Bradford v. Contra Costa County Detention Facilities
Plaintiff: Donald Bradford
Defendant: Contra Costa County Detention Facilities
Case Number: 5:2021cv06433
Filed: August 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Referring Judge: PSLC HHL
2 Judge: Robert M Illman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Donald Bradford. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2021)
September 28, 2021 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Donald Bradford. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2021)
September 28, 2021 Filing 8 COMPLAINT against Contra Costa County Detention Facilities. Filed by Donald Bradford. Consent/Declination due by 10/28/2021. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2021) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/30/2021: #1 Page 2 of3 of Complaint) (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 09/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 27, 2021 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (glmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 15, 2021 Filing 5 Letter from Donald Bradford re Board Action on Application to Present Late Claim. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2021)
August 25, 2021 mailed copy of re #2 clerk's notice, re #3 clerk's notice re ifp and re #4 notice of assignment to plaintiff. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2021)
August 19, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to a United States Magistrate Judge. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 19, 2021 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 9/27/2021. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 19, 2021 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE for filing of civil rights complaint on form due by 9/27/2021. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 19, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Civil Suit filed by Donald Bradford. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bradford v. Contra Costa County Detention Facilities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contra Costa County Detention Facilities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?