Daniher v. Pixar Animation Studios et al
Plaintiff: Sweet Cicely Daniher
Defendant: Pixar Animation Studios, Pixar Talking Pictures, Walt Disney Motion Pictures Group, Inc and Kori Rae
Case Number: 5:2022cv00372
Filed: January 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Referring Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Deadline to File an Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand due by 3/24/2022. Plaintiff's Deadline to File Reply in Support of Motion to Remand due by 4/14/2022. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2022)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING #23 STIPULATION TO SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/25/2022. (blflc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2022)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Stipulation to Set Briefing Schedule on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand pursuant to local civil rule 6-2 filed by Pixar Animation Studios, Pixar Talking Pictures, Kori Rae, Walt Disney Motion Pictures Group, Inc and Sweet Cicely Daniher. (Gordon, Joshua) (Filed on 2/25/2022) Modified on 2/28/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING MOTION HEARING as to #21 MOTION to Remand . Motion Hearing set for 5/12/2022 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2022)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION to Remand filed by Sweet Cicely Daniher. Motion Hearing set for 7/28/2022 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 3/3/2022. Replies due by 3/10/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - State Court Complaint with exhibits, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Time Stamped federal copyright lawsuit, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - 2020.3.16 correspondence from Marenberg, #4 Exhibit Ex. D - Rule 41 voluntary dismissal time stamped, #5 Exhibit Ex. E - 2020.3.21 letter requesting cancellation of registration)(Corcoran, J. Conor) (Filed on 2/17/2022)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AFTER REASSIGNMENT. Case Management Statement due by 5/5/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/12/2022 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2022)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING #18 STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS' TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/7/2022. (blflc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2022)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Second STIPULATION to Extend Defendants' Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Pixar Animation Studios, Pixar Talking Pictures, Kori Rae, Walt Disney Motion Pictures Group, Inc. and Sweet Cicely Daniher (Gordon, Joshua) (Filed on 2/4/2022) Modified on 2/7/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF).
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING #11 STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS' TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/4/2022. (blflc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2022)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. J Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 2/3/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2022)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2022)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Pixar Animation Studios, Pixar Talking Pictures, Kori Rae, Walt Disney Motion Pictures Group, Inc.. (Gordon, Joshua) (Filed on 2/2/2022)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of J. Conor Corcoran. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 1/28/2022. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2022)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice graciously unopposed by defense counsel ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-16850611.) filed by Sweet Cicely Daniher. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - 2021.10.27 Certificate of Good Standing)(Corcoran, J. Conor) (Filed on 1/28/2022)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation to Extend Defendants' Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Pixar Animation Studios, Pixar Talking Pictures, Kori Rae, Walt Disney Motion Pictures Group, Inc. (Gordon, Joshua) (Filed on 1/24/2022)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Alyssa Katherine Tapper on behalf of Defendants (Tapper, Alyssa) (Filed on 1/24/2022)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant(s) shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 2/7/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2022)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Benjamin Gordon on behalf of Defendants (Gordon, Joshua) (Filed on 1/21/2022)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/12/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/19/2022 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2022)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/3/2022. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2022)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Pixar Animation Studios, Pixar Talking Pictures, Kori Rae, Walt Disney Motion Pictures Group, Inc (Marenberg, Steven) (Filed on 1/19/2022)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Kori Rae (Marenberg, Steven) (Filed on 1/19/2022)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Walt Disney Motion Pictures Group, Inc and Certification of Interested Parties (Marenberg, Steven) (Filed on 1/19/2022)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Pixar Animation Studios, Pixar Talking Pictures and Certification of Interested Parties (Marenberg, Steven) (Filed on 1/19/2022)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the State of California. Their case number is 21CV002627. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ACANDC-16819514). Filed byWalt Disney Motion Pictures Group, Inc, Pixar Talking Pictures, Pixar Animation Studios, Kori Rae. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Josh B. Gordon, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Josh B. Gordon, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Josh B. Gordon, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Josh B. Gordon, #5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Josh B. Gordon, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Marenberg, Steven) (Filed on 1/19/2022)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daniher v. Pixar Animation Studios et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sweet Cicely Daniher
Represented By: J. Conor Corcoran
Represented By: Jared Matthew Weinstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pixar Animation Studios
Represented By: Steven Arthur Marenberg
Represented By: Alyssa Katherine Tapper
Represented By: Joshua Benjamin Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pixar Talking Pictures
Represented By: Steven Arthur Marenberg
Represented By: Alyssa Katherine Tapper
Represented By: Joshua Benjamin Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walt Disney Motion Pictures Group, Inc
Represented By: Steven Arthur Marenberg
Represented By: Alyssa Katherine Tapper
Represented By: Joshua Benjamin Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kori Rae
Represented By: Steven Arthur Marenberg
Represented By: Alyssa Katherine Tapper
Represented By: Joshua Benjamin Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?