Kaufman v. Salesforce.com, Inc.
Plaintiff: Michael Philip Kaufman
Defendant: Salesforce.com Inc
Case Number: 5:2021cv04491
Filed: June 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2021 Filing 90 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/1/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/8/2021 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2021)
June 10, 2021 Filing 89 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:20-cv-06879. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 3, 2021 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Northern District of California.(nb)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER: For the reasons discussed above, the Court finds that Judge Netburn's April 29, 2021 Order transferring this case to the Northern District of California was well-reasoned, thoroughly supported by the record, and not contrary to the law. Accordingly, Kaufman's objections are overruled, and the April 29, 2021 Order is affirmed in its entirety. The Clerk of Court therefore is respectfully directed to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 6/3/2021) (nb) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing.
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting #85 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The parties' request for an extension is GRANTED. Fact discovery shall close on July 19, 2021. All other deadlines outlined in this Court's March 22, 2021 Order remain the same. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
May 19, 2021 Filing 86 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #84 Objection (non-motion) to Ruling of Magistrate Judge Under Rule 72(a). Document filed by Salesforce.com, Inc...(Johnson, Kevin)
May 18, 2021 Filing 85 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Ronald Abramson and Ray R. Zado dated May 18, 2021. Document filed by Salesforce.com, Inc...(Johnson, Kevin)
May 10, 2021 Filing 84 Objection re: #81 Memorandum & Opinion,,, . Document filed by Michael Philip Kaufman. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Objection to Ruling of Magistrate Judge Under Rule 72(A)).(Abramson, Ronald)
May 8, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Ronald Abramson to RE-FILE Document #82 MOTION to Set Aside #81 Memorandum & Opinion, Objections to Rulings of Magistrate Judge Under Rule 72(A). Use the event type Objection (non-motion) found under the event list Other Answers. (ldi)
May 5, 2021 Filing 83 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #82 MOTION to Set Aside #81 Memorandum & Opinion,,, Objections to Rulings of Magistrate Judge Under Rule 72(A). . Document filed by Michael Philip Kaufman..(Abramson, Ronald)
May 5, 2021 Filing 82 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION to Set Aside #81 Memorandum & Opinion,,, Objections to Rulings of Magistrate Judge Under Rule 72(A). Document filed by Michael Philip Kaufman..(Abramson, Ronald) Modified on 5/8/2021 (ldi).
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 81 OPINION AND ORDER: re: #70 LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Kevin P.B. Johnson dated March 5, 2021. filed by Salesforce.com, Inc., #27 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of California. filed by Salesforce.com, Inc. Having evaluated all the factors, and in consideration of the interests of justice, the Court concludes that transfer of this action to the Northern District of California is appropriate. The Clerk of Court shall transfer this case to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California. The Clerk of Court is further respectfully directed to GRANT the motion at ECF No. 27 and DENY as moot the motion at ECF No. 70. So Ordered (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 4/29/2021) (js) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing.
April 27, 2021 Filing 80 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 4/5/21 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly)
April 27, 2021 Filing 79 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 4/5/2021 before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kristen Carannante, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/18/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/28/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/26/2021..(McGuirk, Kelly)
April 19, 2021 Filing 78 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 4/5/21 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly)
April 19, 2021 Filing 77 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 4/5/2021 before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kristen Carannante, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/10/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/20/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/19/2021..(McGuirk, Kelly)
April 5, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn: Telephonic Discovery Conference held on 4/5/2021. (ras)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER deferring ruling on #73 Letter Motion. The parties are ordered to meet and confer following the depositions of Kaufman and Silverman to discuss whether agreement can be reached as to the deposition of Abramson. Within one week of the conclusion of the latter of the Kaufman and Silverman depositions, the parties shall file a letter(s) with the Court stating their respective positions on the Abramson deposition. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER: The Court has received Plaintiff's letter motion seeking a conference on the motion to quash the subpoena of Plaintiff's counsel, Mr. Ronald Abramson, ECF No. 73, and Defendant's opposition, ECF No. 74. The Court will hold a telephone conference to discuss the motion on April 5, 2021, at 2:00 p.m. At that time the parties should dial into the Court's dedicated teleconferencing line at (877) 402-9757 and enter Access Code 7938632, followed by the pound (#) key. (Telephone Conference set for 4/5/2021 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 3/26/2021) (ras)
March 25, 2021 Filing 74 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Ray R. Zado dated 3/25/2021 re: #73 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference Regarding Motion to Quash Subpoena of Ronald Abramson addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Ari J. Jaffess dated March 22, 2021. . Document filed by Salesforce.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6).(Johnson, Kevin)
March 22, 2021 Filing 73 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference Regarding Motion to Quash Subpoena of Ronald Abramson addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Ari J. Jaffess dated March 22, 2021. Document filed by Michael Philip Kaufman..(Jaffess, Ari)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting #71 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The parties' request for a modification of the case schedule is GRANTED. The Court adopts the schedule as laid out in the parties' letter motion. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to GRANT the motion at ECF No. 71. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 3/19/2021) (ras)
March 18, 2021 Filing 71 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Ronald Abramson and Ray R. Zado dated March 18, 2021. Document filed by Michael Philip Kaufman..(Abramson, Ronald)
March 5, 2021 Filing 70 LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Kevin P.B. Johnson dated March 5, 2021. Document filed by Salesforce.com, Inc...(Johnson, Kevin)
February 23, 2021 Filing 69 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #61 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review. . Document filed by Salesforce.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Sam S. Stake in Support of Reply, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5).(Johnson, Kevin)
February 16, 2021 Filing 68 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #61 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review. . Document filed by Michael Philip Kaufman..(Abramson, Ronald)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #66 Letter filed by Michael Philip Kaufman. ENDORSEMENT: The parties' briefing schedule on the motion to stay proceedings is adopted as proposed in the parties' joint letter. Plaintiff's opposition to Defendant's motion to stay proceedings shall be filed by February 16, 2021. Defendant's reply shall be filed by February 23, 2021. The Court STAYS all further proceedings as to claim construction until further order of the Court. (Responses due by 2/16/2021. Replies due by 2/23/2021.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 2/16/2021) (ras)
February 11, 2021 Filing 66 JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Ronald Abramson dated February 10, 2021 re: D.I. 64. Document filed by Michael Philip Kaufman..(Abramson, Ronald)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER: In light of Defendant's Motion to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review, the parties are ORDERED to meet and confer regarding a proposed schedule for the briefing of the motion to stay and whether the claim construction briefing should itself be stayed pending a decision on the motion to stay. The parties shall file a joint letter by February 10, 2021, which shall address the aforementioned issues. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 2/5/2021) (ras)
February 1, 2021 Filing 64 DECLARATION of Sam S. Stake in Support re: #61 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review.. Document filed by Salesforce.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4).(Johnson, Kevin)
February 1, 2021 Filing 63 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #61 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review. . Document filed by Salesforce.com, Inc...(Johnson, Kevin)
February 1, 2021 Filing 62 STATUS REPORT. Parties' Joint Request for Claim Construction Oral Argument and Technology Tutorial Document filed by Michael Philip Kaufman..(Abramson, Ronald)
February 1, 2021 Filing 61 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review. Document filed by Salesforce.com, Inc...(Johnson, Kevin)
January 29, 2021 Filing 60 BRIEF re: #48 Brief, #50 Brief,,,,,, #49 Brief Salesforce's Responsive Claim Construction Brief. Document filed by Salesforce.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 28 - 801 Patent History - 11-25-17 Remarks, #2 Exhibit Ex. 29 - US7,318,066 File History, #3 Affidavit Attorney Declaration ISO Salesforce's Responsive Claim Construction Brief, #4 Affidavit Supp. Schmidt Decl ISO Salesforce's Responsive Claim Construction Brief).(Johnson, Kevin)
January 29, 2021 Filing 59 BRIEF Plaintiff's Responsive Claim Construction Brief. Document filed by Michael Philip Kaufman. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ronald Abramson, #2 Exhibit 3 to Abramson Decl., #3 Exhibit 4 to Abramson Decl.).(Abramson, Ronald)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material...Nothing in this Order shall be construed as authorizing a party to file Confidential Materials under seal without prior Court approval following a motion for leave to file under seal. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 1/22/2021) (ras)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting #54 Motion for Sam S. Stake to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #53 Motion for Ray R. Zado to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
January 21, 2021 Filing 55 PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Document filed by Salesforce.com, Inc...(Johnson, Kevin)
January 19, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #54 MOTION for Sam S. Stake to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Corrected). Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ad)
January 19, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #53 MOTION for Ray R. Zado to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Corrected). Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ad)
January 19, 2021 Filing 54 MOTION for Sam S. Stake to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Corrected). Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Salesforce.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit Affidavit).(Stake, Sam)
January 19, 2021 Filing 53 MOTION for Ray R. Zado to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Corrected). Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Salesforce.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit Affidavit).(Zado, Ray)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER: On January 12, 2021, the Honorable John P. Cronan referred this case to my docket for general pretrial supervision. In light of the discovery dispute raised in Plaintiff's December 29, 2020 letter, the Court will hold a telephonic conference on January 20, 2021, at 3:00 p.m. At that time the parties should dial into the Court's dedicated teleconferencing line at (877) 402-9757 and enter Access Code 7938632, followed by the pound (#) key. SO ORDERED. (Telephone Conference set for 1/20/2021 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 1/12/2021) (jca)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. SO ORDERED. Motions referred to Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 1/12/2021) (jca)
January 8, 2021 Filing 50 BRIEF re: #48 Brief Attorney Declaration ISO Salesforce's Opening Claim Construction Brief. Document filed by Salesforce.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - 2018-04-11 dkt 69 Claim Construction And Scheduling Order, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - US7885981, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 - US10025801, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4 - 2016-11-08 dkt 39 Kaufman's Opening Claim Construction Brief, #5 Exhibit Ex. 5 - 2016-10-18 dkt 36-1 Joint Claim Terms Chart, #6 Exhibit Ex. 6 - 2016-12-20 dkt 41 Kaufman's Reply Claim Construction Brief, #7 Exhibit Ex. 7 - 2020.01.16 16-cv-2880-AKH Pretrial Conference Transcript (Exceprt), #8 Exhibit Ex. 8 - Encarta World English Dictionary, #9 Exhibit Ex. 9 - American Heritage College Dictionary, #10 Exhibit Ex. 10 - Access Database With Visual Basic (Tutorial), #11 Exhibit Ex. 11 - Water Quality Database - Database Design and Data Dictionary, #12 Exhibit Ex. 12 - US7062502, #13 Exhibit Ex. 13 - US5950190, #14 Exhibit Ex. 14 - US5778375, #15 Exhibit Ex. 15 - Microsoft Computer Dictionary (4th ed.), #16 Exhibit Ex. 16 - IBM Dictionary of Computing, #17 Exhibit Ex. 17 - US5873093, #18 Exhibit Ex. 18 - US5802514, #19 Exhibit Ex. 19 - US5553218, #20 Exhibit Ex. 20 - 2020-10-23 021-000 Kaufman Opp to Salesforce Motion to Strike (D.I. 19), #21 Exhibit Ex. 21 - E. F. Codd - A Relational Model of Data for Large Shared Data Banks, #22 Exhibit Ex. 22 - JAM 7 Database Guide, #23 Exhibit Ex. 23 - US5787416, #24 Exhibit Ex. 24 - US6058391, #25 Exhibit Ex. 25 - Douglas Schmidt CV, #26 Exhibit Ex. 26 - Collins Dictionary, #27 Exhibit Ex. 27 - Concise Oxford Dictionary).(Johnson, Kevin)
January 8, 2021 Filing 49 BRIEF re: #48 Brief Declaration of Douglas Schmidt ISO Salesforce's Opening Claim Construction Brief. Document filed by Salesforce.com, Inc...(Johnson, Kevin)
January 8, 2021 Filing 48 BRIEF Salesforce's Opening Claim Construction Brief. Document filed by Salesforce.com, Inc...(Johnson, Kevin)
January 7, 2021 Filing 47 BRIEF Plaintiff's Opening Claim Construction Brief. Document filed by Michael Philip Kaufman. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ronald Abramson, #2 Exhibit 1 to Abramson Decl., #3 Exhibit 2 to Abramson Decl.).(Abramson, Ronald)
January 4, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #46 MOTION for Ray R. Zado to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23345119. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #45 MOTION for Sam S. Stake to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23345022. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): expired Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu)
January 4, 2021 Filing 46 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Ray R. Zado to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23345119. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Salesforce.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(Zado, Ray) Modified on 1/4/2021 (bcu).
January 4, 2021 Filing 45 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Sam S. Stake to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23345022. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Salesforce.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(Stake, Sam) Modified on 1/4/2021 (bcu).
January 4, 2021 Filing 44 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Brian P. Biddinger dated January 4, 2021 re: #43 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Alex G. Patchen dated December 29, 2020. . Document filed by Salesforce.com, Inc...(Biddinger, Brian)
December 29, 2020 Filing 43 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Alex G. Patchen dated December 29, 2020. Document filed by Michael Philip Kaufman..(Patchen, Alex)
December 9, 2020 Filing 42 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #31 MOTION to Dismiss and to Strike. . Document filed by Salesforce.com, Inc...(Johnson, Kevin)
December 9, 2020 Filing 41 DECLARATION of Brian P. Biddinger in Support re: #27 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of California.. Document filed by Salesforce.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5).(Johnson, Kevin)
December 9, 2020 Filing 40 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #27 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of California. . Document filed by Salesforce.com, Inc...(Johnson, Kevin)
December 9, 2020 Filing 39 JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT. Document filed by Michael Philip Kaufman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Cross-References to Infringement Contentions, #2 Exhibit Defendant's Cross-References to Invalidity Contentions).(Abramson, Ronald)
November 25, 2020 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #31 MOTION to Dismiss and to Strike. . Document filed by Michael Philip Kaufman..(Abramson, Ronald)
November 25, 2020 Filing 37 DECLARATION of Michael Philip Kaufman in Opposition re: #27 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of California.. Document filed by Michael Philip Kaufman..(Abramson, Ronald)
November 25, 2020 Filing 36 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #27 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of California. . Document filed by Michael Philip Kaufman..(Abramson, Ronald)
November 5, 2020 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #31 MOTION to Dismiss and to Strike. (Corrected Version of Dkt. 32). Document filed by Salesforce.com, Inc...(Johnson, Kevin)
November 4, 2020 Filing 34 DECLARATION of Kevin Johnson in Support re: #31 MOTION to Dismiss and to Strike.. Document filed by Salesforce.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4).(Johnson, Kevin)
November 4, 2020 Filing 33 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILER ERROR (SEE #34) DECLARATION of Kevin Johnson in Support re: #31 MOTION to Dismiss and to Strike.. Document filed by Salesforce.com, Inc...(Johnson, Kevin) Modified on 11/5/2020 (kj).
November 4, 2020 Filing 32 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILER ERROR (SEE #35) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #31 MOTION to Dismiss and to Strike. . Document filed by Salesforce.com, Inc...(Johnson, Kevin) Modified on 11/5/2020 (kj).
November 4, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss and to Strike. Document filed by Salesforce.com, Inc.. Responses due by 11/4/2020.(Johnson, Kevin)
November 4, 2020 Filing 30 DECLARATION of Brian P. Biddinger in Support re: #27 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of California.. Document filed by Salesforce.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31).(Johnson, Kevin)
November 4, 2020 Filing 29 DECLARATION of Guy Jenkins in Support re: #27 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of California.. Document filed by Salesforce.com, Inc...(Johnson, Kevin)
November 4, 2020 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #27 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of California. . Document filed by Salesforce.com, Inc...(Johnson, Kevin)
November 4, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of California. Document filed by Salesforce.com, Inc...(Johnson, Kevin)
October 29, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John P. Cronan: Telephone Conference held on October 29, 2020. Defendants motion to dismiss and motion to transfer due by November 4, 2020. Plaintiffs oppositions due November 25, 2020. Defendants replies, if any, due on December 9, 2020. (No Court Reporter Present) (mhe)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. Amended Pleadings may not be filed and additional parties may not be joined except with leave of the Court. Fact Discovery due by 3/23/2021. Fact depositions shall be completed by March 23, 2021. Expert Discovery due by 5/14/2021. Deposition due by 5/14/2021. Discovery due by 5/21/2021. Motions due by 5/25/2021. Responses due by 6/10/2021 Replies due by 6/22/2021. Pretrial Order due by 7/9/2021. Ready for Trial by 7/23/2021. The next Case Management Conference will be scheduled at a later date. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 10/29/2020) (jwh)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER. The Court has reviewed the Defendant's letters in advance of their anticipated motions, dated October 20, 2020 (Dkts. 16, 17) and the Plaintiff's letters in response, dated October 23, 2020 (Dkts. 21, 22). The Court will discuss the issues raised in these letters and any briefing schedule at the Initial Pretrial Conference scheduled for October 29, 2020, at 10 a.m. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motions pending on Dkt. 19 and Dkt. 20. SO ORDERED. Terminating #19 LETTER MOTION for Conference RE: Leave to File for Motion to Dismiss and Strike addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Kevin Johnson dated 10/20/2020. Document filed by Salesforce.com, Inc.; Terminating #20 LETTER MOTION for Conference RE: Leave to File Motion to Transfer addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Kevin P.B. Johnson dated 10/20/2020. Document filed by Salesforce.com, Inc. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 10/27/2020) (rjm)
October 26, 2020 Filing 24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Michael Philip Kaufman..(Abramson, Ronald)
October 26, 2020 Filing 23 INITIAL REPORT OF PARTIES BEFORE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Document filed by Michael Philip Kaufman..(Abramson, Ronald)
October 23, 2020 Filing 22 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Ronald Abramson dated October 23, 2020 re: #20 LETTER MOTION for Conference RE: Leave to File Motion to Transfer addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Kevin P.B. Johnson dated 10/20/2020. . Document filed by Michael Philip Kaufman..(Abramson, Ronald)
October 23, 2020 Filing 21 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Ronald Abramson dated October 23, 2020 re: #19 LETTER MOTION for Conference RE: Leave to File for Motion to Dismiss and Strike addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Kevin Johnson dated 10/20/2020. . Document filed by Michael Philip Kaufman..(Abramson, Ronald)
October 20, 2020 Filing 20 LETTER MOTION for Conference RE: Leave to File Motion to Transfer addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Kevin P.B. Johnson dated 10/20/2020. Document filed by Salesforce.com, Inc...(Johnson, Kevin)
October 20, 2020 Filing 19 LETTER MOTION for Conference RE: Leave to File for Motion to Dismiss and Strike addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Kevin Johnson dated 10/20/2020. Document filed by Salesforce.com, Inc...(Johnson, Kevin)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: This case has been reassigned to the undersigned. All counsel must familiarize themselves with the Court's Individual Rules, which are available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-john-p-cronan. Unless and until the Court orders otherwise, all prior orders, dates, and deadlines shall remain in effect notwithstanding the case's reassignment. Any currently scheduled conference or oral argument before the Court is adjourned. Counsel for all parties are hereby directed to appear before the undersigned for an Initial Pretrial Conference ("IPTC") in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on October 29, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. In light of the ongoing COVID-19 pandemic, the Court will conduct the IPTC by teleconference. At the scheduled time, counsel for all parties should call (866) 434-5269, access code 9176261. Absent leave of Court obtained by letter-motion filed before the conference, all pretrial conferences must be attended by the attorney who will serve as principal trial counsel. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall submit a joint letter of no more than five pages by October 26, 2020, addressing the following in separate paragraphs: as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 10/29/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge John P. Cronan. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 10/15/2020) (ama)
September 29, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge John Peter Cronan. Judge Jed S. Rakoff is no longer assigned to the case. (laq)
September 24, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Initial Pretrial Conference held on 9/24/2020, ( Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/2/2021 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff.). (Kotowski, Linda)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION: NOW THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by the undersigned counsel for the parties, and subject to the approval and order of the Court, that: 1. Defendant, Salesforce hereby waives the defenses of insufficient process and insufficient service of process, but expressly reserves, and fully retains the right to assert, all other defenses without limitation. 2. Salesforce's time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is hereby extended up to and including October 20, 2020. (Salesforce.com, Inc. answer due 10/20/2020.) (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 9/18/2020) (jwh)
September 17, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Edward John DeFranco on behalf of Salesforce.com, Inc...(DeFranco, Edward)
September 17, 2020 Filing 15 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Salesforce.com, Inc...(Biddinger, Brian)
September 17, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kevin P.B. Johnson on behalf of Salesforce.com, Inc...(Johnson, Kevin)
September 17, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian Paul Biddinger on behalf of Salesforce.com, Inc...(Biddinger, Brian)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 9/24/2020 ON A TELECONFERENCE LINE at 11:15 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. The dial-in information for the call will be as follows: USA Toll-Free (888) 363-4735; USA Caller Paid/International Toll: (215) 446-3657; Access Code: 1086415, and as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 9/11/2020) (jwh) Modified on 9/15/2020 (jwh).
September 11, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Jed S. Rakoff, Patent Judge. Judge Analisa Torres is no longer assigned to the case. (ad)
August 31, 2020 CASE DECLINED AS NOT RELATED. Case referred as related to 16cv2880 and declined by Judge Alvin K Hellerstein and returned to wheel for assignment. (wb)
August 26, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ari Jason Jaffess on behalf of Michael Philip Kaufman..(Jaffess, Ari)
August 26, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mord Michael Lewis on behalf of Michael Philip Kaufman..(Lewis, Mord)
August 26, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Guerrero Liston on behalf of Michael Philip Kaufman..(Liston, David)
August 26, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alex Gregg Patchen on behalf of Michael Philip Kaufman..(Patchen, Alex)
August 26, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Salesforce.com, Inc...(dnh)
August 26, 2020 Filing 6 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(dnh)
August 26, 2020 Case Eligible for Patent Pilot Program. (dnh)
August 26, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
August 26, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
August 26, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh)
August 26, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Ronald Abramson. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Salesforce.com, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly. (dnh)
August 25, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to salesforce.com, inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Michael Philip Kaufman..(Abramson, Ronald)
August 25, 2020 Filing 4 RELATED CASE AFFIRMATION of Ronald Abramson re: that this action be filed as related to 16-cv-2880 (AKH). Document filed by Michael Philip Kaufman..(Abramson, Ronald)
August 25, 2020 Filing 3 AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Abramson, Ronald)
August 25, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Abramson, Ronald)
August 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Salesforce.com, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21326235)Document filed by Michael Philip Kaufman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX-A US Pat No 7885981, #2 Exhibit EX-B US Pat No 10025801, #3 Exhibit EX-C US Pat Pub 2019/00951173A1, #4 Exhibit EX-D Notice Letters).(Abramson, Ronald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kaufman v. Salesforce.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salesforce.com Inc
Represented By: Ray Robert Zado
Represented By: Kevin P.B. Johnson
Represented By: Brian Paul Biddinger
Represented By: Sam Stephen Stake
Represented By: Edward John DeFranco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Philip Kaufman
Represented By: Alex Gregg Patchen
Represented By: David Guerrero Liston
Represented By: Ronald Abramson
Represented By: Mord Michael Lewis
Represented By: Ari Jason Jaffess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?