Engelbretson v. Bagelcode USA Inc et al
Plaintiff: Clint Engelbretson
Defendant: Google Payment Corp., Bagelcode USA Inc and Google LLC
Case Number: 5:2021cv04807
Filed: June 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward J Davila
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2021 Filing 38 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice by Clint Engelbretson (Peluso, Patrick) (Filed on 6/23/2021)
June 23, 2021 Filing 37 Case transferred in from District of Washington Western; Case Number 2:21-cv-00296. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 14, 2021 Filing 36 MDL 3001 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1); In re Google Play Store Simulated Casino-Style Game Litigation; Northern District of California, San Jose Division; assigned to Judge Davila. (PM)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO STAY PROCEEDINGS re Parties' #34 Stipulated Motion. The proceedings of the present case are stayed, pending the issuance of a decision by the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation in the case styled In Re Google Play Store Simulated Casino-Style Games Litigation, MDL Case No. 3001. The Parties will promptly notify this Court of the JPML decision regarding the Transfer Motion. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SR)
May 18, 2021 Filing 34 Stipulated MOTION and Proposed Order to Stay Proceedings, filed by Defendants Google LLC, Google Payment Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) Noting Date 5/18/2021, (Ewart, Michael)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION AND ORDER striking Pretrial Deadlines. The Court hereby strikes all deadlines contained in Docket Nos. #30 - #31 , and will reset those deadlines after the Court has ruled on all motions filed by Defendants on or before May 24, 2021 in response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge James L. Robart.(SR)
April 16, 2021 Filing 32 Stipulated MOTION and Proposed Order to Strike or Extend Pretrial Deadlines, filed by Defendants Google LLC, Google Payment Corp. Noting Date 4/16/2021, (Ewart, Michael)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 SCHEDULING ORDER REGARDING CLASS CERTIFICATION MOTION by Judge James L. Robart. Deadline to complete discovery on class certification: 8/2/2021; Deadline for Plaintiffs to file motion for class certification: 9/1/2021. (AD)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge James L. Robart. Joint Status Report due by 5/10/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 4/19/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 5/3/2021. (AD)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER re #25 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Behnam Dayanim for Defendant Bagelcode USA Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER re #3 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Steven L. Woodrow for plaintiff Clint Engelbretson, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER re #26 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Sean David Unger for Defendant Bagelcode USA Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
March 31, 2021 Filing 26 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Sean Unger FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Bagelcode USA Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7022004 (Powell, Emily)
March 31, 2021 Filing 25 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Behnam Dayanim FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Bagelcode USA Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7021902 (Powell, Emily)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE authorized by Judge David W. Christel. Case reassigned to Judge James L. Robart for all further proceedings. Judge David W. Christel no longer assigned to case. (GMR)
March 30, 2021 Filing 23 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Google LLC, Corporate Parent XXVI Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Alphabet Inc for Google Payment Corp. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Google Payment Corp (Ewart, Michael)
March 30, 2021 Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent XXVI Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Alphabet Inc for Google LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Google LLC (Ewart, Michael)
March 30, 2021 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Bagelcode USA Inc (Powell, Emily)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER re #13 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Teresa H Michaud for Defendants Google LLC, and Google Payment Corp, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re #15 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Alexander Guy Davis for Defendants Google LLC, and Google Payment Corp, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re #14 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Bradford K Newman for Defedants Google LLC and Google Payment Corp, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND THE GOOGLE DEFENDANTS' TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT signed by Judge David W. Christel, re #16 Stipulated Motion. Defendants' time to file a responsive pleading to the Complaint is extended from 3/31/21 to and including 5/24/21. (DK)
March 30, 2021 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Bagelcode USA Inc, Google LLC, and Google Payment Corp must each file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 4/6/2021. (AMD)
March 29, 2021 Attorney Eric David Lansverk, Alexander M. Wu for Google LLC; Eric David Lansverk, Alexander M. Wu for Google Payment Corp added; per #12 Notice of Appearance. (AMD)
March 29, 2021 Filing 16 Stipulated MOTION and Proposed Order to Extend the Google Defendants' Time to Answer Complaint, filed by Defendants Google LLC, Google Payment Corp. Noting Date 3/29/2021, (Ewart, Michael)
March 29, 2021 Filing 15 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Alexander G. Davis FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Google LLC, Google Payment Corp (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7018684 (Ewart, Michael)
March 29, 2021 Filing 14 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Bradford K. Newman FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Google LLC, Google Payment Corp (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7018673 (Ewart, Michael)
March 29, 2021 Filing 13 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Teresa H. Michaud FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Google LLC, Google Payment Corp (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7018645 (Ewart, Michael)
March 29, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michael J Ewart on behalf of Defendants Google LLC, Google Payment Corp. (Ewart, Michael)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND ORDER signed by Judge David W. Christel, re #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Bagelcode USA Inc answer due 5/24/2021. (DK)
March 26, 2021 Attorney Mark Andrew LeGolvan added for Bagelcode USA Inc, per #9 Notice of Appearance. (KMC)
March 25, 2021 Filing 10 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , filed by Defendant Bagelcode USA Inc. Noting Date 3/25/2021, (Powell, Emily)
March 25, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Emily Dodds Powell on behalf of Defendant Bagelcode USA Inc. (Powell, Emily)
March 16, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Google Payment Corp. on 3/10/2021, filed by Plaintiff Clint Engelbretson. (Draluck, Eric)
March 16, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Google LLC on 3/10/2021, filed by Plaintiff Clint Engelbretson. (Draluck, Eric)
March 16, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Bagelcode USA on 3/12/2021, filed by Plaintiff Clint Engelbretson. (Draluck, Eric)
March 9, 2021 Filing 5 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Bagelcode USA Inc, Google LLC, Google Payment Corp. (Attachments: #1 Summons-Google LLC, #2 Summons-Google Payment Corp)(RE)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #2 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Patrick Peluso for Plaintiff Clint Engelbretson, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
March 9, 2021 Judge David W. Christel added. (RE)
March 8, 2021 Filing 3 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Steven L. Woodrow FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Clint Engelbretson (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6990945 (Draluck, Eric)
March 8, 2021 Filing 2 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Patrick H. Peluso FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Clint Engelbretson (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6990944 (Draluck, Eric)
March 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6988846) Attorney Eric R Draluck added to party Clint Engelbretson(pty:pla), filed by Clint Engelbretson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Bagelcode USA, Inc., #3 Summons Google LLC, #4 Summons Google Payment Corp.)(Draluck, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Engelbretson v. Bagelcode USA Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Payment Corp.
Represented By: Bradford K Newman
Represented By: Eric David Lansverk
Represented By: Alexander Guy Davis
Represented By: Michael Jacob Ewart
Represented By: Teresa H Michaud
Represented By: Alexander M. Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bagelcode USA Inc
Represented By: Emily Dodds Powell
Represented By: Sean David Unger
Represented By: Andrew Mark LeGolvan
Represented By: Behnam Dayanim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google LLC
Represented By: Bradford K Newman
Represented By: Eric David Lansverk
Represented By: Alexander Guy Davis
Represented By: Michael Jacob Ewart
Represented By: Teresa H Michaud
Represented By: Alexander M. Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clint Engelbretson
Represented By: Steven L. Woodrow
Represented By: Patrick Peluso
Represented By: Patrick Harry Peluso
Represented By: Eric R Draluck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?