Bynum v. Sweet et al
Plaintiff: Jim Carter Bynum
Defendant: Mary Sweet and Martin Laufik
Case Number: 5:2021cv05833
Filed: July 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Referring Judge: PSLC HHL
2 Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen no longer assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 8/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 19, 2021 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 16, 2021 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jim Carter Bynum.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2021)
July 30, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 30, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jim Carter Bynum. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2021)
July 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Martin Laufik, Mary Sweet. Filed byJim Carter Bynum. Consent/Declination due by 8/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bynum v. Sweet et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim Carter Bynum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Sweet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Laufik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?