Sierra Forest Legacy et al v. U.S. Fish & Wildlife Service et al
Plaintiff: Sierra Forest Legacy, Defenders of Wildlife and Center For Biological Diversity
Defendant: David Bernhardt, U.S. Fish & Wildlife Service and Aurelia Skipwith
Case Number: 5:2020cv05800
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Referring Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 16:1538
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sierra Forest Legacy, Center For Biological Diversity, Defenders of Wildlife. David Bernhardt served on 9/3/2020, answer due 11/2/2020; Aurelia Skipwith served on 9/3/2020, answer due 11/2/2020; U.S. Fish & Wildlife Service served on 9/3/2020, answer due 11/2/2020. (Forsyth, Elizabeth) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
September 7, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Please re-file in its entirety as Summons Returned Executed. Re: #12 Certificate of Service filed by Sierra F orest Legacy, Center For Biological Diversity, Defenders of Wildlife (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Center For Biological Diversity, Defenders of Wildlife, Sierra Forest Legacy re #4 Notice of Appearance, #1 Complaint, #8 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge, #2 Proposed Summons, #7 Summons Issued as to USA, 9 Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only,,, #3 Certificate of Interested Entities, 5 Case Assigned by Intake,,, #10 Order Reassigning Case,,, Case Assigned/Reassigned,, #6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, 11 Clerk's Notice,, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings, (Forsyth, Elizabeth) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
August 26, 2020 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.Case Management Statement due by 12/3/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/10/2020 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 8/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2020)
August 24, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 24, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Center For Biological Diversity, Defenders of Wildlife, Sierra Forest Legacy.. (Forsyth, Elizabeth) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to David Bernhardt, Aurelia Skipwith, U.S. Fish & Wildlife Service, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/10/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/17/2020 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/1/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory C. Loarie (Loarie, Gregory) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Center For Biological Diversity, Defenders of Wildlife, Sierra Forest Legacy (Forsyth, Elizabeth) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Forsyth, Elizabeth) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against David Bernhardt, Aurelia Skipwith, U.S. Fish & Wildlife Service ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14828797.). Filed bySierra Forest Legacy, Center For Biological Diversity, Defenders of Wildlife. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Forsyth, Elizabeth) (Filed on 8/18/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sierra Forest Legacy et al v. U.S. Fish & Wildlife Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Bernhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Fish & Wildlife Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurelia Skipwith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Forest Legacy
Represented By: Elizabeth Britta Forsyth
Represented By: Gregory C. Loarie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Defenders of Wildlife
Represented By: Elizabeth Britta Forsyth
Represented By: Gregory C. Loarie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center For Biological Diversity
Represented By: Elizabeth Britta Forsyth
Represented By: Gregory C. Loarie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?