Kidron v. Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Yael Kidron
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, LLC, Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc. and Coopersurgical, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2021cv03613
Filed: May 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward J Davila
Referring Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2021 Filing 17 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-22) MDL No. 2974. Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Northern District of Georgia for the reasons stated in the order consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Leigh Martin May. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2021)
June 2, 2021 Remark - Case transferred from California Northern has been opened in Northern District of Georgia as case 1:21-cv-02267, filed 06/02/2021. (cvS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2021)
May 26, 2021 Filing 16 (Text Only) CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/9/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/19/2021 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Hon. Edward J. Davila. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2021)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 5/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2021)
May 26, 2021 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2021)
May 26, 2021 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Coopersurgical, Inc., Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc., Teva Women's Health, LLC, The Cooper Companies, Inc... (Rhoads, Kathleen) (Filed on 5/26/2021)
May 14, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Coopersurgical, Inc., Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc., Teva Women's Health, LLC, The Cooper Companies, Inc. re 10 Case Assigned by Intake,,, (Rhoads, Kathleen) (Filed on 5/14/2021)
May 14, 2021 Filing 11 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/10/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/17/2021 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2021)
May 14, 2021 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #2 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by Coopersurgical, Inc., #4 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc., #5 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by Teva Women's Health, Inc., #6 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by Teva Women's Health, LLC, #3 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc., #7 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by The Cooper Companies, Inc. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2021)
May 13, 2021 Filing 10 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/27/2021. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2021)
May 13, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc., Teva Women's Health, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. for Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc., Teva Women's Health, LLC. re #4 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), #6 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), #5 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), #3 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) (Rhoads, Kathleen) (Filed on 5/13/2021)
May 13, 2021 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Coopersurgical, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Associates, Inc., Other Affiliate Vanguard Group, Inc for Coopersurgical, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc.. re #2 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), #1 Notice of Removal, #7 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) (Rhoads, Kathleen) (Filed on 5/13/2021)
May 13, 2021 Filing 7 Answer to #1 Removal Complaint by The Cooper Companies, Inc.. (Rhoads, Kathleen) (Filed on 5/13/2021) Modified on 5/14/2021 incorrect event selected when posting document (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
May 13, 2021 Filing 6 Answer to #1 Removal Complaint by Teva Women's Health, LLC. (Rhoads, Kathleen) (Filed on 5/13/2021) Modified on 5/14/2021 incorrect event selected when posting document (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
May 13, 2021 Filing 5 Answer to #1 Removal Complaint by Teva Women's Health, Inc.. (Rhoads, Kathleen) (Filed on 5/13/2021) Modified on 5/14/2021 incorrect event selected when posting document (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
May 13, 2021 Filing 4 Answer to #1 Removal Complaint by Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc.. (Rhoads, Kathleen) (Filed on 5/13/2021) Modified on 5/14/2021 incorrect event selected when posting document (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
May 13, 2021 Filing 3 Answer to #1 Removal Complaint by Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc.. (Rhoads, Kathleen) (Filed on 5/13/2021) Modified on 5/14/2021 incorrect event selected when posting document (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
May 13, 2021 Filing 2 Answer to #1 Removal Complaint by Coopersurgical, Inc.. (Rhoads, Kathleen) (Filed on 5/13/2021) Modified on 5/14/2021incorrect event selected when posting document (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
May 13, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Santa Clara. Their case number is 21CV378979. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0971-15964126). Filed byThe Cooper Companies, Inc., Teva Women's Health, LLC, Teva Women's Health, Inc., Coopersurgical, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc., Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rhoads, Kathleen) (Filed on 5/13/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kidron v. Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc.
Represented By: Kathleen M Rhoads
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Women's Health, LLC
Represented By: Kathleen M Rhoads
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc.
Represented By: Kathleen M Rhoads
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Women's Health, Inc.
Represented By: Kathleen M Rhoads
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cooper Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Kathleen M Rhoads
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coopersurgical, Inc.
Represented By: Kathleen M Rhoads
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yael Kidron
Represented By: Lauren Aliz Welling
Represented By: Timothy Michael Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?