George v. United States
Plaintiff: Richard George
Defendant: United States
Case Number: 5:2021cv01187
Filed: February 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward J Davila
Referring Judge: Susan van Keulen
2 Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7422
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2021 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Richard George re #9 Summons Issued as to USA Summons, Complaint, etc. as noted in Proof of Service (George, Richard) (Filed on 4/15/2021)
April 15, 2021 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Richard George re #16 Summons Issued as to USA Summons, Complaint, etc. as noted in Proof of Service (George, Richard) (Filed on 4/15/2021)
April 15, 2021 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to United States, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2021)
April 15, 2021 Filing 15 Proposed Summons. (George, Richard) (Filed on 4/15/2021)
March 8, 2021 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Richard George re #9 Summons Issued as to USA Proof of Service (George, Richard) (Filed on 3/8/2021)
March 8, 2021 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Richard George re #8 Summons Issued as to USA Proof of Service (George, Richard) (Filed on 3/8/2021)
March 5, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Richard George re #7 Proposed Summons Proof of Service (George, Richard) (Filed on 3/5/2021)
March 5, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Richard George re #6 Proposed Summons Proof of Service (George, Richard) (Filed on 3/5/2021)
March 3, 2021 Filing 10 (Text Only) CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/10/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/20/2021 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Hon. Edward J. Davila. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
March 3, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to United States, U.S. Attorney General (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2021)
March 3, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to United States, U.S. Attorney (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2021)
March 3, 2021 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. (George, Richard) (Filed on 3/3/2021)
March 3, 2021 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. (George, Richard) (Filed on 3/3/2021)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.Signed by the Clerk on 3/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
March 1, 2021 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
March 1, 2021 Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Richard George.. (George, Richard) (Filed on 3/1/2021)
February 16, 2021 Filing 2 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/12/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/19/2021 at 1:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
February 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (no process) against United States (Filing fee $ 402, receipt 34611153106). Filed by Richard George. Consent/Declination due by 3/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2021) Modified on 2/19/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: George v. United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?