Dali Wireless, Inc. v. Corning Optical Communications LLC
Plaintiff: DALI WIRELESS, INC.
Defendant: Corning Optical Communications LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv06469
Filed: September 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Filing 33 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 9/23/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
September 16, 2020 Filing 32 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/8/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/15/2020 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
September 16, 2020 Filing 31 Case transferred in from District of North Carolina Western; Case Number 3:19-cv-00714. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 15, 2020 Acknowledged receipt of electronically transferred case by USDC Southern District of California, their civil action no. 3:20-cv-1813. (rth)
September 11, 2020 Filing 30 REPORT on the Determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark numbers contained in complaint. (clc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/15/2020: #1 Complaint, #2 Order Granting Motion to Transfer) (brl).
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER overruling #27 Objection to Magistrate Judge's Decision (Rule 72(a)) re #26 Memorandum & Opinion Order Terminate Motions, adopting #26 Memorandum & Opinion, granting #27 Motion to Transfer. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 9/11/20. (clc)
August 12, 2020 Filing 28 RESPONSE re #27 Objection to Magistrate Judge's Decision (Rule 72(a)) re #26 Memorandum & Opinion,,, Order,,, Terminate Motions,, Plaintiff Dali Wireless, Inc.'s Written Objections to Memorandum and Order by Corning Optical Communications LLC. (Barton, Ross)
August 3, 2020 Filing 27 Objection to Magistrate Judge's Decision (Rule 72(a)) re #26 Memorandum & Opinion,,, Order,,, Terminate Motions,, Plaintiff Dali Wireless, Inc.'s Written Objections to Memorandum and Order. Responses due by 8/17/2020 (Grimes, J.)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting #23 MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California. The Clerk is directed to hold the file in this case until fourteen days after service of this Memorandum and Order when the parties right of appeal to the Honorable Frank D. Whitney expires. If no party appeals this Order, then the Clerk is directed to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 7/22/2020. (mek)
July 6, 2020 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #23 MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California by Corning Optical Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Michael J. Newton, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Barton, Ross)
June 29, 2020 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #23 MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California by Dali Wireless, Inc.. Replies due by 7/6/2020 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dr. Albert Lee, PHD, #2 Declaration of Cristofer I. Leffler, #3 Exhibit 1 to Leffler Declaration, #4 Exhibit 2 to Leffler Declaration, #5 Exhibit 3 to Leffler Declaration, #6 Exhibit 4 to Leffler Declaration, #7 Exhibit 5 to Leffler Declaration, #8 Exhibit 6 to Leffler Declaration, #9 Exhibit 7 to Leffler Declaration, #10 Exhibit 8 to Leffler Declaration, #11 Exhibit 9 to Leffler Declaration, #12 Exhibit 10 to Leffler Declaration, #13 Exhibit 11 to Leffler Declaration, #14 Exhibit 12 to Leffler Declaration, #15 Exhibit 13 to Leffler Declaration, #16 Exhibit 14 to Leffler Declaration, #17 Exhibit 15 to Leffler Declaration)(Grimes, J.)
June 15, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California by Corning Optical Communications LLC. Responses due by 6/29/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit of Shirish Nagaraj, #3 Affidavit of Ross Barton, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14, #18 Exhibit 15, #19 Exhibit 16, #20 Exhibit 17, #21 Exhibit 18, #22 Exhibit 19, #23 Exhibit 20)(Barton, Ross). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
June 15, 2020 Filing 22 CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan Utility Patent Certificate of Initial Attorneys' Conference (Grimes, J.)
June 8, 2020 SECOND Notice to Katherine G. Rubschlager: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 6/15/2020. (tmg)
June 2, 2020 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 5 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 6/22/2020. (brl)
May 28, 2020 Notice to Katherine G. Rubschlager: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 6/4/2020. (mek)
May 28, 2020 Notice to Sang Lee: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 6/4/2020. (mek)
May 28, 2020 Notice to Michael J. Newton: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 6/4/2020. (mek)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Michael J. Newton for Corning Optical Communications LLC; granting #19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Sang Lee for Corning Optical Communications LLC; granting #20 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Katherine G. Rubschlager for Corning Optical Communications LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 5/27/2020. (mek)
May 26, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Katherine G. Rubschlager Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4507082. by Corning Optical Communications LLC. (Barton, Ross). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
May 26, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Sang (Michael) Lee Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4507079. by Corning Optical Communications LLC. (Barton, Ross). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
May 26, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Michael J. Newton Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4507068. by Corning Optical Communications LLC. (Barton, Ross). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
May 26, 2020 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Corning Optical Communications LLC (Barton, Ross)
May 26, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint, by Corning Optical Communications LLC.(Barton, Ross)
May 13, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Bailey King, Jr on behalf of Dali Wireless, Inc. (King, C.)
May 11, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Dali Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Cristofer Leffler)(Grimes, J.)
May 11, 2020 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Dali Wireless, Inc.. Corning Optical Communications LLC served on 5/4/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Federal Express Tracking, #2 Exhibit B - Certified Mail Tracking)(Grimes, J.)
May 1, 2020 Notice to Michael C. Saunders: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 5/8/2020. (mek)
May 1, 2020 Notice to David Schumann: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 5/8/2020. (mek)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added David Schumann for Dali Wireless, Inc.; granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Michael C. Saunders for Dali Wireless, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 5/1/2020. (mek)
May 1, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Michael C. Saunders Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4480159. by Dali Wireless, Inc.. (Grimes, J.). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
May 1, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to David Schumann Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4480153. by Dali Wireless, Inc.. (Grimes, J.). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
May 1, 2020 Filing 9 REPORT on the Filing of an action regarding patent and/or trademark numbers contained in the amended complaint. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint) (brl)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to show cause by May 15, 2020, why service was not completed within the required time limit, or, if Defendanthas been served, to provide an affidavit of service within that time. Show Cause Response due by 5/15/2020.. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 4/30/20. (clc)
April 30, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Corning Optical Communications LLC, filed by Dali Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - '261 Patent, #2 Exhibit B - '358 Patent, #3 Exhibit C - '454 Patent)(Grimes, J.)
January 8, 2020 Notice to Cristofer Leffler: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 1/15/2020. (mek)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Cristofer Leffler for Dali Wireless, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 1/8/2020. (mek)
January 8, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Cristofer Leffler Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4328064. by Dali Wireless, Inc.. (Grimes, J.). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
December 31, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT on the Filing of an action regarding patent and/or trademark numbers contained in complaint. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (brj) (Main Document 4 replaced on 1/2/2020) (brl).
December 31, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Corning Optical Communications LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (brj)
December 31, 2019 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (brj)
December 31, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brj)
December 30, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DALI WIRELESS, INC. (Grimes, J.)
December 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Corning Optical Communications LLC with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4316502), filed by Dali Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - '074 Patent, #2 Exhibit B - '766 Patent)(Grimes, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dali Wireless, Inc. v. Corning Optical Communications LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corning Optical Communications LLC
Represented By: Michael John Newton
Represented By: Katherine Grayce Rubschlager
Represented By: Sang Lee
Represented By: Ross Ritter Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DALI WIRELESS, INC.
Represented By: C. Bailey King, Jr.
Represented By: David Douglas Schumann
Represented By: J. Douglas Grimes
Represented By: Michael C. Saunders
Represented By: Cristofer I. Leffler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?