Allstate Insurance Company v. Broan-Nutone LLC
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Defendant: Broan-Nutone LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv07791
Filed: November 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2020 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AFTER REASSIGNMENT. Case Management Statement due by 3/25/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/1/2021 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2020)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 11/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2020)
November 25, 2020 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2020)
November 25, 2020 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Broan-Nutone LLC.. (Mijanovic, Krsto) (Filed on 11/25/2020)
November 19, 2020 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE RE: Consent or Declination: Defendant is requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 12/3/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2020)
November 17, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Allstate Insurance Company.. (Green, Matthew) (Filed on 11/17/2020)
November 4, 2020 Filing 8 Civil Cover Sheet by Broan-Nutone LLC AMENDED. (Mijanovic, Krsto) (Filed on 11/4/2020)
November 4, 2020 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/27/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/3/2021 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2020)
November 4, 2020 Filing 6 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/18/2020. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2020)
November 4, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by Broan-Nutone LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Filing Answer in State Court Before Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mijanovic, Krsto) (Filed on 11/4/2020)
November 4, 2020 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Broan-Nutone LLC. (Mijanovic, Krsto) (Filed on 11/4/2020)
November 4, 2020 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet by Broan-Nutone LLC . (Mijanovic, Krsto) (Filed on 11/4/2020)
November 4, 2020 Filing 2 Declaration of Krsto Mijanovic in Support of #1 Notice of Removal, filed byBroan-Nutone LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Mijanovic, Krsto) (Filed on 11/4/2020)
November 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Santa Cruz Superior Court. Their case number is 20CV02081. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-15152649). Filed byBroan-Nutone LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Mijanovic, Krsto) (Filed on 11/4/2020)
November 4, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect Revision of Civil Cover Sheet used. Current Revision is JS-CAND 44 (Rev. 7/19) [err101]. Please e-file an Amended Civil Cover Sheet only. Event is located at: Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet. Re: #3 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Broan-Nutone LLC (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Insurance Company v. Broan-Nutone LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broan-Nutone LLC
Represented By: Krsto Mijanovic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew Harrison Green
Represented By: Amanda Racine Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?