Malberg v. Cashen et al
Plaintiff: Martin Malberg
Defendant: Robert Cashen, Christine Guerra, Temo Gonzalez and Allison Dundas
Case Number: 5:2022cv01788
Filed: March 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Referring Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #14 PLAINTIFF MARTIN MALBERG'S MOTION FOR PERMISSION FOR ELECTRONIC CASE FILING. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/19/2022. (blflc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
May 19, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing filed by Martin Malberg. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2022)
May 19, 2022 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Martin Malberg re #12 Opposition/Response to Motion (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2022)
May 16, 2022 Filing 12 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint ) filed byMartin Malberg. (msr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2022)
May 4, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Robert Cashen, Allison Dundas, Christine Guerra. Motion Hearing set for 8/11/2022 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 5/18/2022. Replies due by 5/25/2022. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO Defendants Motion to Dismiss Complaint, #2 Supplement Request for Judicial Notice ISO Defendants Motion to Dismiss Complaint, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendants Motion to Dismiss Complaint)(Girarde, John) (Filed on 5/4/2022)
March 31, 2022 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Temo Gonzalez. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2022)
March 30, 2022 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Christine Guerra. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2022)
March 30, 2022 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Allison Dundas. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2022)
March 30, 2022 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Robert Cashen. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2022) Modified on 3/31/2022 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 30, 2022 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AFTER REASSIGNMENT. Case Management Statement due by 7/14/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/21/2022 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. otice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 3/28/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
March 25, 2022 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
March 25, 2022 Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Martin Malberg.. (msr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2022)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/14/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/21/2022 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor.. Signed by Judge Van Keulen on 3/21/2022. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
March 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee paid $ 402.Receipt # 54611018808). Filed by Martin Malberg. Consent/Declination due by 4/4/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2022)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malberg v. Cashen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Malberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Cashen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Temo Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allison Dundas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?