Garcia v. Nguyen et al
Plaintiff: Orlando Garcia
Defendant: Jenny Ha Nguyen and Kenneth A. Flood
Case Number: 5:2021cv09185
Filed: November 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Nature of Suit: American with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for Entry of Default filed by Orlando Garcia. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Best, Zachary) (Filed on 1/27/2022)
January 27, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary Manning Best (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Best, Zachary) (Filed on 1/27/2022)
January 13, 2022 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Orlando Garcia. Jenny Ha Nguyen served on 1/13/2022, answer due 2/3/2022. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 1/13/2022)
January 10, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Orlando Garcia. Kenneth A. Flood served on 1/4/2022, answer due 1/25/2022. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 1/10/2022)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as referral judge ssigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 12/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2021)
December 1, 2021 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2021)
December 1, 2021 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Orlando Garcia.. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 12/1/2021)
December 1, 2021 Filing 7 ASSOCIATION of Counsel by Orlando Garcia. (Zimmermann, Josie) (Filed on 12/1/2021)
November 30, 2021 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2021)
November 30, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Kenneth A. Flood, Jenny Ha Nguyen. (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2021)
November 29, 2021 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/13/2021. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2021)
November 29, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 11/29/2021)
November 29, 2021 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Orlando Garcia re #1 Complaint (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 11/29/2021)
November 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-16664423.). Filed byOrlando Garcia. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 11/29/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Nguyen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orlando Garcia
Represented By: Amanda Lockhart Seabock
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Represented By: Prathima Reddy Price
Represented By: Josie Sue Zimmermann
Represented By: Zachary Manning Best
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenny Ha Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth A. Flood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?