Santa Cruz Lesbian and Gay Community Center et al v. Trump et al
Plaintiff: Bradbury-Sullivan LGBT Community Center, Santa Cruz Lesbian and Gay Community Center doing business as Diversity Center of Santa Cruz, AIDS Foundation of Chicago, Los Angeles LGBT Center, Services and Advocacy for GLBT Elders, B. Brown Consulting, LLC, NO/AIDS Task Force doing business as CrescentCare and Dr. Ward Carpenter
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II, Robert Wilkie, U.S. Department of Justice, Eugene Scalia, Jon Parrish Peede, U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development, National Endowment for the Arts, National Endowment for the Humanities, Office of Management and Budget, Mary Anne Carter, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Labor, William Pelham Barr, Russell T. Vought, Craig E. Leen, U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs, Benjamin Solomon Carson, Sr. and Donald J. Trump
Amicus Curiae: Eight Institutions of Higher Education, City of Seattle and 20 Cities and Counties and NEW TEACHER CENTER
Case Number: 5:2020cv07741
Filed: November 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Referring Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER APPROVING #84 JOINT STIPULATION PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 6-1(a) EXTENDING DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT BY 30 DAYS TO FEBRUARY 3, 2020. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/30/2020. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2020)
December 29, 2020 Filing 84 STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT BY 30 DAYS filed by Alex M. Azar, II, William Pelham Barr, Benjamin Solomon Carson, Sr, Mary Anne Carter, Craig E. Leen, National Endowment for the Arts, National Endowment for the Humanities, Office of Management and Budget, Jon Parrish Peede, Eugene Scalia, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Department of Labor, U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs, Russell T. Vought, Robert Wilkie. (Avallone, Zachary) (Filed on 12/29/2020)
December 23, 2020 Filing 83 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Victoria Stilwell (Stilwell, Victoria) (Filed on 12/23/2020)
December 23, 2020 Filing 82 NOTICE of Appearance by LiJia Gong (Gong, LiJia) (Filed on 12/23/2020)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/22/2020. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2020)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER GRANTING IN PART #51 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR A NATIONWIDE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/22/2020. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2020)
December 16, 2020 Filing 79 NOTICE by AIDS Foundation of Chicago, B. Brown Consulting, LLC, Bradbury-Sullivan LGBT Community Center, Ward Carpenter, Los Angeles LGBT Center, NO/AIDS Task Force, Santa Cruz Lesbian and Gay Community Center, Services and Advocacy for GLBT Elders of Amended [Proposed] Order Granting Motion for Nationwide Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Amended] Granting Motion for Nationwide Preliminary Injunction)(Johnson Palmer, Anne) (Filed on 12/16/2020)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER GRANTING #76 NEW TEACHER CENTER'S MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/10/2020. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2020)
December 10, 2020 Filing 77 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Labson Freeman: Motion Hearing held on 12/10/2020.Oral Argument Heard, Matter taken under submission. Written Order to be Issued. Total Time in Court: 2:15. Court Reporter: Summer Fisher. Plaintiff Attorney: Zachary Avallone, Brad Rosenberg via Zoom Webinar. Defendant Attorney: Douglas Hallward-Driemeier, Anne Palmer, Kristen Mayer, Jennifer Pizer, Camilla Taylor via Zoom Webinar. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/10/2020)
December 9, 2020 Filing 76 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief In Support Of Plaintiffs' Motion For Preliminary Injunction filed by NEW TEACHER CENTER. Motion Hearing set for 12/10/2020 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 12/23/2020. Replies due by 12/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--Proposed Amicus Brief, #2 Exhibit B--Proposed Order)(Persyn, Mary) (Filed on 12/9/2020)
December 9, 2020 Filing 75 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Chassica Soo on behalf of NEW TEACHER CENTER. (Soo, Chassica) (Filed on 12/9/2020)
December 9, 2020 Filing 74 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Chassica Soo on behalf of NEW TEACHER CENTER. (Soo, Chassica) (Filed on 12/9/2020)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER GRANTING #71 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AS AMICI CURIAE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/4/2020. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2020)
December 3, 2020 Filing 72 CLERKS NOTICE CONVERTING MOTION HEARING TO ZOOM WEBINAR HEARING. Motion Hearing as to #51 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction set for 12/10/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Beth Labson Freeman will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/blf Court Appearances: Advanced notice is requ ired of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at blfcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than December 8, 2020 at 2:00 PM PST.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2020)
December 3, 2020 Filing 71 MOTION for Leave to File Brief as Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by City of Seattle and 20 Cities and Counties. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amicus Brief, #2 Proposed Order)(Stilwell, Victoria) (Filed on 12/3/2020)
December 1, 2020 Filing 70 REPLY (re #51 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) (in Support) filed byAIDS Foundation of Chicago, B. Brown Consulting, LLC, Bradbury-Sullivan LGBT Community Center, Ward Carpenter, Los Angeles LGBT Center, NO/AIDS Task Force, Santa Cruz Lesbian and Gay Community Center, Services and Advocacy for GLBT Elders. (Johnson Palmer, Anne) (Filed on 12/1/2020)
November 25, 2020 Filing 68 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #51 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) filed byAlex M. Azar, II, William Pelham Barr, Benjamin Solomon Carson, Sr, Mary Anne Carter, Craig E. Leen, National Endowment for the Arts, National Endowment for the Humanities, Office of Management and Budget, Jon Parrish Peede, Eugene Scalia, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Department of Labor, U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs, Russell T. Vought, Robert Wilkie. (Avallone, Zachary) (Filed on 11/25/2020)
November 24, 2020 Filing 69 Amicus Brief in Support of #51 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Counsel for Proposed Amici Curiae. (Related document(s) #51 ) (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2020)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER GRANTING #62 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE (re attorney Noah B. Bokat-Lindell). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/24/2020. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2020)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER GRANTING #61 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE (re attorney Elizabeth B. Deutsch). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/24/2020. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2020)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER GRANTING #60 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE (re attorney Kathryn L. Wynbrandt). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/24/2020. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2020)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER GRANTING #59 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE (re attorney Ishan K. Bhabha). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/24/2020. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2020)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER GRANTING #58 UNOPPOSED MOTION OF 8 INSTITUTIONS OF HIGHER EDUCATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AS AMICI CURIAE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/24/2020. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2020)
November 24, 2020 Filing 62 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15233419.) filed by Eight Institutions of Higher Education. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Bokat-Lindell, Noah) (Filed on 11/24/2020)
November 24, 2020 Filing 61 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15233291.) filed by Eight Institutions of Higher Education. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Deutsch, Elizabeth) (Filed on 11/24/2020)
November 24, 2020 Filing 60 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15233258.) filed by Eight Institutions of Higher Education. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Wynbrandt, Kathryn) (Filed on 11/24/2020)
November 23, 2020 Filing 59 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15231335.) filed by Eight Institutions of Higher Education. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Bhabha, Ishan) (Filed on 11/23/2020)
November 23, 2020 Filing 58 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief - Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Brief as Amici Curiae In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction filed by Eight Institutions of Higher Education. Responses due by 12/7/2020. Replies due by 12/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Amicus Brief, #2 Proposed Order)(Hauck, Brian) (Filed on 11/23/2020)
November 17, 2020 Filing 57 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NO/AIDS Task Force, Santa Cruz Lesbian and Gay Community Center, Bradbury-Sullivan LGBT Community Center, Los Angeles LGBT Center, Services and Advocacy for GLBT Elders, AIDS Foundation of Chicago, Ward Carpenter, B. Brown Consulting, LLC. Donald J. Trump served on 11/5/2020, answer due 1/4/2021. (Johnson Palmer, Anne) (Filed on 11/17/2020)
November 17, 2020 Filing 56 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NO/AIDS Task Force, Santa Cruz Lesbian and Gay Community Center, Bradbury-Sullivan LGBT Community Center, Los Angeles LGBT Center, Services and Advocacy for GLBT Elders, AIDS Foundation of Chicago, Ward Carpenter, B. Brown Consulting, LLC. Russell T. Vought served on 11/5/2020, answer due 1/4/2021. (Johnson Palmer, Anne) (Filed on 11/17/2020)
November 17, 2020 Filing 55 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NO/AIDS Task Force, Santa Cruz Lesbian and Gay Community Center, Bradbury-Sullivan LGBT Community Center, Los Angeles LGBT Center, Services and Advocacy for GLBT Elders, AIDS Foundation of Chicago, Ward Carpenter, B. Brown Consulting, LLC. Office of Management and Budget served on 11/5/2020, answer due 1/4/2021. (Johnson Palmer, Anne) (Filed on 11/17/2020)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER REQUESTING CHAMBERS COPIES. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/17/2020. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2020)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER GRANTING #52 STIPULATION, AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/17/2020. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 12/10/2020 09:00 AM.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2020)
November 16, 2020 Filing 52 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Changing Time for Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Nationwide Preliminary Injunction filed by AIDS Foundation of Chicago, B. Brown Consulting, LLC, Bradbury-Sullivan LGBT Community Center, Ward Carpenter, Los Angeles LGBT Center, NO/AIDS Task Force, Santa Cruz Lesbian and Gay Community Center, Services and Advocacy for GLBT Elders. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Johnson Palmer, Anne) (Filed on 11/16/2020)
November 16, 2020 Filing 51 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by AIDS Foundation of Chicago, B. Brown Consulting, LLC, Bradbury-Sullivan LGBT Community Center, Ward Carpenter, Los Angeles LGBT Center, NO/AIDS Task Force, Santa Cruz Lesbian and Gay Community Center, Services and Advocacy for GLBT Elders. Responses due by 11/30/2020. Replies due by 12/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration, #4 Declaration, #5 Declaration, #6 Declaration, #7 Declaration, #8 Declaration, #9 Declaration, #10 Proposed Order)(Johnson Palmer, Anne) (Filed on 11/16/2020)
November 16, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Elliott M. Davis on behalf of Defendants (Davis, Elliott) (Filed on 11/16/2020)
November 16, 2020 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary Anthony Avallone on behalf of Defendants. (Avallone, Zachary) (Filed on 11/16/2020)
November 16, 2020 Filing 48 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AFTER REASSIGNMENT. Case Management Statement due by 3/18/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/25/2021 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2020)
November 13, 2020 Filing 47 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AIDS Foundation of Chicago, B. Brown Consulting, LLC, Bradbury-Sullivan LGBT Community Center, Ward Carpenter, Los Angeles LGBT Center, NO/AIDS Task Force, Santa Cruz Lesbian and Gay Community Center, Services and Advocacy for GLBT Elders of summonses and complaint on the United States Attorney for the Northern District of California (Johnson Palmer, Anne) (Filed on 11/13/2020)
November 13, 2020 Filing 46 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AIDS Foundation of Chicago, B. Brown Consulting, LLC, Bradbury-Sullivan LGBT Community Center, Ward Carpenter, Los Angeles LGBT Center, NO/AIDS Task Force, Santa Cruz Lesbian and Gay Community Center, Services and Advocacy for GLBT Elders of summonses and complaint on the U.S. Attorney General (Johnson Palmer, Anne) (Filed on 11/13/2020)
November 13, 2020 Filing 45 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NO/AIDS Task Force, Santa Cruz Lesbian and Gay Community Center, Bradbury-Sullivan LGBT Community Center, Los Angeles LGBT Center, Services and Advocacy for GLBT Elders, AIDS Foundation of Chicago, Ward Carpenter, B. Brown Consulting, LLC. William Pelham Barr served on 11/5/2020, answer due 1/4/2021. (Johnson Palmer, Anne) (Filed on 11/13/2020)
November 13, 2020 Filing 44 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NO/AIDS Task Force, Santa Cruz Lesbian and Gay Community Center, Bradbury-Sullivan LGBT Community Center, Los Angeles LGBT Center, Services and Advocacy for GLBT Elders, AIDS Foundation of Chicago, Ward Carpenter, B. Brown Consulting, LLC. U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs served on 11/5/2020, answer due 1/4/2021. (Johnson Palmer, Anne) (Filed on 11/13/2020)
November 13, 2020 Filing 43 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NO/AIDS Task Force, Santa Cruz Lesbian and Gay Community Center, Bradbury-Sullivan LGBT Community Center, Los Angeles LGBT Center, Services and Advocacy for GLBT Elders, AIDS Foundation of Chicago, Ward Carpenter, B. Brown Consulting, LLC. U.S. Department of Labor served on 11/5/2020, answer due 1/4/2021. (Johnson Palmer, Anne) (Filed on 11/13/2020)
November 13, 2020 Filing 42 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NO/AIDS Task Force, Santa Cruz Lesbian and Gay Community Center, Bradbury-Sullivan LGBT Community Center, Los Angeles LGBT Center, Services and Advocacy for GLBT Elders, AIDS Foundation of Chicago, Ward Carpenter, B. Brown Consulting, LLC. U.S. Department of Justice served on 11/5/2020, answer due 1/4/2021. (Johnson Palmer, Anne) (Filed on 11/13/2020)
November 13, 2020 Filing 41 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NO/AIDS Task Force, Santa Cruz Lesbian and Gay Community Center, Bradbury-Sullivan LGBT Community Center, Los Angeles LGBT Center, Services and Advocacy for GLBT Elders, AIDS Foundation of Chicago, Ward Carpenter, B. Brown Consulting, LLC. U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development served on 11/5/2020, answer due 1/4/2021. (Johnson Palmer, Anne) (Filed on 11/13/2020)
November 13, 2020 Filing 40 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NO/AIDS Task Force, Santa Cruz Lesbian and Gay Community Center, Bradbury-Sullivan LGBT Community Center, Los Angeles LGBT Center, Services and Advocacy for GLBT Elders, AIDS Foundation of Chicago, Ward Carpenter, B. Brown Consulting, LLC. U.S. Department of Health and Human Services served on 11/5/2020, answer due 1/4/2021. (Johnson Palmer, Anne) (Filed on 11/13/2020)
November 13, 2020 Filing 39 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NO/AIDS Task Force, Santa Cruz Lesbian and Gay Community Center, Bradbury-Sullivan LGBT Community Center, Los Angeles LGBT Center, Services and Advocacy for GLBT Elders, AIDS Foundation of Chicago, Ward Carpenter, B. Brown Consulting, LLC. Robert Wilkie served on 11/5/2020, answer due 1/4/2021. (Johnson Palmer, Anne) (Filed on 11/13/2020)
November 13, 2020 Filing 38 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NO/AIDS Task Force, Santa Cruz Lesbian and Gay Community Center, Bradbury-Sullivan LGBT Community Center, Los Angeles LGBT Center, Services and Advocacy for GLBT Elders, AIDS Foundation of Chicago, Ward Carpenter, B. Brown Consulting, LLC. National Endowment for the Humanities served on 11/5/2020, answer due 1/4/2021. (Johnson Palmer, Anne) (Filed on 11/13/2020)
November 13, 2020 Filing 37 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NO/AIDS Task Force, Santa Cruz Lesbian and Gay Community Center, Bradbury-Sullivan LGBT Community Center, Los Angeles LGBT Center, Services and Advocacy for GLBT Elders, AIDS Foundation of Chicago, Ward Carpenter, B. Brown Consulting, LLC. National Endowment for the Arts served on 11/5/2020, answer due 1/4/2021. (Johnson Palmer, Anne) (Filed on 11/13/2020)
November 13, 2020 Filing 36 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NO/AIDS Task Force, Santa Cruz Lesbian and Gay Community Center, Bradbury-Sullivan LGBT Community Center, Los Angeles LGBT Center, Services and Advocacy for GLBT Elders, AIDS Foundation of Chicago, Ward Carpenter, B. Brown Consulting, LLC. Mary Anne Carter served on 11/5/2020, answer due 1/4/2021. (Johnson Palmer, Anne) (Filed on 11/13/2020)
November 13, 2020 Filing 35 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NO/AIDS Task Force, Santa Cruz Lesbian and Gay Community Center, Bradbury-Sullivan LGBT Community Center, Los Angeles LGBT Center, Services and Advocacy for GLBT Elders, AIDS Foundation of Chicago, Ward Carpenter, B. Brown Consulting, LLC. Jon Parrish Peede served on 11/5/2020, answer due 1/4/2021. (Johnson Palmer, Anne) (Filed on 11/13/2020)
November 13, 2020 Filing 34 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NO/AIDS Task Force, Santa Cruz Lesbian and Gay Community Center, Bradbury-Sullivan LGBT Community Center, Los Angeles LGBT Center, Services and Advocacy for GLBT Elders, AIDS Foundation of Chicago, Ward Carpenter, B. Brown Consulting, LLC. Eugene Scalia served on 11/5/2020, answer due 1/4/2021. (Johnson Palmer, Anne) (Filed on 11/13/2020)
November 13, 2020 Filing 33 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NO/AIDS Task Force, Santa Cruz Lesbian and Gay Community Center, Bradbury-Sullivan LGBT Community Center, Los Angeles LGBT Center, Services and Advocacy for GLBT Elders, AIDS Foundation of Chicago, Ward Carpenter, B. Brown Consulting, LLC. Craig E. Leen served on 11/5/2020, answer due 1/4/2021. (Johnson Palmer, Anne) (Filed on 11/13/2020)
November 13, 2020 Filing 32 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NO/AIDS Task Force, Santa Cruz Lesbian and Gay Community Center, Bradbury-Sullivan LGBT Community Center, Los Angeles LGBT Center, Services and Advocacy for GLBT Elders, AIDS Foundation of Chicago, Ward Carpenter, B. Brown Consulting, LLC. Benjamin Solomon Carson, Sr served on 11/5/2020, answer due 1/4/2021. (Johnson Palmer, Anne) (Filed on 11/13/2020)
November 13, 2020 Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NO/AIDS Task Force, Santa Cruz Lesbian and Gay Community Center, Bradbury-Sullivan LGBT Community Center, Los Angeles LGBT Center, Services and Advocacy for GLBT Elders, AIDS Foundation of Chicago, Ward Carpenter, B. Brown Consulting, LLC. Alex M. Azar, II served on 11/5/2020, answer due 1/4/2021. (Johnson Palmer, Anne) (Filed on 11/13/2020)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi remains as referral judge longer assigned to case,. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 11/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2020)
November 12, 2020 Filing 29 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2020)
November 11, 2020 Filing 28 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by AIDS Foundation of Chicago, B. Brown Consulting, LLC, Bradbury-Sullivan LGBT Community Center, Ward Carpenter, Los Angeles LGBT Center, NO/AIDS Task Force, Santa Cruz Lesbian and Gay Community Center, Services and Advocacy for GLBT Elders.. (Hallward-Driemeier, Douglas) (Filed on 11/11/2020)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting #23 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Mayer). (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2020)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting #22 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Soto). (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2020)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting #21 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Weinberg). (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2020)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting #20 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Hallward-Driemeier). (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2020)
November 6, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15163749.) filed by AIDS Foundation of Chicago, B. Brown Consulting, LLC, Bradbury-Sullivan LGBT Community Center, Ward Carpenter, Los Angeles LGBT Center, NO/AIDS Task Force, Santa Cruz Lesbian and Gay Community Center, Services and Advocacy for GLBT Elders. (Mayer, Kirsten) (Filed on 11/6/2020)
November 6, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15163723.) filed by AIDS Foundation of Chicago, B. Brown Consulting, LLC, Bradbury-Sullivan LGBT Community Center, Ward Carpenter, Los Angeles LGBT Center, NO/AIDS Task Force, Santa Cruz Lesbian and Gay Community Center, Services and Advocacy for GLBT Elders. (Soto, Jessica) (Filed on 11/6/2020)
November 6, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15163682.) filed by AIDS Foundation of Chicago, B. Brown Consulting, LLC, Bradbury-Sullivan LGBT Community Center, Ward Carpenter, Los Angeles LGBT Center, NO/AIDS Task Force, Santa Cruz Lesbian and Gay Community Center, Services and Advocacy for GLBT Elders. (Weinberg, Ethan) (Filed on 11/6/2020)
November 6, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15163574.) filed by AIDS Foundation of Chicago, B. Brown Consulting, LLC, Bradbury-Sullivan LGBT Community Center, Ward Carpenter, Los Angeles LGBT Center, NO/AIDS Task Force, Santa Cruz Lesbian and Gay Community Center, Services and Advocacy for GLBT Elders. (Hallward-Driemeier, Douglas) (Filed on 11/6/2020)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting #17 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Schoettes). (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2020)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting #16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Gonzalez-Pagan). (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2020)
November 5, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15158946.) filed by AIDS Foundation of Chicago, B. Brown Consulting, LLC, Bradbury-Sullivan LGBT Community Center, Ward Carpenter, Los Angeles LGBT Center, NO/AIDS Task Force, Santa Cruz Lesbian and Gay Community Center, Services and Advocacy for GLBT Elders. (Schoettes, Scott) (Filed on 11/5/2020)
November 5, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15158855.) filed by AIDS Foundation of Chicago, B. Brown Consulting, LLC, Bradbury-Sullivan LGBT Community Center, Ward Carpenter, Los Angeles LGBT Center, NO/AIDS Task Force, Santa Cruz Lesbian and Gay Community Center, Services and Advocacy for GLBT Elders. (Gonzalez-Pagan, Omar) (Filed on 11/5/2020)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting #14 Amended Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Loewy). (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2020)
November 4, 2020 Filing 14 Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice CORRECTION OF DOCKET #7 ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15153125.) Filing fee previously paid on 11/04/2020 filed by AIDS Foundation of Chicago, B. Brown Consulting, LLC, Bradbury-Sullivan LGBT Community Center, Ward Carpenter, Los Angeles LGBT Center, NO/AIDS Task Force, Santa Cruz Lesbian and Gay Community Center, Services and Advocacy for GLBT Elders. (Loewy, Karen) (Filed on 11/4/2020)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting #9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Smith-Carrington). (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2020)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting #8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Cook). (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2020)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting #7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Loewy). (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2020)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting #6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Taylor). (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2020)
November 4, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15153532.) filed by AIDS Foundation of Chicago, B. Brown Consulting, LLC, Bradbury-Sullivan LGBT Community Center, Ward Carpenter, Los Angeles LGBT Center, NO/AIDS Task Force, Santa Cruz Lesbian and Gay Community Center, Services and Advocacy for GLBT Elders. (Smith-Carrington, Avatara) (Filed on 11/4/2020)
November 4, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15153248.) filed by AIDS Foundation of Chicago, B. Brown Consulting, LLC, Bradbury-Sullivan LGBT Community Center, Ward Carpenter, Los Angeles LGBT Center, NO/AIDS Task Force, Santa Cruz Lesbian and Gay Community Center, Services and Advocacy for GLBT Elders. (Cook, Marshall) (Filed on 11/4/2020)
November 4, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15153125.) filed by AIDS Foundation of Chicago, B. Brown Consulting, LLC, Bradbury-Sullivan LGBT Community Center, Ward Carpenter, Los Angeles LGBT Center, NO/AIDS Task Force, Santa Cruz Lesbian and Gay Community Center, Services and Advocacy for GLBT Elders. (Loewy, Karen) (Filed on 11/4/2020)
November 4, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15152935.) filed by AIDS Foundation of Chicago, B. Brown Consulting, LLC, Bradbury-Sullivan LGBT Community Center, Ward Carpenter, Los Angeles LGBT Center, NO/AIDS Task Force, Santa Cruz Lesbian and Gay Community Center, Services and Advocacy for GLBT Elders. (Taylor, Camilla) (Filed on 11/4/2020)
November 3, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Alex M. Azar, II, William Pelham Barr, Benjamin Solomon Carson, Sr, Mary Anne Carter, Craig E. Leen, National Endowment for the Arts, National Endowment for the Humanities, Office of Management and Budget, Jon Parrish Peede, Eugene Scalia, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Department of Labor, U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs, Russell T. Vought, Robert Wilkie, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2020)
November 3, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/26/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/2/2021 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2020)
November 2, 2020 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2020)
November 2, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by AIDS Foundation of Chicago, B. Brown Consulting, LLC, Bradbury-Sullivan LGBT Community Center, Ward Carpenter, Los Angeles LGBT Center, NO/AIDS Task Force, Santa Cruz Lesbian and Gay Community Center, Services and Advocacy for GLBT Elders (Johnson Palmer, Anne) (Filed on 11/2/2020)
November 2, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Johnson Palmer, Anne) (Filed on 11/2/2020)
November 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-15146553.). Filed byNO/AIDS Task Force, Santa Cruz Lesbian and Gay Community Center, Bradbury-Sullivan LGBT Community Center, Los Angeles LGBT Center, Services and Advocacy for GLBT Elders, AIDS Foundation of Chicago, Ward Carpenter, B. Brown Consulting, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Johnson Palmer, Anne) (Filed on 11/2/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santa Cruz Lesbian and Gay Community Center et al v. Trump et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Represented By: Elliott M. Davis
Represented By: Zachary Anthony Avallone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Wilkie
Represented By: Elliott M. Davis
Represented By: Zachary Anthony Avallone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Justice
Represented By: Elliott M. Davis
Represented By: Zachary Anthony Avallone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugene Scalia
Represented By: Elliott M. Davis
Represented By: Zachary Anthony Avallone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Parrish Peede
Represented By: Elliott M. Davis
Represented By: Zachary Anthony Avallone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development
Represented By: Elliott M. Davis
Represented By: Zachary Anthony Avallone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Endowment for the Arts
Represented By: Elliott M. Davis
Represented By: Zachary Anthony Avallone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Endowment for the Humanities
Represented By: Elliott M. Davis
Represented By: Zachary Anthony Avallone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Management and Budget
Represented By: Elliott M. Davis
Represented By: Zachary Anthony Avallone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Anne Carter
Represented By: Elliott M. Davis
Represented By: Zachary Anthony Avallone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Elliott M. Davis
Represented By: Zachary Anthony Avallone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Labor
Represented By: Elliott M. Davis
Represented By: Zachary Anthony Avallone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Pelham Barr
Represented By: Elliott M. Davis
Represented By: Zachary Anthony Avallone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell T. Vought
Represented By: Elliott M. Davis
Represented By: Zachary Anthony Avallone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig E. Leen
Represented By: Elliott M. Davis
Represented By: Zachary Anthony Avallone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs
Represented By: Elliott M. Davis
Represented By: Zachary Anthony Avallone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Solomon Carson, Sr.
Represented By: Elliott M. Davis
Represented By: Zachary Anthony Avallone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald J. Trump
Represented By: Elliott M. Davis
Represented By: Zachary Anthony Avallone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradbury-Sullivan LGBT Community Center
Represented By: Anne Johnson Palmer
Represented By: Douglas H Hallward-Driemeier
Represented By: Camilla B Taylor
Represented By: Ethan M Weinberg
Represented By: Avatara Smith-Carrington
Represented By: Scott Schoettes
Represented By: Jennifer Carol Pizer
Represented By: Kirsten V. Mayer
Represented By: Jessica L Soto
Represented By: Marshall Currey Cook
Represented By: Karen L Loewy
Represented By: Omar Gonzalez-Pagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santa Cruz Lesbian and Gay Community Center doing business as Diversity Center of Santa Cruz
Represented By: Anne Johnson Palmer
Represented By: Douglas H Hallward-Driemeier
Represented By: Camilla B Taylor
Represented By: Ethan M Weinberg
Represented By: Avatara Smith-Carrington
Represented By: Scott Schoettes
Represented By: Jennifer Carol Pizer
Represented By: Kirsten V. Mayer
Represented By: Jessica L Soto
Represented By: Marshall Currey Cook
Represented By: Karen L Loewy
Represented By: Omar Gonzalez-Pagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AIDS Foundation of Chicago
Represented By: Anne Johnson Palmer
Represented By: Douglas H Hallward-Driemeier
Represented By: Avatara Smith-Carrington
Represented By: Camilla B Taylor
Represented By: Ethan M Weinberg
Represented By: Scott Schoettes
Represented By: Jennifer Carol Pizer
Represented By: Kirsten V. Mayer
Represented By: Jessica L Soto
Represented By: Marshall Currey Cook
Represented By: Karen L Loewy
Represented By: Omar Gonzalez-Pagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Los Angeles LGBT Center
Represented By: Anne Johnson Palmer
Represented By: Douglas H Hallward-Driemeier
Represented By: Camilla B Taylor
Represented By: Ethan M Weinberg
Represented By: Avatara Smith-Carrington
Represented By: Scott Schoettes
Represented By: Jennifer Carol Pizer
Represented By: Kirsten V. Mayer
Represented By: Jessica L Soto
Represented By: Marshall Currey Cook
Represented By: Karen L Loewy
Represented By: Omar Gonzalez-Pagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Services and Advocacy for GLBT Elders
Represented By: Anne Johnson Palmer
Represented By: Douglas H Hallward-Driemeier
Represented By: Camilla B Taylor
Represented By: Ethan M Weinberg
Represented By: Avatara Smith-Carrington
Represented By: Scott Schoettes
Represented By: Jennifer Carol Pizer
Represented By: Kirsten V. Mayer
Represented By: Jessica L Soto
Represented By: Marshall Currey Cook
Represented By: Karen L Loewy
Represented By: Omar Gonzalez-Pagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B. Brown Consulting, LLC
Represented By: Anne Johnson Palmer
Represented By: Douglas H Hallward-Driemeier
Represented By: Camilla B Taylor
Represented By: Ethan M Weinberg
Represented By: Avatara Smith-Carrington
Represented By: Scott Schoettes
Represented By: Jennifer Carol Pizer
Represented By: Kirsten V. Mayer
Represented By: Jessica L Soto
Represented By: Marshall Currey Cook
Represented By: Karen L Loewy
Represented By: Omar Gonzalez-Pagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NO/AIDS Task Force doing business as CrescentCare
Represented By: Anne Johnson Palmer
Represented By: Douglas H Hallward-Driemeier
Represented By: Camilla B Taylor
Represented By: Ethan M Weinberg
Represented By: Avatara Smith-Carrington
Represented By: Scott Schoettes
Represented By: Jennifer Carol Pizer
Represented By: Kirsten V. Mayer
Represented By: Jessica L Soto
Represented By: Marshall Currey Cook
Represented By: Karen L Loewy
Represented By: Omar Gonzalez-Pagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Ward Carpenter
Represented By: Anne Johnson Palmer
Represented By: Douglas H Hallward-Driemeier
Represented By: Camilla B Taylor
Represented By: Ethan M Weinberg
Represented By: Avatara Smith-Carrington
Represented By: Scott Schoettes
Represented By: Jennifer Carol Pizer
Represented By: Kirsten V. Mayer
Represented By: Jessica L Soto
Represented By: Marshall Currey Cook
Represented By: Karen L Loewy
Represented By: Omar Gonzalez-Pagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Eight Institutions of Higher Education
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Deutsch
Represented By: Kathryn L. Wynbrandt
Represented By: Brian Hauck
Represented By: Ishan K Bhabha
Represented By: Noah Bokat-Lindell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: City of Seattle and 20 Cities and Counties
Represented By: Victoria Stilwell
Represented By: LiJia Gong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NEW TEACHER CENTER
Represented By: Chassica Soo
Represented By: Mary Kelly Persyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?