Kabede v. California Governors Parole Board Hearing Dept.
Petitioner: Wondiyrad Kabede
Respondent: California Governors Parole Board Hearing Dep't
Case Number: 5:2021cv05366
Filed: July 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward J Davila
Referring Judge: PSLC HHL
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to File Additional Document of the Parole Board Transcript filed by Wondiyrad Kabede. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2021)
August 23, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Wondiyrad Kabede. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2021)
August 16, 2021 Filing 9 Prisoner Statement of Account. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2021)
August 11, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE to bring awareness of new points not mentioned in the petition by Wondiyrad Kabede (Attachments: #1 note, #2 Envelope)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2021)
August 4, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Wondiyrad Kabede, CDCR # E-25873.The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is directed to submit within 72 hours and in PDF form a certified Prison Trust Account statement for the plaintiff, reflecting the last six months activity, to cdcrfilings@cand.uscourts.gov. (cvS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2021)
August 4, 2021 Filing 6 *** POSTED IN ERROR *** please see #7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Wondiyrad Kabede. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2021) Modified on 8/6/2021 (cvS, COURT STAFF).
July 14, 2021 Filing 5 Letter dated 6/27/2021 from Wondiyrad Kabede. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2021) Modified on 7/30/2021 (ljf, COURT STAFF).
July 14, 2021 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Leave to File Second or Successive Petition (Form 12) filed by Wondiyrad Kabede. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2021) Modified TEXT on 8/6/2021 (cvS, COURT STAFF).
July 14, 2021 Filing 3 Letter dated 7/4/2021 from Wondiyrad Kabede. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2021) Modified on 7/30/2021 (ljf, COURT STAFF).
July 14, 2021 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 8/23/2021. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 14, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Filed byWondiyrad Kabede. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2021)
July 14, 2021 Remark - clerk mailed docket #2 to petitioner. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2021)
July 14, 2021 Updated post office box (from 32200 to 213040) per letter #3 from petitioner. Remailed Clerk's Notice #2 and blank IFP form to petitioner at CHCF. (ljf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2021).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kabede v. California Governors Parole Board Hearing Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Wondiyrad Kabede
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: California Governors Parole Board Hearing Dep't
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?