G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC v. Miranda et al
Plaintiff: G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC
Defendant: Ismael M. Miranda individually and d/b/a El Agave Restaurant and El Agave Restaurant, Inc. an unknown business entity d/b/a El Agave Restaurant
Case Number: 5:2020cv07684
Filed: October 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Ismael M. Miranda. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2020)
November 23, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE RE CONTINUANCE OF 2/2/21 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO 2/9/21.Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/9/2021 09:30 AM. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Case Management Statement due by 2/2/2021. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/svk General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with th is entry.)(jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2020)
November 5, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC.. (Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 11/5/2020)
November 2, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to El Agave Restaurant, Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2020)
November 2, 2020 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/26/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/2/2021 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2020)
October 31, 2020 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/16/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2020)
October 31, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 10/31/2020)
October 31, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 10/31/2020)
October 31, 2020 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC (Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 10/31/2020)
October 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-15139430.). Filed byG & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 10/31/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC v. Miranda et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ismael M. Miranda individually and d/b/a El Agave Restaurant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Agave Restaurant, Inc. an unknown business entity d/b/a El Agave Restaurant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC
Represented By: Thomas Peter Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?