Stevens v. Aaren et al
Plaintiff: Dean Michael Stevens
Defendant: Jeffry Aaren, Mary LeClarr, City of Mendocino, C. David Eyster and Gavin Newsome
Case Number: 5:2021cv05531
Filed: July 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward J Davila
Referring Judge: PSLC HHL
2 Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time filed by Dean Michael Stevens. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2021)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 8/30/21. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(asS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 30, 2021 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Copy placed in O:Drive on 8/30/2021.
August 11, 2021 Filing 10 Letter from Dean Michael Stevens. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2021)
August 2, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by Dean Michael Stevens. Responses due by 8/30/2021. Replies due by 9/13/2021. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2021)
August 2, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File filed by Dean Michael Stevens. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2021)
August 2, 2021 Filing 7 Letter from Dean Michael Stevens. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2021)
July 20, 2021 Filing 6 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 20, 2021 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 8/27/2021. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 20, 2021 Mailed copy of #5 and #6 to plaintiff. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2021)
July 19, 2021 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT in Support filed byDean Michael Stevens. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2021)
July 19, 2021 Filing 3 Declaration of Dean Michael Stevens filed byDean Michael Stevens. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2021)
July 19, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Motion to be placed in the Victim Witness Protection Program filed by Dean Michael Stevens. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2021)
July 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jeffry Aaren, City of Mendocino, C. David Eyster, Mary LeClarr, Gavin Newsome. (IFPP) No Process. Filed byDean Michael Stevens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stevens v. Aaren et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean Michael Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffry Aaren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary LeClarr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Mendocino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. David Eyster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gavin Newsome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?