Oceana, Inc. v. Coggins et al
Plaintiff: Oceana, Inc.
Defendant: National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration, Wynn Coggins and National Marine Fisheries Service
Case Number: 5:2021cv00736
Filed: January 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Edward J Davila
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order Granting #17 Stipulation Extending Deadline for Answer and Administrative Record. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 03/16/2021. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2021)
March 15, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Clifford Eugene Stevens, Jr (Stevens, Clifford) (Filed on 3/15/2021)
March 15, 2021 Filing 17 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Due Date for Answer and Administrative Record filed by Wynn Coggins, National Marine Fisheries Service, National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Stevens, Clifford) (Filed on 3/15/2021)
February 17, 2021 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Pursuant to this notice, an Initial Case Management Conference is set for 5/20/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Edward J. Davila. A Joint Case Management Statement is due by 5/13/2021. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the Court's web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2021)
February 17, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Oceana, Inc.. All Defendants. (Treece, Andrea) (Filed on 2/17/2021)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remans as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 2/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2021)
February 12, 2021 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2021)
February 12, 2021 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Oceana, Inc... (Treece, Andrea) (Filed on 2/12/2021)
February 3, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE re #10 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases by Oceana, Inc.. (Treece, Andrea) (Filed on 2/3/2021)
February 2, 2021 Filing 10 SUA SPONTE Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Case 5:21-cv-00736 NC with 5:19-cv-03809 LHK. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 2/2/2021. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2021)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #4 APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney Stephen D. Mashuda Pro Hac Vice representing Oceana, Inc. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2021)
February 1, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Wynn Coggins, National Marine Fisheries Service, National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2021)
February 1, 2021 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/28/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/5/2021 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2021)
February 1, 2021 Filing 6 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/16/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2021)
January 29, 2021 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Entities by Oceana, Inc. (Treece, Andrea) (Filed on 1/29/2021)
January 29, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Stephen D. Mashuda ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15511143.) filed by Oceana, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Treece, Andrea) (Filed on 1/29/2021)
January 29, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Oceana, Inc. (Treece, Andrea) (Filed on 1/29/2021)
January 29, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Treece, Andrea) (Filed on 1/29/2021)
January 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Wynn Coggins, National Marine Fisheries Service, National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15511014.). Filed byOceana, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Treece, Andrea) (Filed on 1/29/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oceana, Inc. v. Coggins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration
Represented By: Clifford Eugene Stevens, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wynn Coggins
Represented By: Clifford Eugene Stevens, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Marine Fisheries Service
Represented By: Clifford Eugene Stevens, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oceana, Inc.
Represented By: Andrea A. Treece
Represented By: Stephen D Mashuda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?