McCloskey v. Apple, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sean McCloskey
Defendant: Apple Inc
Case Number: 5:2021cv02803
Filed: April 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward J Davila
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2021 Filing 16 Case transferred in from District of Ohio Southern; Case Number 3:20-cv-00434. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 19, 2021 Case transferred to District of California Northern. Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. (er)
April 19, 2021 Filing 15 TRANSFER ORDER- Pursuant to the Panel on MDL this action has been transferred to the Northern District of California under the MDL 2985. (er)
April 19, 2021 Filing 14 TRANSFER ORDER- A transfer order has been filed in this litigation. Rule 2.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, states. An order to transfer or remand pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 shall be effective only upon its filing with the clerk of the transferee district court.You will receive a certified copy of this order from the transferee court along with notification of the newly assigned case number in that district. With the advent of electronic filing, Rule 9.1 of the Panel Rules shall be satisfied upon transmittal of the portion of the file deemed necessary and requested by the transferee court. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 3/30/2021. (er)
March 25, 2021 NOTICE: Counsel is advised to review and become familiar with Judge Michael J. Newman's # Standing Order Governing Civil Cases. This Order replaces General Order No. 1201 Dayton in all civil cases before Judge Newman (pb)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER: Upon good cause shown, and absent objection, the parties' joint motion to stay the proceedings thirty days in light of the pendency of Defendant Apple, Inc's Motion for Transfer of Actions before the Joint Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (doc. #13 ) is GRANTED. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Michael J. Newman on 1/26/2021. (srb)
January 26, 2021 Filing 13 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Defendant Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Uhl, Judd)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER: For good cause shown, and absent objection, the parties joint motion for extension of time for Defendant Apple, Inc. to respond to Plaintiffs complaint (doc. #12 ) is GRANTED. Defendant shall plead or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs complaint on or before February 5, 2021. Plaintiff shall file a memorandum in opposition to Defendants motion directed at the pleadings within 60 days following the filing of Defendants motion. Defendant may file a reply within 30 days following the filing of Plaintiffs opposition. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Michael J. Newman on 12/29/2020. (dm) Modified on 12/29/2020 (dm).
December 29, 2020 Filing 12 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint New date requested 2/5/2021. by Defendant Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Uhl, Judd)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER: For good cause shown, and absent objection, the parties agreed motion for an extension of time for Defendant to plead or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs complaint (doc. #10 ) is GRANTED. Defendant shall plead or respond to Plaintiffs complaint on or before 1/15/2021. In addition to the foregoing, the parties request that the Court set a briefing schedule with regard to Defendants anticipated motion directed to the pleadings. For good cause shown, the parties unopposed request in this regard is also GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file a memorandum in opposition within 60 days following the filing of Defendants motion and, thereafter, Defendant may file a reply within 30 days following the filing of Plaintiffs opposition. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Michael J. Newman on 12/2/2020. (srb)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Dargan Ware and John Norris. Signed by Judge Michael J. Newman on 11/30/2020. (srb)
November 29, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $400 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-7796311) of Dargan Ware and John Norris by Plaintiff Sean McCloskey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ware Certificate, #2 Supplement #2 Motion John Norris, Esq., #3 Exhibit #2 Norris Certificate) (Breen, John)
November 24, 2020 Filing 10 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 1/15/2021. by Defendant Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Uhl, Judd)
November 24, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Judd R Uhl for Defendant Apple, Inc. (Uhl, Judd)
November 24, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Lyn Brockman for Defendant Apple, Inc. (Brockman, Stephanie)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Michael J. Newman for all further proceedings. Judge Thomas M. Rose no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 11/18/2020. (ss)
October 27, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Apple, Inc. (jmb)
October 27, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Breen, John)
October 26, 2020 If case is referred it will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman. (jmb)
October 26, 2020 Notice re: #2 Request for Issuance of Summons. Since Counsel for Plaintiff filed both a Request or Issuance of Summons and Request for Waiver of Service #3 , the Clerk of Courts will not issue summons until after the 12/4/2020 deadline has passed if Defendant has not waived service accordingly. (jmb)
October 23, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Plaintiff SEAN McCLOSKEY Civil Cover Sheet (Breen, John)
October 23, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Apple, Inc. on 10/26/2020 by Plaintiff SEAN McCLOSKEY. Waiver of Service due by 12/4/2020. (Breen, John)
October 23, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Breen, John)
October 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SEAN McCLOSKEY ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7722588), filed by SEAN McCLOSKEY. (Breen, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCloskey v. Apple, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc
Represented By: Stephanie Lyn Brockman
Represented By: Judd R Uhl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean McCloskey
Represented By: John Edward Breen
Represented By: Dargan M. Ware
Represented By: John E. Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?