.
Represented By: Alexander H. Southwell
Represented By: Julian Wolfe Kleinbrodt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Knotel, Inc.
Represented By: Alexander H. Southwell
Represented By: Julian Wolfe Kleinbrodt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: County of Santa Clara
Represented By: Raphael N. Rajendra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Workplace Options, LLC
Represented By: Alexander H. Southwell
Represented By: Julian Wolfe Kleinbrodt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: State of Louisiana
Represented By: Stephen Michael Duvernay
Represented By: Jeff Landry
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Represented By: Joseph Scott St. John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: State of Mississippi
Represented By: Stephen Michael Duvernay
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Represented By: Lynn Fitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?