Zizi v. Cuccinelli et al
Plaintiff: Dr. Martin Attilio Dominiq Zizi
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Director Loren K. Miller, Acting Secretary Chad Wolf and Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Case Number: 5:2020cv07856
Filed: November 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth D. Kurlan for Defendants (Kurlan, Elizabeth) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 8, 2020 ZOOM APPEARANCE INSTRUCTIONS FOR INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON 2/9/21 AT 9:30AM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE SUSAN VAN KEULEN. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/svk General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2020)
November 23, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Martin Attilio Dominiq Zizi.. (Gee, Michelle) (Filed on 11/23/2020)
November 23, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Martin Attilio Dominiq Zizi (Gee, Michelle) (Filed on 11/23/2020)
November 9, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Loren K. Miller, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, Chad Wolf, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2020)
November 9, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/2/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/9/2021 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2020)
November 9, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/23/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2020)
November 8, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Martin Attilio Dominiq Zizi Certification of Interested Parties (Gee, Michelle) (Filed on 11/8/2020)
November 8, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Gee, Michelle) (Filed on 11/8/2020)
November 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-15166890.). Filed byMartin Attilio Dominiq Zizi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gee, Michelle) (Filed on 11/8/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zizi v. Cuccinelli et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Elizabeth D. Kurlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Elizabeth D. Kurlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Loren K. Miller
Represented By: Elizabeth D. Kurlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Secretary Chad Wolf
Represented By: Elizabeth D. Kurlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Represented By: Elizabeth D. Kurlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Martin Attilio Dominiq Zizi
Represented By: Michelle Skatoff Gee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?