Day v. GEICO Casualty Company et al
Plaintiff: Jessica Day
Defendant: GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Company and GEICO Indemnity Company
Case Number: 5:2021cv02103
Filed: March 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Referring Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #11 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/29/2021.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2021)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #10 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/29/2021. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2021)
April 29, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15907189.) filed by Jessica Day. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Morgan, Matthew) (Filed on 4/29/2021)
April 29, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15907026.) filed by Jessica Day. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Raimey, Chloe) (Filed on 4/29/2021)
April 14, 2021 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AFTER REASSIGNMENT. Case Management Statement due by 7/29/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/5/2021 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2021)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 4/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2021) Modified on 4/12/2021 (sfbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/13/2021 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
April 9, 2021 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2021)
April 8, 2021 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jessica Day.. (Schug, Robert) (Filed on 4/8/2021)
March 29, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2021)
March 26, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Schug, Robert) (Filed on 3/26/2021)
March 26, 2021 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/22/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/29/2021 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2021)
March 25, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/9/2021. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2021) Modified on 3/26/2021 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
March 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15752315.). Filed byJessica Day. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schug, Robert) (Filed on 3/25/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Day v. GEICO Casualty Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Day
Represented By: Robert Loren Schug
Represented By: Chloe A Raimey
Represented By: Matthew H Morgan
Represented By: Matthew C. Helland
Represented By: Melody L. Sequoia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO General Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?