Volle v. Kopelev et al
Plaintiff: Debra Volle
Defendant: Larysa Kopelev, Leon Kopelev and Pabla Beverages Inc.
Case Number: 5:2021cv00665
Filed: January 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Nature of Suit: American with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2021 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Larysa Kopelev, Leon Kopelev, Pabla Beverages Inc... (Phillips, Samuel) (Filed on 3/17/2021)
March 15, 2021 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE RE: Consent or Declination. Defendants are requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 3/29/2021. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2021)
March 10, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand with Proof of Service byLarysa Kopelev, Leon Kopelev, Pabla Beverages Inc.. (Phillips, Samuel) (Filed on 3/10/2021)
March 8, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Debra Volle. Larysa Kopelev served on 2/18/2021, answer due 3/11/2021; Leon Kopelev served on 3/2/2021, answer due 3/23/2021; Pabla Beverages Inc. served on 3/4/2021, answer due 3/25/2021. (Karbelashvili, Irakli) (Filed on 3/8/2021)
February 5, 2021 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING the Initial Case Management Conference for 6/2/2021, at 10:00 AM, by telephone before Judge Nathanael Cousins. Case Management Statement due by 5/26/2021. Defendants are requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 2/19/2021. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2021)
January 28, 2021 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Debra Volle.. (Karbelashvili, Irakli) (Filed on 1/28/2021)
January 28, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Larysa Kopelev, Leon Kopelev, Pabla Beverages Inc. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2021)
January 28, 2021 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2021)
January 28, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/11/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2021)
January 27, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Karbelashvili, Irakli) (Filed on 1/27/2021)
January 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15501829.). Filed byDebra Volle. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Karbelashvili, Irakli) (Filed on 1/27/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Volle v. Kopelev et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larysa Kopelev
Represented By: Samuel Lawrence Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leon Kopelev
Represented By: Samuel Lawrence Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pabla Beverages Inc.
Represented By: Samuel Lawrence Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Volle
Represented By: Irakli Karbelashvili
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?