Walker v. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Jawanna Marisse Walker
Defendant: Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security and Andrew Saul
Case Number: 5:2020cv08810
Filed: December 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Lucy H Koh
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER FOR STIPULATED STATEMENT OF FACTS. Re: Dkt. No. #4 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 1/11/2021. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2021)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins for all further proceedings re #10 Order of Reassignment. Judge Lucy H. Koh no longer assigned to case. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2021)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order Directing Executive Committee to Reassign Case. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 01/11/2021. (lhklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2021)
January 8, 2021 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jawanna Marisse Walker.. (Maher, Rima) (Filed on 1/8/2021)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Directing Plaintiff to File a Consent to or Declination of Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 1/6/2021. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2021)
January 5, 2021 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Andrew Saul.. (Yang, Annabelle) (Filed on 1/5/2021)
December 17, 2020 Received Electronic receipt of acknowledgment of service by e-mail (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2020)
December 16, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF LAWSUIT AND REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service e-mailed to Commissioner of Social Security on 12/16/20 Waiver of Service due by 1/19/2021. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2020)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (lhklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2020)
December 11, 2020 Filing 4 SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER: (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2020)
December 11, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Lucy H. Koh. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2020)
December 11, 2020 Filing 2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jawanna Marisse Walker. (Maher, Rima) (Filed on 12/11/2020)
December 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Jawanna Walker against Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security. Filed byJawanna Marisse Walker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Maher, Rima) (Filed on 12/11/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jawanna Marisse Walker
Represented By: Rima Maher, Maher
Represented By: Rima Maher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Annabelle J. Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?