Asmara Restaurant, Inc. v. Asefaw et al
Plaintiff: Asmara Restaurant, Inc.
Defendant: Henok Bukrezion and Alexander Asefaw
Case Number: 5:2021cv03664
Filed: May 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2021 Filing 18 Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byAlexander Asefaw. (Robinson, Latonia) (Filed on 7/8/2021)
July 7, 2021 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 7/21/2021. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2021)
June 21, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byAlexander Asefaw. (Robinson, Latonia) (Filed on 6/21/2021)
June 17, 2021 Filing 15 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Asmara Restaurant, Inc... (Cheruvu, Padmini) (Filed on 6/17/2021)
June 14, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Asmara Restaurant, Inc.. Henok Bukrezion served on 6/9/2021, answer due 6/30/2021. (Cheruvu, Padmini) (Filed on 6/14/2021)
June 9, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Asmara Restaurant, Inc.. Alexander Asefaw served on 6/2/2021, answer due 6/23/2021. (Cheruvu, Padmini) (Filed on 6/9/2021)
June 9, 2021 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Please re-file in its entirety using correct event "Summons Returned Executed" Re: #12 Certificate of Service, filed by Asmara Restaurant, Inc. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2021)
June 8, 2021 Filing 12 ***INCORRECT EVENT SELECTED WHEN POSTING DOCUMENT*** CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Asmara Restaurant, Inc. re #1 Complaint, 3 Case Assigned by Intake,,, #7 Summons Issued, #5 Certificate of Interested Entities, #9 Patent/Trademark Report, #6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, #4 Certificate of Interested Entities and Required Judge and Standing Orders to be served on Defendant (Cheruvu, Padmini) (Filed on 6/8/2021) Modified on 6/9/2021 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
June 3, 2021 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 6/17/2021. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2021)
June 3, 2021 Filing 10 ***PLEASE DISREGARD FILED IN ERROR****CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 6/17/2021. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2021) Modified on 6/3/2021 (pmcS, COURT STAFF).
May 18, 2021 Filing 9 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Trademark (cc: form mailed to register). (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2021)
May 18, 2021 Filing 8 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding (cc: form mailed to register). (Cheruvu, Padmini) (Filed on 5/18/2021)
May 18, 2021 #Electronic filing error. Missing Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (AO Form 120). Please file in its entirety. Re: #1 Complaint filed by Asmara Restaurant, Inc. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2021)
May 17, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Alexander Asefaw, Henok Bukrezion. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2021)
May 17, 2021 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/10/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/17/2021 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2021)
May 17, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Asmara Restaurant, Inc. (Cheruvu, Padmini) (Filed on 5/17/2021)
May 17, 2021 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Asmara Restaurant, Inc. (Cheruvu, Padmini) (Filed on 5/17/2021)
May 17, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/1/2021. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2021)
May 17, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Cheruvu, Padmini) (Filed on 5/17/2021)
May 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alexander Asefaw, Henok Bukrezion ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15974373.). Filed byAsmara Restaurant, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cheruvu, Padmini) (Filed on 5/17/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Asmara Restaurant, Inc. v. Asefaw et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henok Bukrezion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Asefaw
Represented By: Latonia Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asmara Restaurant, Inc.
Represented By: Padmini Cheruvu
Represented By: Arun Bose
Represented By: Barbara Lorie Friedman
Represented By: Andrew Scott MacKay
Represented By: Arun Bose,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?