Zefon International, Inc. v. Professional Laboratories, Inc.
Plaintiff: Zefon International, Inc.
Defendant: Professional Laboratories, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2020cv08493
Filed: December 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan van Keulen
Referring Judge: Lucy H Koh
2 Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2021 Filing 31 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #30 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION DEFENDANTS MOTION TO POSTPONE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ) filed byZefon International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joshua J. Richman, #2 Proposed Order)(Richman, Joshua) (Filed on 1/29/2021)
January 28, 2021 Filing 30 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION DEFENDANTS MOTION TO POSTPONE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Professional Laboratories, Inc.. Responses due by 2/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Francine T. Radford, #2 Proposed Order)(Radford, Francine) (Filed on 1/28/2021)
January 26, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Francine Terhune Radford (Radford, Francine) (Filed on 1/26/2021)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #26 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2021)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #25 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2021)
January 21, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15383374.) Filing fee previously paid on 12/30/2020 filed by Professional Laboratories, Inc.. (Khetarpal, Anuj) (Filed on 1/21/2021)
January 21, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15383252.) Filing fee previously paid on 12/30/2020 filed by Professional Laboratories, Inc.. (Hirshon, Sara) (Filed on 1/21/2021)
January 20, 2021 Filing 24 REPLY (re #9 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Transfer ) DEFENDANTS REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO TRANSFER filed byProfessional Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sara E. Hirshon)(Radford, Francine) (Filed on 1/20/2021)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh Denying #18 Administrative Motion as Moot. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lhklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2021)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #21 Stipulation Regarding Declaration. (lhklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2021)
January 14, 2021 Filing 21 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #19 Declaration in Support, #18 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for permission to late file evidence re #17 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed by Zefon International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re Stipulation and Joint Motion for Evidence and Reply Brief)(Yang, Jacob) (Filed on 1/14/2021)
January 14, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Yang for Plaintiff Zefon International (Yang, Jacob) (Filed on 1/14/2021)
January 13, 2021 Filing 19 Declaration of Dr. John D. Shane, PhD in Support of #17 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byZefon International, Inc.. (Related document(s) #17 ) (Richman, Joshua) (Filed on 1/13/2021)
January 12, 2021 Filing 18 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for permission to late file evidence re #17 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed by Zefon International, Inc.. Responses due by 1/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joshua J. Richman, #2 Proposed Order)(Richman, Joshua) (Filed on 1/12/2021)
January 12, 2021 Filing 17 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #9 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Transfer ) filed byZefon International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bill Barker Jr., #2 Declaration of Joshua J. Richman)(Richman, Joshua) (Filed on 1/12/2021)
January 7, 2021 Filing 16 **CLERK'S NOTICE FOLLOWING CASE REASSIGNMENT TO THE HONORABLE LUCY H. KOH** Following the case reassignment to the Honorable Lucy H. Koh, an Initial Case Management Conference is set for March 31, 2021 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th floor, in San Jose, California. The Joint Case Management Statement is due seven days prior to the Initial Case Management Conference. See Civil L.R. 16-9 and Civil L.R. 16-10(a). The parties shall familiarize themselves with the Scheduling Notes and Standing Orders for the Hon. Lucy H. Koh: http://cand.uscourts.gov/lhk. A hearing on #9 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Transfer is SET for May 13, 2021 at 1:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2021)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Lucy H. Koh and Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 1/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2021)
January 5, 2021 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2021)
January 5, 2021 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Professional Laboratories, Inc... (Radford, Francine) (Filed on 1/5/2021)
January 4, 2021 #Electronic filing error. Please re-file in its entirety ***Application must be filed using the ECF login and password for the attorney who seeks to be admitted. See USDC website > Pro Hac Vice Appearance > Application Procedures > #3.**** Re: #12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15383374.) filed by Professional Laboratories, Inc., #11 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15383252.) filed by Professional Laboratories, Inc. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2021)
December 30, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15383374.) filed by Professional Laboratories, Inc.. (Radford, Francine) (Filed on 12/30/2020)
December 30, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15383252.) filed by Professional Laboratories, Inc.. (Radford, Francine) (Filed on 12/30/2020)
December 30, 2020 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE TO DEFENDANT Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 1/6/2021. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2020)
December 29, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Transfer filed by Professional Laboratories, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/25/2021 01:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 1/12/2021. Replies due by 1/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James E. McDonnell, IV, #2 Proposed Order)(Radford, Francine) (Filed on 12/29/2020) Modified on 12/30/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
December 21, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Francine Terhune Radford (Radford, Francine) (Filed on 12/21/2020)
December 14, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Zefon International, Inc... (Richman, Joshua) (Filed on 12/14/2020)
December 10, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Zefon International, Inc. (Zurita, Tajiana) (Filed on 12/10/2020)
December 2, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/24/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/3/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2020)
December 2, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Professional Laboratories, Inc.. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2020)
December 2, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Richman, Joshua) (Filed on 12/2/2020)
December 2, 2020 #Electronic filing error. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Tajiana A. Zurita. The docket shows a different address from what is appearing on the document (dkt. #: 1 Complaint filed by Zefon International, Inc.). Please update your personal profile on ECF. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2020)
December 1, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/15/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2020)
December 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Professional Laboratories, Inc. with jury demand ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15261503.). Filed by Zefon International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Richman, Joshua) (Filed on 12/1/2020) Modified on 12/2/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zefon International, Inc. v. Professional Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zefon International, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua J. Richman
Represented By: Tajiana Zurita
Represented By: Jacob Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Professional Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Robert A. Goodin
Represented By: Anuj Khetarpal
Represented By: Sara E Hirshon
Represented By: Francine Terhune Radford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?