D'Arrigo Bros. Co., of California v. Andrew Smith Company, LLC
Plaintiff: D'Arrigo Bros. Co., of California
Defendant: Andrew Smith Company, LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv07562
Filed: October 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Referring Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07 U.S.C. ยง 499
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2020 Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Andrew Smith Company, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Stuart, Rissa) (Filed on 12/4/2020)
November 23, 2020 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AFTER REASSIGNMENT.Case Management Statement due by 3/11/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/18/2021 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2020)
November 20, 2020 Filing 12 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byAndrew Smith Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Stuart, Rissa) (Filed on 11/20/2020)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 11/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2020)
November 16, 2020 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2020)
November 16, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by D'Arrigo Bros. Co., of California.. (Meuers, Lawrence) (Filed on 11/16/2020)
November 16, 2020 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 11/30/2020. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2020)
November 2, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by D'Arrigo Bros. Co., of California. Andrew Smith Company, LLC served on 10/30/2020, answer due 11/20/2020. (Meuers, Lawrence) (Filed on 11/2/2020)
October 28, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Andrew Smith Company, LLC. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2020)
October 28, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/19/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/26/2021 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2020)
October 28, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/12/2020. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2020)
October 28, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Meuers, Lawrence) (Filed on 10/28/2020)
October 28, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by D'Arrigo Bros. Co., of California (Meuers, Lawrence) (Filed on 10/28/2020)
October 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-15124124.). Filed byD'Arrigo Bros. Co., of California. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Agreement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Meuers, Lawrence) (Filed on 10/28/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: D'Arrigo Bros. Co., of California v. Andrew Smith Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D'Arrigo Bros. Co., of California
Represented By: Lawrence Henry Meuers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Smith Company, LLC
Represented By: Rissa Ann Stuart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?