Doe et al v. Google LLC et al
Plaintiff: ROBERT DOE, POLLY ST. GEORGE, SARAH WESTALL, JAMES DOE, JEFF PEDERSEN, DAVID J HAYES, MATTHEW DOE, MISHEL MCCUMBER, CHRISTOPHER DOE, JOHN DOE, SCOTT DEGROAT, DANIEL LEE, HENRY DOE, JORDAN SATHER, MICHAEL DOE and David J. Hayes
Defendant: YouTube LLC and Google LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv07502
Filed: October 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Referring Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING #31 STIPULATION TO CHANGE TIME TO RESPOND TO FAC. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/4/2020.(blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2020)
December 3, 2020 Filing 31 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Change Time Regarding Response to First Amended Complaint filed by Google LLC, YouTube LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lauren Gallo White, #2 Proposed Order)(White, Lauren) (Filed on 12/3/2020)
November 17, 2020 Filing 30 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs. Filed byJohn Doe. (Armenta, Maria) (Filed on 11/17/2020)
November 9, 2020 Filing 29 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/02/2020, before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, telephone number summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #26 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 11/30/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/10/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/8/2021. (Related documents(s) #26 ) (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 11/9/2020)
November 4, 2020 Filing 28 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/2/2020 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by John Doe, for Court Reporter Summer Clanton. (Armenta, Maria) (Filed on 11/4/2020)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER DENYING #8 APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/3/2020.(blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2020)
November 3, 2020 Filing 26 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on November 2, 2020 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by Google LLC, YouTube LLC, for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (White, Lauren) (Filed on 11/3/2020)
November 3, 2020 Filing 25 Declaration of Lauren Gallo White in Support of #21 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byGoogle LLC, YouTube LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #21 ) (White, Lauren) (Filed on 11/3/2020)
November 2, 2020 Filing 24 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Labson Freeman: Motion Hearing held on 11/2/2020 re #8 Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order and for Order Why Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue filed by James Doe.Oral argument heard. The Court takes the matter under submission, written order to be issued.Total Time in Court: 1:18. Court Reporter: Summer Fisher. Plaintiff Attorney: Maria C. Armenta via Zoom Webinar. Defendant Attorney: Lauren Gallo White via Zoom Webinar. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/2/2020)
October 31, 2020 Filing 23 REPLY (re #8 Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order and for Order Why Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue ) filed byJohn Doe. (Armenta, Maria) (Filed on 10/31/2020)
October 30, 2020 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Google LLC, YouTube LLC identifying Corporate Parent Alphabet Inc., Corporate Parent XXVI Holdings Inc. for Google LLC, YouTube LLC. (White, Lauren) (Filed on 10/30/2020)
October 30, 2020 Filing 21 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #8 Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order and for Order Why Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue ) filed byGoogle LLC, YouTube LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of YouTube Representative, #2 Declaration of David H. Kramer)(White, Lauren) (Filed on 10/30/2020)
October 28, 2020 Filing 20 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AFTER REASSIGNMENT. Case Management Statement due by 1/28/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/4/2021 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2020)
October 28, 2020 Filing 19 Declaration of M. Cris Armenta in Support of #18 Order Re Service of Initiating Papers, Ex Parte Application and Supporting Documents, Courts Orders filed byJohn Doe. (Related document(s) #18 ) (Armenta, Maria) (Filed on 10/28/2020)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO SERVE DEFENDANTS WITH NOTICE OF #16 ORDER TO RESPOND BY 3:00PM TODAY, FILE PROOF OF SERVICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/28/2020. (blflc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2020)
October 28, 2020 Filing 17 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING as to #8 Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order and for Order Why Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue filed by JAMES DOE. Motion Hearing set for 11/2/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Beth Labson Freeman will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/blf Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at blfcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than October 30, 2020 at 2:00 PM PST.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2020)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO #8 APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/28/2020. (blflc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2020)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi remains as referral judge assigned to Case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 10/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 27, 2020 Filing 14 Declaration of M. CRIS ARMENTA, LINDSEY CRAWLEY and JOHN DOE, MICHAEL DOE, JAMES DOE, HENRY DOE, ROBERT DOE, CHRISTOPHER DOE, MATTHEW DOE, POLLY ST. GEORGE, SCOTT DEGROAT, DAVID J. HAYES, DANIEL LEE, MISHEL McCUMBER, JEFF PEDERSEN, JORDAN SATHER, SARAH WESTALL in Support of #8 Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order and for Order Why Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue filed byJOHN DOE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q)(Related document(s) #8 ) (Armenta, Maria) (Filed on 10/27/2020)
October 27, 2020 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Google LLC. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2020)
October 27, 2020 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to YouTube LLC. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2020)
October 27, 2020 Filing 11 Declaration of Lauren Gallo White in Support of #8 Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order and for Order Why Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue filed byJOHN DOE. (Related document(s) #8 ) (Armenta, Maria) (Filed on 10/27/2020)
October 27, 2020 Filing 10 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/19/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/26/2021 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 27, 2020 Filing 9 Proposed Order re #8 Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order and for Order Why Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue by JOHN DOE. (Armenta, Maria) (Filed on 10/27/2020)
October 27, 2020 Filing 8 Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order and for Order Why Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue filed by JAMES DOE. (Armenta, Maria) (Filed on 10/27/2020)
October 27, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 27, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by JOHN DOE.. (Armenta, Maria) (Filed on 10/27/2020)
October 27, 2020 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/10/2020. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2020)
October 26, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear or Proceed under Pseudonyms ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of M. Cris Armenta filed by JOHN DOE. (Armenta, Maria) (Filed on 10/26/2020)
October 26, 2020 #Electronic filing error. A motion and proposed order to proceed as Doe must be filed before the case will be assigned. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office unti l l such motion and proposed order is received. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by JOHN DOE (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2020)
October 26, 2020 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet by JOHN DOE . (Armenta, Maria) (Filed on 10/26/2020)
October 26, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Armenta, Maria) (Filed on 10/26/2020)
October 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Breach of Contract, Breach of the Covenant of Good Faith and Fair Dealing, and for Violation of the First Amendment against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-15111166.). Filed byJOHN DOE. (Armenta, Maria) (Filed on 10/26/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe et al v. Google LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT DOE
Represented By: Maria Cristina Armenta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: POLLY ST. GEORGE
Represented By: Maria Cristina Armenta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SARAH WESTALL
Represented By: Maria Cristina Armenta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES DOE
Represented By: Maria Cristina Armenta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFF PEDERSEN
Represented By: Maria Cristina Armenta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID J HAYES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHEW DOE
Represented By: Maria Cristina Armenta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MISHEL MCCUMBER
Represented By: Maria Cristina Armenta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER DOE
Represented By: Maria Cristina Armenta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN DOE
Represented By: Maria Cristina Armenta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCOTT DEGROAT
Represented By: Maria Cristina Armenta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL LEE
Represented By: Maria Cristina Armenta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HENRY DOE
Represented By: Maria Cristina Armenta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JORDAN SATHER
Represented By: Maria Cristina Armenta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL DOE
Represented By: Maria Cristina Armenta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David J. Hayes
Represented By: Maria Cristina Armenta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YouTube LLC
Represented By: Lauren Gallo White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google LLC
Represented By: Lauren Gallo White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?