Villavisencio v. Saul
Plaintiff: Magaly Villavisencio
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 5:2020cv06620
Filed: September 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Andrew M. Saul.. (Wiesbrock, Stacy) (Filed on 10/28/2020)
October 8, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Magaly Villavisencio.. (Kons, Joshua) (Filed on 10/8/2020)
October 7, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 10/21/2020. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2020)
September 30, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2020)
September 25, 2020 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Kons, Joshua) (Filed on 9/25/2020)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 9/23/2020. (vkdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2020)
September 22, 2020 Filing 3 SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER: (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2020)
September 22, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/6/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2020)
September 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14968770.). Filed byMagaly Villavisencio. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kons, Joshua) (Filed on 9/21/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Villavisencio v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Stacy Elisabeth Wiesbrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Magaly Villavisencio
Represented By: Joshua Bradford Kons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?