Dominguez-Lopez v. Mayorkas et al
Plaintiff: Jose Aparicio Dominguez-Lopez
Defendant: Secretary Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Acting Director Tracy L. Renaud, Susan Dibbins and Chief Susan Dibbins
Case Number: 5:2021cv05252
Filed: July 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2021 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jose Aparicio Dominguez-Lopez re #4 Proposed Summons for USA (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Rosamond, Tania) (Filed on 9/1/2021)
September 1, 2021 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Please re-file in its entirety as Summons Returned Executed as to USA. Re: #14 Certificate of Service filed by Jo se Aparicio Dominguez-Lopez, #15 Certificate of Service filed by Jose Aparicio Dominguez-Lopez, #13 Certificate of Service filed by Jose Aparicio Dominguez-Lopez, #12 Certificate of Service filed by Jose Aparicio Dominguez-Lopez (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2021)
August 31, 2021 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jose Aparicio Dominguez-Lopez re #4 Proposed Summons U.S. Attorney's Office (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Rosamond, Tania) (Filed on 8/31/2021)
August 31, 2021 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jose Aparicio Dominguez-Lopez re #4 Proposed Summons Renaud (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Rosamond, Tania) (Filed on 8/31/2021)
August 31, 2021 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jose Aparicio Dominguez-Lopez re #4 Proposed Summons Dibbins (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Rosamond, Tania) (Filed on 8/31/2021)
August 31, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jose Aparicio Dominguez-Lopez re #4 Proposed Summons Mayorkas (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Rosamond, Tania) (Filed on 8/31/2021)
July 28, 2021 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jose Aparicio Dominguez-Lopez.. (Rosamond, Tania) (Filed on 7/28/2021)
July 15, 2021 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE RE: Consent or Declination. All parties are requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 7/29/2021. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2021)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #5 Application for Admission of Attorney Tania K. Rosamond Pro Hac Vice representing Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2021)
July 8, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Susan Dibbins, Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Tracy L. Renaud, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2021)
July 8, 2021 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/29/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/6/2021 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2021)
July 8, 2021 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/22/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2021)
July 7, 2021 Filing 5 First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for attorney Tania K. Rosamond ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16154162.) filed by Jose Aparicio Dominguez-Lopez. (Schoenberg, Lori) (Filed on 7/7/2021)
July 7, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Schoenberg, Lori) (Filed on 7/7/2021)
July 7, 2021 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet by Jose Aparicio Dominguez-Lopez for attorney Tania K. Rosamond. (Schoenberg, Lori) (Filed on 7/7/2021)
July 7, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Jose Aparicio Dominguez-Lopez for attorney Lori B. Schoenberg. (Schoenberg, Lori) (Filed on 7/7/2021)
July 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-16154134.). Filed byJose Aparicio Dominguez-Lopez. (Schoenberg, Lori) (Filed on 7/7/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dominguez-Lopez v. Mayorkas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Aparicio Dominguez-Lopez
Represented By: Lori Beth Schoenberg
Represented By: Tania Karina Rosamond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary Alejandro N. Mayorkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director Tracy L. Renaud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Dibbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Susan Dibbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?