Greenfield Prop Owner II, LLC v. Bouldin & Lawson, LLC And Bouldin Corporation
Plaintiff: Greenfield Prop Owner II, LLC
Defendant: Bouldin & Lawson, LLC And Bouldin Corporation
Case Number: 5:2021cv07161
Filed: September 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Referring Judge: Lucy H Koh
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2021 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE FOLLOWING CASE REASSIGNMENT TO THE HONORABLE LUCY H. KOH. Following the case reassignment to the Honorable Lucy H. Koh, an Initial Case Management Conference is set for December 22, 2021 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th floor, in San Jose, California. The Joint Case Management Statement is due seven days prior to the Initial Case Management Conference. See Civil L.R. 16-9 and Civil L.R. 16-10(a). The parties shall familiarize themselves with the Scheduling Notes and Standing Orders for the Hon. Lucy H. Koh: http://cand.uscourts.gov/lhk. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2021)
October 12, 2021 #Electronic filing error. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Paolo A Braccini. The docket shows a different address from what is appearing on the document (dkt. #: 14 Notice of Appearance filed by Bouldin & Lawson, LLC And Bouldin Corporation). Please update your personal profile on ECF. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2021)
October 12, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Paolo A Braccini (Braccini, Paolo) (Filed on 10/12/2021)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 10/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2021)
October 12, 2021 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2021)
October 11, 2021 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bouldin & Lawson, LLC And Bouldin Corporation.. (Vucinich, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/11/2021)
October 7, 2021 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Greenfield Prop Owner II, LLC.. (Manning, William) (Filed on 10/7/2021)
October 7, 2021 Filing 9 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/14/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/21/2021 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2021)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting #6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Cavalier). (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2021)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting #5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (King). (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2021)
October 5, 2021 Filing 6 First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Robert M. Cavalier, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16464524.) filed by Greenfield Prop Owner II, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Cavalier, Robert) (Filed on 10/5/2021)
October 5, 2021 Filing 5 First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Virginia King, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16464340.) filed by Greenfield Prop Owner II, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(King, Virginia) (Filed on 10/5/2021)
September 29, 2021 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 10/13/2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2021)
September 16, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/30/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2021)
September 16, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Bouldin & Lawson, LLC And Bouldin Corporation AMENDED. (Vucinich, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/16/2021)
September 16, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from Monterey. Their case number is 21CV002233. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0971-16396618). Filed by Bouldin & Lawson, LLC And Bouldin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Demand for Jury Trial, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Vucinich, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/16/2021) Modified on 9/16/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
September 16, 2021 #Electronic filing error. Please correct the Venue on the civil cover sheet and refile an Amended Civil Cover sheet only. Re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Bouldin & Lawson, LLC And Bouldin Corporation (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greenfield Prop Owner II, LLC v. Bouldin & Lawson, LLC And Bouldin Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greenfield Prop Owner II, LLC
Represented By: John Frederick VandePoel
Represented By: William Eric Manning
Represented By: Robert M. Cavalier
Represented By: Virginia Marie King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bouldin & Lawson, LLC And Bouldin Corporation
Represented By: Daniel David Marcus
Represented By: Elizabeth D. Rhodes
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Vucinich
Represented By: Paolo A. Braccini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?