Humes v. Cali Hiway Patrol et al
Plaintiff: Francis Anthony Humes
Defendant: Cali Hiway Patrol and Monterey County Sheriffs
Case Number: 5:2021cv04494
Filed: June 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Edward J Davila
2 Judge: PSLC HHL
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO REASSIGN CASE TO DISTRICT JUDGE. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 7/30/2021. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
June 23, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Francis Anthony Humes, CDCR #2101668.The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is directed to submit within 72 hours and in PDF form a certified Prison Trust Account statement for the plaintiff, reflecting the last six months activity, to cdcrfilings@cand.uscourts.gov. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2021)
June 23, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Not Complete filed by Francis Anthony Humes. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2021) Modified on 8/3/2021 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 23, 2021 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Francis Anthony Humes. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2021)
June 10, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail on 6/10/2021 to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Modified on 6/10/2021 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
June 10, 2021 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 7/19/2021. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail on 6/10/2021 to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Modified on 6/10/2021 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
June 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cali Hiway Patrol, Monterey County Sheriffs. Filed byFrancis Anthony Humes. Consent/Declination due by 7/12/2021. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Humes v. Cali Hiway Patrol et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cali Hiway Patrol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monterey County Sheriffs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis Anthony Humes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?