Genius Media Group, Inc. et al v. Alphabet Inc., et al
Plaintiff: THE NATION COMPANY, L.P., GENIUS MEDIA GROUP, INC. and THE PROGRESSIVE, INC.
Defendant: Alphabet Inc.,, YouTube, LLC and Google LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv09092
Filed: December 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Referring Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:2
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2021 Filing 70 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 4/8/2021 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2021)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/9/2021. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2021)
February 8, 2021 Filing 68 Transcript of Proceedings held on 02/04/2021, before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, telephone number summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (41 in 5:20-cv-08984-BLF) Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 3/1/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/11/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/10/2021. (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 2/8/2021)
February 4, 2021 Filing 67 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Labson Freeman: Case Management Conference held on 2/4/2021.Total Time in Court: 52 Minutes. Court Reporter: Summer Fisher. Plaintiff Attorney: Carol L. O'Keefe, Philip C. Korologos via Zoom Webinar. Defendant Attorney: John Edward Schmidtlein via Zoom Webinar. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/4/2021)
February 1, 2021 Filing 66 CLERKS NOTICE CONVERTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO ZOOM WEBINAR. Case Management Conference set for 2/4/2021 10:00 AM before Judge Beth Labson Freeman will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/blf Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at blfcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than February 3, 2021 at 2:00 PM PST.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no doc ument associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2021)
January 28, 2021 Filing 65 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT JOINT PUBLISHER PLAINTIFFS CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT filed by GENIUS MEDIA GROUP, INC., THE NATION COMPANY, L.P., THE PROGRESSIVE, INC.. (Mao, Hsiao) (Filed on 1/28/2021)
January 28, 2021 Filing 64 Statement Regarding Consolidation by Alphabet Inc.,, Google LLC, YouTube, LLC. (Schmidtlein, John) (Filed on 1/28/2021)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER GRANTING #62 STIPULATION REGARDING DEFENDANTS' DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/26/2021. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2021)
January 25, 2021 Filing 62 STIPULATION Regarding Defendants' Deadline to Respond to the Complaint filed by Alphabet Inc.,, Google LLC, YouTube, LLC. (Schmidtlein, John) (Filed on 1/25/2021)
January 22, 2021 Set Case Management Conference re #61 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.Case Management Conference set for 2/4/2021 10:00 AM in San Jose, - To be determined. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2021)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR FEBRUARY 4, 2021 AT 10AM. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/22/2021. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2021)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER ON MOTIONS TO RELATE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/22/2021. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2021)
January 15, 2021 Filing 59 Refund Status re #58 Application for Refund Approved. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2021)
January 12, 2021 Filing 58 Application for Refund, Receipt Number 0971-15344540 by GENIUS MEDIA GROUP, INC., THE NATION COMPANY, L.P., THE PROGRESSIVE, INC.. (Korologos, Philip) (Filed on 1/12/2021)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION REGARDING DEFENDANTS' DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/12/2021. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2021)
January 8, 2021 Filing 56 Certificate of Interested Entities by Alphabet Inc.,, Google LLC, YouTube, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Google LLC for YouTube, LLC; Corporate Parent XXVI Holdings Inc. for Google LLC. (Schmidtlein, John) (Filed on 1/8/2021)
January 8, 2021 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by John Edward Schmidtlein (Schmidtlein, John) (Filed on 1/8/2021)
January 4, 2021 Filing 54 STIPULATION Regarding Defendants' Deadline to Respond to the Complaint filed by Alphabet Inc.,, Google LLC, YouTube, LLC. (Schmidtlein, John) (Filed on 1/4/2021)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER GRANTING #41 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/4/2021.(blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2021)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER GRANTING #40 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/4/2021.(blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2021)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER GRANTING #33 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/4/2021.(blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2021)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING #32 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/4/2021.(blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2021)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER GRANTING #31 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/4/2021.(blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2021)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER GRANTING #29 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/4/2021.(blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2021)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER GRANTING #28 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/4/2021.(blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2021)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER GRANTING #27 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/4/2021.(blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2021)
January 4, 2021 Filing 45 NOTICE by Alphabet Inc.,, Google LLC, YouTube, LLC Defendants' Notice of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Relate (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schmidtlein, John) (Filed on 1/4/2021)
December 31, 2020 Filing 44 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AFTER REASSIGNMENT. Case Management Statement due by 5/6/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/13/2021 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/31/2020)
December 30, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #43 Notice (Other) filed by THE NATION COMPANY, L.P ., GENIUS MEDIA GROUP, INC., THE PROGRESSIVE, INC. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2020)
December 30, 2020 Filing 43 MOTION to Consider Related Cases by GENIUS MEDIA GROUP, INC., THE NATION COMPANY, L.P., THE PROGRESSIVE, INC. MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mao, Hsiao) (Filed on 12/30/2020) Modified on 12/30/2020 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 12/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2020)
December 28, 2020 Filing 41 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Application for Admission of Attorney Ryan Cortazar ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15371144.) filed by GENIUS MEDIA GROUP, INC., THE NATION COMPANY, L.P., THE PROGRESSIVE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cortazar, Ryan) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 28, 2020 Filing 40 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Application for Admission of Attorney Jonathon Byrer ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15371000.) filed by GENIUS MEDIA GROUP, INC., THE NATION COMPANY, L.P., THE PROGRESSIVE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Byrer, Jonathon) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 28, 2020 Filing 39 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by GENIUS MEDIA GROUP, INC., THE NATION COMPANY, L.P., THE PROGRESSIVE, INC. re #8 Notice of Appearance as to YouTube, LLC (Rodriguez, Sean) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 28, 2020 Filing 38 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by GENIUS MEDIA GROUP, INC., THE NATION COMPANY, L.P., THE PROGRESSIVE, INC. re #8 Notice of Appearance as to Google LLC (Rodriguez, Sean) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 28, 2020 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by GENIUS MEDIA GROUP, INC., THE NATION COMPANY, L.P., THE PROGRESSIVE, INC. re #8 Notice of Appearance as to Alphabet, Inc. (Rodriguez, Sean) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 28, 2020 Filing 36 SUMMONS Returned Executed by THE NATION COMPANY, L.P., GENIUS MEDIA GROUP, INC., THE PROGRESSIVE, INC.. YouTube, LLC served on 12/18/2020, answer due 1/8/2021. (Rodriguez, Sean) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 28, 2020 Filing 35 SUMMONS Returned Executed by THE NATION COMPANY, L.P., GENIUS MEDIA GROUP, INC., THE PROGRESSIVE, INC.. Google LLC served on 12/18/2020, answer due 1/8/2021. (Rodriguez, Sean) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 28, 2020 Filing 34 SUMMONS Returned Executed by THE NATION COMPANY, L.P., GENIUS MEDIA GROUP, INC., THE PROGRESSIVE, INC.. Alphabet Inc., served on 12/18/2020, answer due 1/8/2021. (Rodriguez, Sean) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 28, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Application for Admission of Attorney Jamie Boyer ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15370678.) filed by GENIUS MEDIA GROUP, INC., THE NATION COMPANY, L.P., THE PROGRESSIVE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Boyer, Jamie) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 28, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Application for Admission of Attorney Randall Ewing, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15370558.) filed by GENIUS MEDIA GROUP, INC., THE NATION COMPANY, L.P., THE PROGRESSIVE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ewing, Randall) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 28, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Application for Admission of Attorney Robert Litan ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15370216.) filed by GENIUS MEDIA GROUP, INC., THE NATION COMPANY, L.P., THE PROGRESSIVE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Litan, Robert) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 28, 2020 Filing 30 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 28, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Application for Admission of Attorney Carol O'Keefe ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15369953.) filed by GENIUS MEDIA GROUP, INC., THE NATION COMPANY, L.P., THE PROGRESSIVE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(O'Keefe, Carol) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 28, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Application for Admission of Attorney Stephen Tillery ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15369727.) filed by GENIUS MEDIA GROUP, INC., THE NATION COMPANY, L.P., THE PROGRESSIVE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Tillery, Stephen) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 28, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Application for Admission of Attorney George A. Zelcs ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15369489.) filed by GENIUS MEDIA GROUP, INC., THE NATION COMPANY, L.P., THE PROGRESSIVE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Zelcs, George) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 27, 2020 Filing 26 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by GENIUS MEDIA GROUP, INC., THE NATION COMPANY, L.P., THE PROGRESSIVE, INC... (Rodriguez, Sean) (Filed on 12/27/2020)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #19 Sabria A. McElroy's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2020)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #18 Jesse M. Panuccio's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2020)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #17 Abby L. Dennis's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2020)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #16 Philip C. Korologos's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2020)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. ryu granting #15 David Boies's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2020)
December 22, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related by Alphabet Inc.,, Google LLC, YouTube, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schmidtlein, John) (Filed on 12/22/2020) Modified on 12/23/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
December 22, 2020 Filing 19 Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15346979.) Filing fee previously paid on 12/21/2020 filed by GENIUS MEDIA GROUP, INC., THE NATION COMPANY, L.P., THE PROGRESSIVE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(McElroy, Sabria) (Filed on 12/22/2020)
December 22, 2020 Filing 18 Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15346947.) Filing fee previously paid on 12/21/2020 filed by GENIUS MEDIA GROUP, INC., THE NATION COMPANY, L.P., THE PROGRESSIVE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Panuccio, Jesse) (Filed on 12/22/2020)
December 22, 2020 Filing 17 Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15346928.) Filing fee previously paid on 12/21/2020 filed by GENIUS MEDIA GROUP, INC., THE NATION COMPANY, L.P., THE PROGRESSIVE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Dennis, Abby) (Filed on 12/22/2020)
December 22, 2020 Filing 16 Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15344570.) Filing fee previously paid on 12/18/2020 filed by GENIUS MEDIA GROUP, INC., THE NATION COMPANY, L.P., THE PROGRESSIVE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Korologos, Philip) (Filed on 12/22/2020)
December 22, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15344568.) Filing fee previously paid on 12/18/2020 filed by GENIUS MEDIA GROUP, INC., THE NATION COMPANY, L.P., THE PROGRESSIVE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Boies, David) (Filed on 12/22/2020)
December 21, 2020 #Electronic filing error. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. The local counsel named, Mark C. Mao, is not a party in this case. Please re-file the application with local counsel. Re: #13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15346947.) filed by THE NATION COMPANY, L.P., GENIUS MEDIA GROUP, INC., THE PROGRESSIVE, INC., #14 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15346979.) filed by THE NATION COMPANY, L.P., GENIUS MEDIA GROUP, INC., THE PROGRESSIVE, INC., #10 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15344570.) filed by THE NATION COMPANY, L.P., GENIUS MEDIA GROUP, INC., THE PROGRESSIVE, INC., #9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15344568.) filed by THE NATION COMPANY, L.P., GENIUS MEDIA GROUP, INC., THE PROGRESSIVE, INC., #11 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15346928.) filed by THE NATION COMPANY, L.P., GENIUS MEDIA GROUP, INC., THE PROGRESSIVE, INC. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2020)
December 21, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15346979.) filed by GENIUS MEDIA GROUP, INC., THE NATION COMPANY, L.P., THE PROGRESSIVE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(McElroy, Sabria) (Filed on 12/21/2020)
December 21, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15346947.) filed by GENIUS MEDIA GROUP, INC., THE NATION COMPANY, L.P., THE PROGRESSIVE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Panuccio, Jesse) (Filed on 12/21/2020)
December 21, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael E Klenov on behalf of Genius Media Group, Inc., The Nation Company, L.P., and The Progressive, Inc. (Klenov, Michael) (Filed on 12/21/2020)
December 21, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15346928.) filed by GENIUS MEDIA GROUP, INC., THE NATION COMPANY, L.P., THE PROGRESSIVE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Dennis, Abby) (Filed on 12/21/2020)
December 18, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15344570.) filed by GENIUS MEDIA GROUP, INC., THE NATION COMPANY, L.P., THE PROGRESSIVE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Korologos, Philip) (Filed on 12/18/2020)
December 18, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15344568.) filed by GENIUS MEDIA GROUP, INC., THE NATION COMPANY, L.P., THE PROGRESSIVE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Boies, David) (Filed on 12/18/2020)
December 18, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Phillips Rodriguez (Rodriguez, Sean) (Filed on 12/18/2020)
December 17, 2020 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/10/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/17/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2020)
December 17, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Alphabet Inc.,, Google LLC, YouTube, LLC. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2020)
December 17, 2020 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/31/2020. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2020)
December 16, 2020 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet by GENIUS MEDIA GROUP, INC., THE NATION COMPANY, L.P., THE PROGRESSIVE, INC. AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET. (Mao, Hsiao) (Filed on 12/16/2020)
December 16, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by GENIUS MEDIA GROUP, INC., THE NATION COMPANY, L.P., THE PROGRESSIVE, INC. identifying Other Affiliate Andreesen Horowitz, Other Affiliate Detroit Venture Partners, Other Affiliate Everblue Management for GENIUS MEDIA GROUP, INC.. (Mao, Hsiao) (Filed on 12/16/2020)
December 16, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Mao, Hsiao) (Filed on 12/16/2020)
December 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15330210.). Filed byTHE NATION COMPANY, L.P., GENIUS MEDIA GROUP, INC., THE PROGRESSIVE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mao, Hsiao) (Filed on 12/16/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Genius Media Group, Inc. et al v. Alphabet Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE NATION COMPANY, L.P.
Represented By: Hsiao C. Mao
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Carol L. O'Keefe
Represented By: Robert E. Litan
Represented By: Jamie L Boyer
Represented By: Stephen Matthew Tillery
Represented By: Ryan Z. Cortazar
Represented By: Randall P. Ewing, Jr.
Represented By: Philip C. Korologos
Represented By: Jesse Michael Panuccio
Represented By: Sean Phillips Rodriguez
Represented By: Michael E Klenov
Represented By: Abby Lauren Dennis
Represented By: George Andrew Zelcs
Represented By: Sabria Alexandra McElroy
Represented By: Jonathon D. Byrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GENIUS MEDIA GROUP, INC.
Represented By: Hsiao C. Mao
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Carol L. O'Keefe
Represented By: Robert E. Litan
Represented By: Jamie L Boyer
Represented By: Stephen Matthew Tillery
Represented By: Ryan Z. Cortazar
Represented By: Randall P. Ewing, Jr.
Represented By: Philip C. Korologos
Represented By: Jesse Michael Panuccio
Represented By: Sean Phillips Rodriguez
Represented By: Michael E Klenov
Represented By: Abby Lauren Dennis
Represented By: George Andrew Zelcs
Represented By: Sabria Alexandra McElroy
Represented By: Jonathon D. Byrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE PROGRESSIVE, INC.
Represented By: Hsiao C. Mao
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Carol L. O'Keefe
Represented By: Robert E. Litan
Represented By: Jamie L Boyer
Represented By: Stephen Matthew Tillery
Represented By: Ryan Z. Cortazar
Represented By: Randall P. Ewing, Jr.
Represented By: Philip C. Korologos
Represented By: Jesse Michael Panuccio
Represented By: Sean Phillips Rodriguez
Represented By: Michael E Klenov
Represented By: Abby Lauren Dennis
Represented By: George Andrew Zelcs
Represented By: Sabria Alexandra McElroy
Represented By: Jonathon D. Byrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alphabet Inc.,
Represented By: John Edward Schmidtlein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YouTube, LLC
Represented By: John Edward Schmidtlein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google LLC
Represented By: John Edward Schmidtlein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?