Johnson v. Auyeung Richard SC LLC
Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Defendant: Auyeung Richard SC LLC
Case Number: 5:2021cv03622
Filed: May 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: American with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2021 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendant Auyeung Richard SC LLC shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 7/21/2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2021)
July 6, 2021 Filing 10 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint to Extend Defendant's Time to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Auyeung Richard SC LLC. (Sahouria, Janelle) (Filed on 7/6/2021)
July 1, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Johnson. Amended POS (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 7/1/2021)
June 14, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Johnson. Auyeung Richard SC LLC served on 6/14/2021, answer due 7/6/2021. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 6/14/2021)
May 17, 2021 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Scott Johnson.. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 5/17/2021)
May 14, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Auyeung Richard SC LLC. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2021)
May 14, 2021 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2021)
May 14, 2021 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/28/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2021)
May 14, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 5/14/2021)
May 14, 2021 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Scott Johnson re #1 Complaint (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 5/14/2021)
May 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Auyeung Richard SC LLC ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15965385.). Filed byScott Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 5/14/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Auyeung Richard SC LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auyeung Richard SC LLC
Represented By: Janelle Jad Sahouria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Represented By: Amanda Lockhart Seabock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?