Allen v. 3M Company et al
Plaintiff: Ken Allen, Jim Carter, Tom Afflixio, Susan Gluck, Dave Moore, Tom Scully, Edward Lake, John Skeen, Jr., Pesha Perlsweig, Steve O'Connor, Dale Foster, Lacy Atkinson, Don Jonasson, Bob King, Fran Jonasson, Chuck Gluck, Keith Kjeldsen, Jose Avila, Wayne Chapp, Bob Naughten, David Jimenez and Jim McClure
Defendant: Archroma U.S. Inc., Chemours Company, The, Tyco Fire Products, LP, Fire Service Plus, Inc., 3M Company, Daikin America, Inc., Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mallory Safety and Supply LLC, E. I. Du Pont De Nemours & Co., Chemguard, Inc., L.N. Curtis & Sons, Perimeter Solutions, LP, Buckeye Fire Equipment, Lion Group, Inc., Johnson Controls, Inc., Stedfast USA, Inc., W.L. Gore & Associates, Inc., Dynax Corporation, Honeywell Safety Products USA, Inc., Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., Ten Cate Protective Fabrics, Carrier Global Corporation, Allstar Fire Equipment, PBI Performance Products, Inc., Arkema Inc., National Foam, Inc., Municipal Emergency Services Inc., Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, AGC Chemicals Americas, Inc., Amerex Corporation and Southern Mills, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2021cv03428
Filed: May 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2021 Case transferred from the Northern District of California has been opened in District of South Carolina as case 2:21-cv-01573, filed 05/27/2021. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2021)
May 25, 2021 Filing 15 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO - 53) Transferring Case 5:21-cv-03428, Allen v. 3M Company et al, to the District of South Carolina to become part of MDL 2873. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2021)
May 21, 2021 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 6/4/2021. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2021)
May 21, 2021 Received email on 5/20/2021 from Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP requesting that the Clerk's Office change party name Ten Cate Protective Fabrics doing business as Southern Mills Inc. to just Southern Mills, Inc. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2021)
May 14, 2021 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #12 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by Municipal Emergency Services Inc. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2021)
May 14, 2021 Filing 13 Certificate of Interested Entities by Municipal Emergency Services Inc. identifying Other Affiliate MES I Acquisition, Inc. for Municipal Emergency Services Inc.. (MES I Acquisition, Inc. 100% owns Defendant Municipal Emergency Services Inc.) (Kroeger, Shelby) (Filed on 5/14/2021)
May 14, 2021 Filing 12 Answer to #1 Removal Complaint by Municipal Emergency Services Inc.. (Kroeger, Shelby) (Filed on 5/14/2021) Modified on 5/14/2021 incorrect event selected when posting document (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
May 14, 2021 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ten Cate Protective Fabrics identifying Corporate Parent TenCate Protective Fabrics Holding B.V. for Ten Cate Protective Fabrics. (Kleinman, Benjamin) (Filed on 5/14/2021)
May 14, 2021 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Entities by Ten Cate Protective Fabrics identifying Corporate Parent Ten Cate Protective Fabrics Holding B.V., Other Affiliate Koninklijke Ten Cate B.V., Other Affiliate Tennessee Acquisition B.V., Other Affiliate Tennessee Acquisition Holding B.V., Other Affiliate Tennessee Investment Holdings B.V., Other Affiliate Gilde Buy-out Fund IV C.V., Other Affiliate Parcom Tennessee Holding B.V., Other Affiliate Knoxville B.V., Other Affiliate Capital A. Holding V B.V., Other Affiliate Capital A Fund Cooperatief U.A., Other Affiliate Capital A Fund V C.V. for Ten Cate Protective Fabrics. (Kleinman, Benjamin) (Filed on 5/14/2021)
May 14, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Max Kleinman (Kleinman, Benjamin) (Filed on 5/14/2021)
May 14, 2021 Filing 8 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by 3M Company. (Queen, Daniel) (Filed on 5/14/2021)
May 10, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Perimeter Solutions, LP identifying Corporate Parent Perimeter Solutions North America, Inc. for Perimeter Solutions, LP. (Thurlow, Matthew) (Filed on 5/10/2021)
May 10, 2021 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Entities by Perimeter Solutions, LP identifying Corporate Parent Perimeter Solutions North America, Inc. for Perimeter Solutions, LP. (Thurlow, Matthew) (Filed on 5/10/2021)
May 10, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew David Thurlow for Perimeter Solutions, LP (Thurlow, Matthew) (Filed on 5/10/2021)
May 7, 2021 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/3/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/10/2021 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2021)
May 7, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/21/2021. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2021)
May 7, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Notice of Removal, and have been added to this case: Lacy Atkinson, Dale Foster, Tom Afflixio, Jim Carter, Jose Avila, Chuck Gluck, Don Jonasson, Bob King, Keith Kjeldsen, Edward Lake, Dave Moore, Bob Naughten, Tom Scully, John Skeen, Jr, David Jimenez, Steve O'Connor, Jim McClure, Wayne Chapp, Pesha Perlsweig, Susan Gluck, Fran Jonasson, E. I. Du Pont De Nemours & Co., Chemours Company, The, Archroma U.S. Inc., Arkema Inc., AGC Chemicals Americas, Inc., Daikin America, Inc., Dynax Corporation, Johnson Controls, Inc., National Foam, Inc., Carrier Global Corporation, Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., Perimeter Solutions, LP, Fire Service Plus, Inc., Buckeye Fire Equipment, Amerex Corporation, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Lion Group, Inc., W.L. Gore & Associates, Inc., Ten Cate Protective Fabrics, PBI Performance Products, Inc., Honeywell Safety Products USA, Inc., Stedfast USA, Inc., L.N. Curtis & Sons, Allstar Fire Equipment, Mallory Safety and Supply LLC and Municipal Emergency Services Inc.. (This is a text-only entry.) (Raber, Stephen) (Filed on 5/7/2021)
May 7, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara. Their case number is 21CV378917. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0971-15940384). Filed by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP, 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Filings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Raber, Stephen) (Filed on 5/7/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ken Allen
Represented By: Elizabeth C Pritzker
Represented By: Jonathan Krasne Levine
Represented By: Heather Page Haggarty
Represented By: Bethany Caracuzzo
Represented By: Caroline Camille Corbitt
Represented By: Richard R. Seal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim Carter
Represented By: Elizabeth C Pritzker
Represented By: Jonathan Krasne Levine
Represented By: Heather Page Haggarty
Represented By: Bethany Caracuzzo
Represented By: Caroline Camille Corbitt
Represented By: Richard R. Seal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Afflixio
Represented By: Elizabeth C Pritzker
Represented By: Jonathan Krasne Levine
Represented By: Heather Page Haggarty
Represented By: Bethany Caracuzzo
Represented By: Caroline Camille Corbitt
Represented By: Richard R. Seal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Gluck
Represented By: Elizabeth C Pritzker
Represented By: Jonathan Krasne Levine
Represented By: Heather Page Haggarty
Represented By: Bethany Caracuzzo
Represented By: Caroline Camille Corbitt
Represented By: Richard R. Seal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dave Moore
Represented By: Elizabeth C Pritzker
Represented By: Jonathan Krasne Levine
Represented By: Heather Page Haggarty
Represented By: Bethany Caracuzzo
Represented By: Caroline Camille Corbitt
Represented By: Richard R. Seal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Scully
Represented By: Elizabeth C Pritzker
Represented By: Jonathan Krasne Levine
Represented By: Heather Page Haggarty
Represented By: Bethany Caracuzzo
Represented By: Caroline Camille Corbitt
Represented By: Richard R. Seal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Lake
Represented By: Elizabeth C Pritzker
Represented By: Jonathan Krasne Levine
Represented By: Heather Page Haggarty
Represented By: Bethany Caracuzzo
Represented By: Caroline Camille Corbitt
Represented By: Richard R. Seal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Skeen, Jr.
Represented By: Elizabeth C Pritzker
Represented By: Jonathan Krasne Levine
Represented By: Heather Page Haggarty
Represented By: Bethany Caracuzzo
Represented By: Caroline Camille Corbitt
Represented By: Richard R. Seal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pesha Perlsweig
Represented By: Elizabeth C Pritzker
Represented By: Jonathan Krasne Levine
Represented By: Heather Page Haggarty
Represented By: Bethany Caracuzzo
Represented By: Caroline Camille Corbitt
Represented By: Richard R. Seal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve O'Connor
Represented By: Elizabeth C Pritzker
Represented By: Jonathan Krasne Levine
Represented By: Heather Page Haggarty
Represented By: Bethany Caracuzzo
Represented By: Caroline Camille Corbitt
Represented By: Richard R. Seal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Foster
Represented By: Elizabeth C Pritzker
Represented By: Jonathan Krasne Levine
Represented By: Heather Page Haggarty
Represented By: Bethany Caracuzzo
Represented By: Caroline Camille Corbitt
Represented By: Richard R. Seal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lacy Atkinson
Represented By: Elizabeth C Pritzker
Represented By: Jonathan Krasne Levine
Represented By: Heather Page Haggarty
Represented By: Bethany Caracuzzo
Represented By: Caroline Camille Corbitt
Represented By: Richard R. Seal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Jonasson
Represented By: Elizabeth C Pritzker
Represented By: Jonathan Krasne Levine
Represented By: Heather Page Haggarty
Represented By: Bethany Caracuzzo
Represented By: Caroline Camille Corbitt
Represented By: Richard R. Seal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bob King
Represented By: Elizabeth C Pritzker
Represented By: Jonathan Krasne Levine
Represented By: Heather Page Haggarty
Represented By: Bethany Caracuzzo
Represented By: Caroline Camille Corbitt
Represented By: Richard R. Seal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fran Jonasson
Represented By: Elizabeth C Pritzker
Represented By: Jonathan Krasne Levine
Represented By: Heather Page Haggarty
Represented By: Bethany Caracuzzo
Represented By: Caroline Camille Corbitt
Represented By: Richard R. Seal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chuck Gluck
Represented By: Elizabeth C Pritzker
Represented By: Jonathan Krasne Levine
Represented By: Heather Page Haggarty
Represented By: Bethany Caracuzzo
Represented By: Caroline Camille Corbitt
Represented By: Richard R. Seal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Kjeldsen
Represented By: Elizabeth C Pritzker
Represented By: Jonathan Krasne Levine
Represented By: Heather Page Haggarty
Represented By: Bethany Caracuzzo
Represented By: Caroline Camille Corbitt
Represented By: Richard R. Seal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Avila
Represented By: Elizabeth C Pritzker
Represented By: Jonathan Krasne Levine
Represented By: Heather Page Haggarty
Represented By: Bethany Caracuzzo
Represented By: Caroline Camille Corbitt
Represented By: Richard R. Seal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Chapp
Represented By: Elizabeth C Pritzker
Represented By: Jonathan Krasne Levine
Represented By: Heather Page Haggarty
Represented By: Bethany Caracuzzo
Represented By: Caroline Camille Corbitt
Represented By: Richard R. Seal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bob Naughten
Represented By: Elizabeth C Pritzker
Represented By: Jonathan Krasne Levine
Represented By: Heather Page Haggarty
Represented By: Bethany Caracuzzo
Represented By: Caroline Camille Corbitt
Represented By: Richard R. Seal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Jimenez
Represented By: Elizabeth C Pritzker
Represented By: Jonathan Krasne Levine
Represented By: Heather Page Haggarty
Represented By: Bethany Caracuzzo
Represented By: Caroline Camille Corbitt
Represented By: Richard R. Seal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim McClure
Represented By: Elizabeth C Pritzker
Represented By: Jonathan Krasne Levine
Represented By: Heather Page Haggarty
Represented By: Bethany Caracuzzo
Represented By: Caroline Camille Corbitt
Represented By: Richard R. Seal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Archroma U.S. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemours Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products, LP
Represented By: Stephen David Raber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fire Service Plus, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Daniel D Queen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daikin America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallory Safety and Supply LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. I. Du Pont De Nemours & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemguard, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen David Raber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L.N. Curtis & Sons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perimeter Solutions, LP
Represented By: Matthew David Thurlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lion Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Controls, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stedfast USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W.L. Gore & Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dynax Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell Safety Products USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde-Fenwal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ten Cate Protective Fabrics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Global Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstar Fire Equipment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PBI Performance Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkema Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Foam, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Municipal Emergency Services Inc.
Represented By: Shelby Kathryn Kroeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Globe Manufacturing Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGC Chemicals Americas, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerex Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Mills, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Max Kleinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?