Hill v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Mary G Hill and Mary G. Hill
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 5:2021cv09979
Filed: December 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Referring Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2022 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AFTER REASSIGNMENT. Case Management Conference set for 5/19/2022 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 5/12/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2022
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 2/9/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2022)
February 9, 2022 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (amk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2022)
February 9, 2022 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America.. (Ingram, Grant) (Filed on 2/9/2022)
January 26, 2022 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant(s) shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 2/9/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2022)
January 26, 2022 Filing 7 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint Stipulation To Extend Time To Respond To Plaintiff's Complaint By Not More Than 30 Days [L.R. 6-1] filed by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (Ingram, Grant) (Filed on 1/26/2022)
December 30, 2021 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mary G. Hill.. (Shaffman, Scott) (Filed on 12/30/2021)
December 27, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2021)
December 27, 2021 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/22/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/29/2022 01:30 PM. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2021)
December 27, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/10/2022. (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2021)
December 23, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Shaffman, Scott) (Filed on 12/23/2021)
December 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNUM Life Insurance Company of America ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-16749807.). Filed byMary G Hill. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shaffman, Scott) (Filed on 12/23/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary G Hill
Represented By: Scott E. Shaffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary G. Hill
Represented By: Scott E. Shaffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Grant Edward Ingram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?