California Sportfishing Protection Alliance v. Metech Recycling, Inc
Plaintiff: California Sportfishing Protection Alliance
Defendant: Metech Recycling, Inc
Case Number: 5:2020cv06872
Filed: October 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33 U.S.C. ยง 1319
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by California Sportfishing Protection Alliance. Service waived by Metech Recycling, Inc waiver sent on 10/23/2020, answer due 12/22/2020. (Barnes, Anthony) (Filed on 11/18/2020)
November 18, 2020 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Richard Dongell, counsel for defendant on 10/23/2020 by California Sportfishing Protection Alliance. Waiver of Service due by 11/23/2020. (Barnes, Anthony) (Filed on 11/18/2020)
November 9, 2020 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE RE CONTINUANCE OF 1/5/21 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO 1/12/21.Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/12/21 09:30 AM before Magistrate Susan van Keulen. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Case Management Statement due by 1/5/21.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/svk General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2020)
October 13, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by California Sportfishing Protection Alliance.. (Barnes, Anthony) (Filed on 10/13/2020)
October 1, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Metech Recycling, Inc. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2020)
October 1, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/29/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/5/2021 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2020)
October 1, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/15/2020. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2020)
October 1, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by California Sportfishing Protection Alliance (Barnes, Anthony) (Filed on 10/1/2020)
October 1, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Barnes, Anthony) (Filed on 10/1/2020)
October 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Metech Recycling, Inc ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-15012225.). Filed byCalifornia Sportfishing Protection Alliance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit NOI, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Barnes, Anthony) (Filed on 10/1/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: California Sportfishing Protection Alliance v. Metech Recycling, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Sportfishing Protection Alliance
Represented By: Anthony Michael Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metech Recycling, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?