Self-Insured Schools of California v. Jazz Pharmaceuticals PLC et al
Plaintiff: Self-Insured Schools of California
Defendant: Lupin Ltd., Endo Pharmaceuticals LLC, Mallinckrodt LLC, Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories LTD, Mallinckrodt PLC, Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Sun Pharmaceuticals Holdings USA, Inc, Endo International plc, Lupin Inc., Eurohealth (USA), Inc., Morton Grove Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited, Wockhardt LTD, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Jazz Pharmaceuticals PLC, Roxane Laboratories, Inc., Lupin Pharmaceuticals Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc, Sun Pharmaceuticals Industries, Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Wockhardt USA LLC, Sun Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd, West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp. and PAR Pharmaceutical Inc.,
Case Number: 5:2021cv00020
Filed: January 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Lucy H Koh
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2021 Filing 53 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 7:20-cv-06495. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 30, 2020 MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - Northern District of California. (sjo)
December 30, 2020 Filing 52 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - Northern District of California. (Signed by MDL Panel on 12/29/2020) (sjo)
November 30, 2020 Filing 51 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,. Document filed by Self-Insured Schools of California..(Williams, Steven)
November 16, 2020 Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
November 16, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
November 16, 2020 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 7:20-cv-06003-NSR. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
October 12, 2020 Filing 50 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY upon the record as to Mallinckrodt LLC and Mallinckrodt plc . Document filed by Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt plc.(Willis, Jane)
September 28, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #49 AMENDED MOTION for BRENDAN J. COFFMAN to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
September 28, 2020 Filing 49 AMENDED MOTION for BRENDAN J. COFFMAN to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Morton Grove Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Wockhardt Ltd., Wockhardt USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 DC Certificate of Good Standing, #3 VA Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order).(Coffman, Brendan)
September 23, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #47 MOTION for Stephen J. McIntyre to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21792942. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #48 MOTION for Monsura A. Sirajee to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21792949. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #46 MOTION for Benjamin G. Bradshaw to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21792931. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
September 22, 2020 Filing 48 MOTION for Monsura A. Sirajee to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21792949. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals LLC, PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Monsura A. Sirajee, #2 CA - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Sirajee, Monsura)
September 22, 2020 Filing 47 MOTION for Stephen J. McIntyre to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21792942. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals LLC, PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen J. McIntyre, #2 CA - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(McIntyre, Stephen)
September 22, 2020 Filing 46 MOTION for Benjamin G. Bradshaw to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21792931. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals LLC, PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Benjamin G. Bradshaw, #2 DC - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 CA - Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order).(Bradshaw, Benjamin)
September 22, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #45 MOTION for Joseph R. Saveri to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
September 22, 2020 Filing 45 MOTION for Joseph R. Saveri to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Self-Insured Schools of California. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Saveri, Joseph)
September 22, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #44 MOTION for Joseph R. Saveri to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Proposed Order;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (vba)
September 22, 2020 Filing 44 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Joseph R. Saveri to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Self-Insured Schools of California. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing).(Saveri, Joseph)Receipt No. ANYSDC-21779431 $200 Modified on 9/22/2020 (vba).
September 21, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #43 MOTION for BRENDAN J. COFFMAN to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21758694. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Virginia;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu)
September 21, 2020 Filing 43 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for BRENDAN J. COFFMAN to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21758694. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Morton Grove Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Wockhardt Ltd., Wockhardt USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing (District of Columbia), #3 Certificate of Good Standing (Virginia), #4 Text of Proposed Order).(Coffman, Brendan) Modified on 9/21/2020 (bcu).
September 18, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #42 MOTION for Kyle P. Quackenbush to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
September 18, 2020 Filing 42 MOTION for Kyle P. Quackenbush to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Self-Insured Schools of California. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order).(Quackenbush, Kyle)
September 14, 2020 Filing 41 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Endo International PLC for Endo Pharmaceuticals LLC, PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc.. Document filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals LLC, PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc...(Williamson, Brett)
September 14, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brett Johnston Williamson on behalf of Endo Pharmaceuticals LLC, PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc...(Williamson, Brett)
September 8, 2020 Filing 39 LETTER MOTION for Conference Regarding Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 28 USC 1404 addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Benjamin M. Greenblum dated September 8, 2020. Document filed by Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Greenblum, Benjamin)
September 4, 2020 Filing 38 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Wockhardt Ltd., Corporate Parent Wockhardt Holding Corporation for Morton Grove Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Wockhardt USA LLC. Document filed by Morton Grove Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Wockhardt Ltd., Wockhardt USA LLC..(Bank, Jeffrey)
September 4, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey C. Bank on behalf of Morton Grove Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Wockhardt Ltd., Wockhardt USA LLC..(Bank, Jeffrey)
September 3, 2020 Filing 36 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited, Jazz Pharmaceuticals PLC, Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Greenblum, Benjamin)
September 3, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Benjamin M. Greenblum on behalf of Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited, Jazz Pharmaceuticals PLC, Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Greenblum, Benjamin)
September 3, 2020 Filing 34 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Greenblum, Benjamin)
August 28, 2020 Filing 33 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Corporate Parent Sun Pharmaceutical Holdings USA, Inc. for Sun Pharmaceuticals Industries, Inc.; Corporate Parent Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. for Sun Pharmaceuticals Holdings USA, Inc. Document filed by Sun Pharmaceuticals Holdings USA, Inc, Sun Pharmaceuticals Industries, Inc...(Allon, Devora)
August 28, 2020 Filing 32 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Nanomi BV, Corporate Parent Lupid Ltd. for Lupin Inc.; Corporate Parent Lupid Ltd., Other Affiliate Lupin Inc. for Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Document filed by Lupin Inc., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc...(Allon, Devora)
August 28, 2020 Filing 31 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Fosun International Limited, Other Affiliate TPG Global, LLC, Other Affiliate Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC. Document filed by Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC..(Allon, Devora)
August 27, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gilad Bendheim on behalf of Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Lupin Inc., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Sun Pharmaceuticals Holdings USA, Inc, Sun Pharmaceuticals Industries, Inc...(Bendheim, Gilad)
August 27, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Devora Whitman Allon on behalf of Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Lupin Inc., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Sun Pharmaceuticals Holdings USA, Inc, Sun Pharmaceuticals Industries, Inc...(Allon, Devora)
August 27, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jay Philip Lefkowitz on behalf of Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Lupin Inc., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Sun Pharmaceuticals Holdings USA, Inc, Sun Pharmaceuticals Industries, Inc...(Lefkowitz, Jay)
August 26, 2020 Filing 27 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served on Watson Laboratories, Inc. on 8/24/2020. Service was accepted by Kerry Phillips, Autorized Agent. Document filed by Self-Insured Schools of California..(Saveri, Joseph)
August 26, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #26 FIRST MOTION for Kyle P. Quackenbush to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21341495. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from SUPREME COURT OF CALIFORNIA;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (vba)
August 26, 2020 Filing 26 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FIRST MOTION for Kyle P. Quackenbush to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21341495. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Self-Insured Schools of California. Return Date set for 8/27/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Standing, #3 Proposed Order).(Quackenbush, Kyle) Modified on 8/26/2020 (vba).
August 25, 2020 Filing 25 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Hikma Pharmaceuticals plc for Eurohealth (USA), Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Roxane Laboratories, Inc., West-Ward Pharmaceuticals, Corp.. Document filed by Eurohealth (USA), Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Roxane Laboratories, Inc., West-Ward Pharmaceuticals, Corp...(Pace, Jack)
August 24, 2020 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served on West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp. on 8/20/2020. Service was accepted by Gabriella Sanchez, Service Agent. Document filed by Self-Insured Schools of California..(Williams, Steven)
August 24, 2020 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served on Roxane Laboratories, Inc. on 8/20/2020. Service was accepted by Gabriella Sanchez, Service Agent. Document filed by Self-Insured Schools of California..(Williams, Steven)
August 24, 2020 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served on Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc. on 8/19/2020. Service was accepted by Jessie Gastelum, Service Agent. Document filed by Self-Insured Schools of California..(Williams, Steven)
August 24, 2020 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served on Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC on 8/20/2020. Service was accepted by Gabriella Sanchez, Service Agent. Document filed by Self-Insured Schools of California..(Williams, Steven)
August 24, 2020 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served on Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc on 8/21/2020. Service was accepted by Amy McLaren, Managing Agent. Document filed by Self-Insured Schools of California..(Williams, Steven)
August 24, 2020 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served on Wockhardt USA LLC on 8/19/2020. Service was accepted by Lyanne Gares, Litigation Management. Document filed by Self-Insured Schools of California..(Williams, Steven)
August 24, 2020 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served on Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc. on 8/19/2020. Service was accepted by Curt Sweltz, Managing Agent. Document filed by Self-Insured Schools of California..(Williams, Steven)
August 24, 2020 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served on Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. on 8/19/2020. Service was accepted by Lyanne Gares, Litigation Management. Document filed by Self-Insured Schools of California..(Williams, Steven)
August 24, 2020 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served on Sun Pharmaceutical Holdings USA, Inc. on 8/19/2020. Service was accepted by Lyanne Gares, Litigation Management. Document filed by Self-Insured Schools of California..(Williams, Steven)
August 24, 2020 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served on Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc on 8/21/2020. Service was accepted by Amy McLaren, Managing Agent. Document filed by Self-Insured Schools of California..(Williams, Steven)
August 24, 2020 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served on Morton Grove Pharmaceuticals on 8/21/2020. Service was accepted by Amy McLaren, Managing Agent. Document filed by Self-Insured Schools of California..(Williams, Steven)
August 24, 2020 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served on Mallinckrodt LLC on 8/21/2020. Service was accepted by Amy McLaren, Managing Agent. Document filed by Self-Insured Schools of California..(Williams, Steven)
August 24, 2020 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served on Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc on 8/21/2020. Service was accepted by Amy McLaren, Managing Agent. Document filed by Self-Insured Schools of California..(Williams, Steven)
August 24, 2020 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served on Eurohealth (U.S.A.) Inc. on 8/21/2020. Service was accepted by Amy McLaren, Managing Agent. Document filed by Self-Insured Schools of California..(Williams, Steven)
August 24, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served on Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. on 8/21/2020. Service was accepted by Amy McLaren, Managing Agent. Document filed by Self-Insured Schools of California..(Williams, Steven)
August 24, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served on Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC on 8/21/2020. Service was accepted by Amy McLaren. Document filed by Self-Insured Schools of California..(Williams, Steven)
August 21, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kathryn Jordan Mims on behalf of Eurohealth (USA), Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Roxane Laboratories, Inc., West-Ward Pharmaceuticals, Corp...(Mims, Kathryn)
August 21, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jack Pace on behalf of Eurohealth (USA), Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Roxane Laboratories, Inc., West-Ward Pharmaceuticals, Corp...(Pace, Jack)
August 17, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Endo International PLC, Endo Pharmaceuticals LLC, Eurohealth (USA), Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals, PLC, Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited, Jazz Pharmaceuticals PLC, Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Lupin Inc., Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt plc, Morton Grove Pharmaceuticals, Inc., PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories Ltd., Roxane Laboratories, Inc., Sun Pharmaceuticals Holdings USA, Inc, Sun Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd, Sun Pharmaceuticals Industries, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Watson Laboratories, Inc., West-Ward Pharmaceuticals, Corp., Wockhardt Ltd...(pc)
August 17, 2020 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Nelson Stephen Roman as possibly related to 20cv6003. (pc)
August 17, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
August 17, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(pc)
August 17, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Steven N. Williams. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand blank;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $5,000,000;. (pc)
August 17, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Steven N. Williams. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Self-Insured Schools of California, Watson Laboratories, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted;. (pc)
August 14, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JAZZ PHARMACEUTICALS PLC; JAZZ PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.; JAZZ PHARMACEUTICALS IRELAND LIMITED; HIKMA PHARMACEUTICALS PLC; EUROHEALTH (USA), INC; HIKMA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.; WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP.; ROXANE LABORATORIES, INC.; AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS LLC; ENDO INTERNATIONAL, PLC; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS LLC; PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC.; LUPIN LTD.; LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS INC; LUPIN INC.; SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD.; SUN PHARMACEUTICAL HOLDINGS USA, INC; SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC.; RANBAXY LABORATORIES LTD.; TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD.; WATSON LABORATORIES, INC; WOCKHARDT LTD.; MORTON GROVE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC,; WOCKHARDT USA LLC; MALLINCKRODT PLC; MALLINCKRODT LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Self-Insured Schools of California..(Williams, Steven) Modified on 8/17/2020 (pc).
August 14, 2020 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Self-Insured Schools of California..(Williams, Steven)
August 14, 2020 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 7:20-cv-06003-NSR. Document filed by Self-Insured Schools of California..(Williams, Steven)
August 14, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Williams, Steven)
August 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Endo International PLC, Endo Pharmaceuticals LLC, Eurohealth (USA), Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals, PLC, Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited, Jazz Pharmaceuticals PLC, Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Lupin Inc., Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt plc, Morton Grove Pharmaceuticals, Inc., PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories Ltd., Roxane Laboratories, Inc., Sun Pharmaceuticals Holdings USA, Inc, Sun Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd, Sun Pharmaceuticals Industries, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Watson Laboratories, Inc., West-Ward Pharmaceuticals, Corp., Wockhardt Ltd., Wockhardt USA LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21167193)Document filed by Self-Insured Schools of California..(Williams, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Self-Insured Schools of California v. Jazz Pharmaceuticals PLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ranbaxy Laboratories LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Pharmaceuticals Holdings USA, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo International plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eurohealth (USA), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morton Grove Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wockhardt LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jazz Pharmaceuticals PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roxane Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Pharmaceuticals Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wockhardt USA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAR Pharmaceutical Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Self-Insured Schools of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?