Youlin Wang v. Forensic Professional Group USA, Inc. et al
Petitioner: Youlin Wang
Respondent: Forensic Professionals Group USA, Inc., Derek Longstaff and Richard Kahn
Case Number: 5:2020cv08033
Filed: November 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Lucy H Koh
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Application for Refund, Receipt Number 0971-15205729 for Erroneous Overpayment of Filing Fees by Youlin Wang. (Shah, Dhaivat) (Filed on 1/11/2021)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Amended MOTION for Hearing to Advance Hearing Date filed by Youlin Wang. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order iso Amended Motion to Advance Hearing Date, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service re Amended Motion to Advance Hearing Date)(Shah, Dhaivat) (Filed on 1/5/2021)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #26 Motion for Extension of Time; Granting #28 Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing. (lhklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2020)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 REPLY (re #23 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) filed byYoulin Wang. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service re Reply iso Motion for Prelim Injunction)(Shah, Dhaivat) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 (PROPOSED) ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PERMISSION FOR ELECTRONIC CASE FILING BY RESPONDENT RICHAD KAHN re #28 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing by Richard Kahn. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2020)
December 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION FOR PERMISSION FOR ELECTRONIC CASE FILING BY RESPONDENT RICHAD KAHN filed by Richard Kahn. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2020)
December 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 (Proposed) Order Granting RESPONDENT RICHARD KAHN'S MOTION TO EXTEND RICHARD KAHN AND FORENSIC PROFESSIONALS GROUP USA, INC.'S TIME TO RESPOND TO PETITIONER'S MOTION FILING re #24 by Richard Kahn. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2020)
December 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 RESPONDENT RICHARD KAHN'S MOTION TO EXTEND RICHARD KAHN AND FORENSIC PROFESSIONALS GROUP USA, INC.'S TIME TO RESPOND TO PETITIONER'S MOTION FILING. #24 [ MOTION for Hearing filed by Richard Kahn. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2020)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 OPPOSITION TO #26 RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME by Youlin Wang. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Shah iso Opp to Motion to Extend Time, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service re Opp to Motion to Extend Time)(Shah, Dhaivat) (Filed on 12/16/2020) Modified on 12/17/2020 (dhmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/28/2020 to reflect that the instant filing opposes the motion at ECF No. #26 . (kedS, COURT STAFF).
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION for Hearing to Advance Hearing Date filed by Youlin Wang. (Attachments: #1 Declaration iso Motion to Advance Hearing Date, #2 Proposed Order re Motion to Advance Hearing Date, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service re Motion to Advance Hearing Date)(Shah, Dhaivat) (Filed on 12/11/2020)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Youlin Wang. Motion Hearing set for 4/8/2021 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 12/21/2020. Replies due by 12/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order iso Motion for PI, #2 Declaration of Wang iso Motion for PI, #3 Declaration of Xiong iso Motion for PI, #4 Declaration of Siegel iso Motion for PI, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service iso Motion for PI)(Shah, Dhaivat) (Filed on 12/7/2020)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #19 Certificate of Service, filed by Youlin Wang (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2020)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order #Electronic filing error. Document not properly linked. [err102]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #21 Certificate of Service filed by Youlin W ang (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2020)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Declaration of Civil iso Motion for TRO filed byYoulin Wang. (Shah, Dhaivat) (Filed on 11/25/2020)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Youlin Wang re #14 , #15 Motion for TRO to Kahn, Forensic Professionals Group USA, Inc. & Longstaff (Shah, Dhaivat) (Filed on 11/25/2020) Modified on 12/2/2020 linking entry to related documents (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ***DUPLICATE ENTRY OF DOCUMENT #19*** CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Youlin Wang Proof of Service of Summons & Petition w Supporting Papers for D. Longstaff (Shah, Dhaivat) (Filed on 11/25/2020) Modified text on 12/2/2020 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Youlin Wang. Derek Longstaff served on 11/25/2020, answer due 12/16/2020 and CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Youlin Wang Proof of Service re #14 , #15 Motion for TRO (Shah, Dhaivat) (Filed on 11/25/2020) Modified on 12/2/2020. Incorrect event selected when posting document and linking entry to related documents (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Youlin Wang Proof of Service of Summons for R. Kahn (Shah, Dhaivat) (Filed on 11/25/2020)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Youlin Wang Proof of Service of Summons for Forensic Professionals Group USA, Inc. (Shah, Dhaivat) (Filed on 11/25/2020)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 **CLERK'S NOTICE FOLLOWING CASE REASSIGNMENT TO THE HONORABLE LUCY H. KOH** Following the case reassignment to the Honorable Lucy H. Koh, an Initial Case Management Conference is set for February 24, 2021 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th floor, in San Jose, California. The Joint Case Management Statement is due seven days prior to the Initial Case Management Conference. See Civil L.R. 16-9 and Civil L.R. 16-10(a). The parties shall familiarize themselves with the Scheduling Notes and Standing Orders for the Hon. Lucy H. Koh: http://cand.uscourts.gov/lhk. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2020)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh Denying #14 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Re Preliminary Injunction. (lhklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2020)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction filed by Youlin Wang. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Fisher iso Motion, #2 Declaration of Patel iso Motion, #3 Declaration of Shah iso Moton, #4 Declaration of Siegel iso Motion, #5 Declaration of Wang iso Motion, #6 Declaration of Xiong iso Motion, #7 Proposed Order)(Shah, Dhaivat) Unable to create combined PDF file. (Filed on 11/20/2020) Modified on 11/24/2020 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 11/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2020)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2020)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Youlin Wang.. (Shah, Dhaivat) (Filed on 11/18/2020)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of #1 PETITION TO ENJOIN ARBITRATION filed by Youlin Wang. (Attachments: #1 Declaration iso Petition, #2 Declaration iso Petition, #3 Declaration iso Petition, #4 Declaration iso Petition, #5 Declaration iso Petition)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Shah, Dhaivat) (Filed on 11/18/2020) Modified on 11/18/2020 (sfbS, COURT STAFF). Unable to create combined PDF file. Modified on 11/19/2020 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 *Disregard Filed In Error* PETITION TO ENJOIN ARBITRATION against Forensic Professionals Group USA, Inc., Richard Kahn, Derek Longstaff (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-15205729). Filed by Youlin Wang. (Attachments: #1 Declaration iso Petition, #2 Declaration iso Petition, #3 Declaration iso Petition, #4 Declaration iso Petition, #5 Declaration iso Petition)(Shah, Dhaivat) (Filed on 11/17/2020) Modified on 11/18/2020 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Forensic Professionals Group USA, Inc., Richard Kahn, Derek Longstaff. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2020)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/10/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/17/2021 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2020)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/27/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2020)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Shah, Dhaivat) (Filed on 11/13/2020)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Shah, Dhaivat) (Filed on 11/13/2020)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Shah, Dhaivat) (Filed on 11/13/2020)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Youlin Wang (Shah, Dhaivat) (Filed on 11/13/2020)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION to Enjoin Arbitration against Forensic Professionals Group USA, Inc., Richard Kahn, Derek Longstaff (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-15193281). Filed byYoulin Wang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shah, Dhaivat) (Filed on 11/13/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Youlin Wang v. Forensic Professional Group USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Forensic Professionals Group USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Derek Longstaff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Richard Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Youlin Wang
Represented By: Dhaivat H. Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?