California Coastkeeper Inc. et al v. Hildebrand & Sons Trucking, Inc.
Plaintiff: Monterey Coastkeeper, California Coastkeeper Alliance, The Otter Project, California Coastkeeper, Inc. a nonprofit corporation doing business as California Coastkeeper Alliance and Monterrey Coastkeeper
Defendant: Hildebrand & Sons Trucking, Inc.,
Case Number: 5:2020cv08199
Filed: November 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33 U.S.C. ยง 1319
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2021 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE RE: Consent or Declination. Defendant is requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 1/28/2021. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2021)
December 4, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by California Coastkeeper, Inc., Monterey Coastkeeper, The Otter Project.. (Barnes, Anthony) (Filed on 12/4/2020)
November 30, 2020 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Entities by California Coastkeeper, Inc., Monterey Coastkeeper, The Otter Project (Barnes, Anthony) (Filed on 11/30/2020)
November 23, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Hildebrand & Sons Trucking, Inc. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2020)
November 23, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/17/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/24/2021 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2020)
November 23, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/7/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2020)
November 20, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Barnes, Anthony) (Filed on 11/20/2020)
November 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hildebrand & Sons Trucking, Inc., ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-15222279.). Filed byCalifornia Coastkeeper Alliance, Monterey Coastkeeper, The Otter Project. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Barnes, Anthony) (Filed on 11/20/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: California Coastkeeper Inc. et al v. Hildebrand & Sons Trucking, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monterey Coastkeeper
Represented By: Anthony Michael Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Coastkeeper Alliance
Represented By: Anthony Michael Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Otter Project
Represented By: Anthony Michael Barnes
Represented By: Erin Kennedy Clancy
Represented By: Jason Robert Flanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Coastkeeper, Inc. a nonprofit corporation doing business as California Coastkeeper Alliance
Represented By: Anthony Michael Barnes
Represented By: Erin Kennedy Clancy
Represented By: Jason Robert Flanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monterrey Coastkeeper
Represented By: Anthony Michael Barnes
Represented By: Erin Kennedy Clancy
Represented By: Jason Robert Flanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hildebrand & Sons Trucking, Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?