Klein et al v. Facebook, Inc.
Plaintiff: Maximilian Klein, Sarah Grabert and Jessica L. Layser
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Not Classified By Court: Lezah Neville-Marrs, Deborah Dames, Vickie Sherman, Timothy Mathews, Jarred Johnson, Katherine Loopers and Rachel Banks Kupcho
Case Number: 5:2020cv08570
Filed: December 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Referring Judge: Lucy H Koh
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 REPLY (re #38 MOTION to Stay Pending Relation Orders and Case Management Conference ) filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Z. Gringer in Support)(Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 1/29/2021)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #38 MOTION to Stay Pending Relation Orders and Case Management Conference, #39 MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing of Facebook's Motion to Stay ) filed bySarah Grabert, Maximilian Klein. (Wolfson, Adam) (Filed on 1/27/2021)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Response re #41 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Case Should be Related byFacebook, Inc.. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 1/27/2021)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Case Should be Related filed by Jessica L. Layser. Responses due by 2/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Admin Motion, #2 Declaration of Dena C. Sharp, #3 Proposed Order)(Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 1/26/2021)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE by Facebook, Inc. Regarding Ruling on Motions to Relate Cases (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 1/25/2021)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing of Facebook's Motion to Stay filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Gringer in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 1/19/2021)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MOTION to Stay Pending Relation Orders and Case Management Conference filed by Facebook, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/20/2021 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 2/2/2021. Replies due by 2/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Gringer in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Proposed Order)(Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 1/19/2021)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #34 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Relate Later-Filed Consumer Cases ) filed byJarred Johnson, Katherine Loopers, Lezah Neville-Marrs, Vickie Sherman. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF TINA WOLFSON, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Johnson, Rachel) (Filed on 1/8/2021)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #34 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Relate Later-Filed Consumer Cases ) Plaintiff Banks Kupcho's Response to Klein Plaintiffs' Motion for Administrative Relief to Consider Whether Consumer Cases Should be Related Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-12 filed byRachel Banks Kupcho. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 1/7/2021)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #34 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Relate Later-Filed Consumer Cases ) filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Z. Gringer, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Proposed Order)(Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 1/6/2021)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Relate Later-Filed Consumer Cases filed by Sarah Grabert, Maximilian Klein. Responses due by 1/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Index of Attachments, #2 Declaration of Brantley I. Pepperman in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Relate Consumer Cases, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Proposed Order)(Wolfson, Adam) (Filed on 1/4/2021)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #30 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2021)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #29 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2021)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #28 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2021)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15380502.) filed by Sarah Grabert, Maximilian Klein. (Ethridge, Jason) (Filed on 12/30/2020)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15380460.) filed by Sarah Grabert, Maximilian Klein. (Whiting, Benjamin) (Filed on 12/30/2020)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15380429.) filed by Sarah Grabert, Maximilian Klein. (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 12/30/2020)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting #23 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint.(lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2020)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #22 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #19 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related ) filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Proposed Order)(Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #19 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related ) filed bySarah Grabert, Maximilian Klein. (Wolfson, Adam) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Enlarge Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 12/23/2020)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15362902.) filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Gringer, David) (Filed on 12/23/2020)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Sonal N. Mehta (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 12/23/2020)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Warren D. Postman (Postman, Warren) (Filed on 12/23/2020)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related filed by Vickie Sherman, Lezah Neville-Marrs, Jarred Johnson, Katherine Loopers. Responses due by 12/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration ISO Administrative Motion to Relate Cases, #2 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO RELATE CASES)(Johnson, Rachel) (Filed on 12/21/2020)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE by Deborah Dames, Timothy Mathews Pursuant to Local Rule 3-12(e) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Joost, Jennifer) (Filed on 12/21/2020)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE by Sarah Grabert, Maximilian Klein Pursuant to Local Rule 3-12(e) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Wolfson, Adam) (Filed on 12/21/2020)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #15 Certificate of Service filed by Maximilian Klein , Sarah Grabert (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2020)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE by Sarah Grabert, Maximilian Klein Pursuant to Local Rule 3-12(e) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Swedlow, Stephen) (Filed on 12/14/2020)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maximilian Klein, Sarah Grabert. Facebook, Inc. served on 12/9/2020, answer due 12/30/2020. (Swedlow, Stephen) (Filed on 12/10/2020) Modified on 12/15/2020 Incorrect event selected when posting document (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2020)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 **CLERK'S NOTICE FOLLOWING CASE REASSIGNMENT TO THE HONORABLE LUCY H. KOH** Following the case reassignment to the Honorable Lucy H. Koh, an Initial Case Management Conference is set for March 10, 2021 at 2:00 PM. The Joint Case Management Statement is due March 3, 2021. See Civil L.R. 16-9 and Civil L.R. 16-10(a). The parties shall familiarize themselves with the Scheduling Notes and Standing Orders for the Hon. Lucy H. Koh: http://cand.uscourts.gov/lhk. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2020)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Facebook, Inc.. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2020)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15283732.) filed by Sarah Grabert, Maximilian Klein. (Swedlow, Stephen) (Filed on 12/7/2020)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Lucy H. Koh and for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 12/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2020)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2020)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/2/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/9/2021 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2020)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Brantley Ian Pepperman (Pepperman, Brantley) (Filed on 12/4/2020)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Yoshiwo Teruya (Teruya, Kevin) (Filed on 12/4/2020)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Entities by Sarah Grabert, Maximilian Klein (Wolfson, Adam) (Filed on 12/4/2020)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sarah Grabert, Maximilian Klein.. (Wolfson, Adam) (Filed on 12/4/2020)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/18/2020. (asS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2020)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Wolfson, Adam) (Filed on 12/3/2020)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Facebook, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15273262.). Filed byMaximilian Klein, Sarah Grabert. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wolfson, Adam) (Filed on 12/3/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Klein et al v. Facebook, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maximilian Klein
Represented By: Brantley Ian Pepperman
Represented By: Kevin Yoshiwo Teruya
Represented By: Adam Bryan Wolfson
Represented By: Warren D. Postman
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Jason W Ethridge
Represented By: Stephen A. Swedlow
Represented By: Benjamin John Whiting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Grabert
Represented By: Brantley Ian Pepperman
Represented By: Kevin Yoshiwo Teruya
Represented By: Adam Bryan Wolfson
Represented By: Warren D. Postman
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Jason W Ethridge
Represented By: Stephen A. Swedlow
Represented By: Benjamin John Whiting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica L. Layser
Represented By: Christina C. Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: David Zahler Gringer
Represented By: Sonal N. Mehta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Lezah Neville-Marrs
Represented By: Rachel Renee Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Deborah Dames
Represented By: Jennifer Lauren Joost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Vickie Sherman
Represented By: Rachel Renee Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Timothy Mathews
Represented By: Jennifer Lauren Joost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Jarred Johnson
Represented By: Rachel Renee Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Katherine Loopers
Represented By: Rachel Renee Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Rachel Banks Kupcho
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?