State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company v. United States of America
Plaintiff: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 5:2021cv08044
Filed: October 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Frederick Jeu (Jeu, Christopher) (Filed on 11/26/2021)
November 16, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Assistant U.S. Attorney (Mahfouz, Richard) (Filed on 11/16/2021)
November 16, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. U.S. Attorney (Mahfouz, Richard) (Filed on 11/16/2021)
November 16, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. United States of America served on 10/27/2021, answer due 12/27/2021. (Mahfouz, Richard) (Filed on 11/16/2021)
November 16, 2021 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.. (Mahfouz, Richard) (Filed on 11/16/2021)
November 8, 2021 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE RE: Consent or Declination. All parties are requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 11/22/2021. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2021)
October 14, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to United States of America. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2021)
October 14, 2021 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/5/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/12/2022 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2021)
October 14, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/28/2021. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2021)
October 14, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Mahfouz, Richard) (Filed on 10/14/2021)
October 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-16496713.). Filed byState Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet)(Mahfouz, Richard) (Filed on 10/14/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard Louis Mahfouz, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Christopher Frederick Jeu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?