Edelson v. Pogotec, Inc.
Plaintiff: Harry Edelson
Defendant: Pogotec, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2021cv01699
Filed: March 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2021 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Re: #11 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment filed by Harry Edelson (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2021)
May 3, 2021 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Harry Edelson.. (Furbush, David) (Filed on 5/3/2021)
May 3, 2021 Filing 11 ***INCORRECT EVENT SELECTED WHEN POSTING DOCUMENT*** MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment filed by Harry Edelson. (Furbush, David) (Filed on 5/3/2021) Modified on 5/4/2021 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
April 21, 2021 Filing 10 STIPULATION to Extend Time to File a Response to the Initial Complaint filed by Harry Edelson. (Furbush, David) (Filed on 4/21/2021)
April 19, 2021 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 5/3/2021. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2021)
April 13, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Harry Edelson. Pogotec, Inc. served on 3/30/2021, answer due 4/20/2021. (Furbush, David) (Filed on 4/13/2021)
March 26, 2021 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 4/9/2021. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2021)
March 11, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Pogotec, Inc.. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2021)
March 11, 2021 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Furbush, David) (Filed on 3/11/2021)
March 11, 2021 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/8/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/15/2021 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2021)
March 11, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/25/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2021)
March 10, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE by Harry Edelson of Interested Parties and Certification (Furbush, David) (Filed on 3/10/2021)
March 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Breach of Contract and Common Counts against Pogotec, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15685025.). Filed byHarry Edelson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Furbush, David) (Filed on 3/10/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edelson v. Pogotec, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Edelson
Represented By: David Malcolm Furbush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pogotec, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?