Oliveira v. Language Line Services, Inc.
Defendant: Sharon Oliveira and Language Line Services, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2022cv02410
Filed: April 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Referring Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2022 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sharon Oliveira of re #3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, #1 Complaint, #5 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge, 2 Case Assigned by Intake, #4 Summons Issued, #7 Order Reassigning Case (Karnikian, Shant) (Filed on 5/11/2022)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 4/29/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2022)
April 28, 2022 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned.This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (amk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2022)
April 28, 2022 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sharon Oliveira.. (Karnikian, Shant) (Filed on 4/28/2022)
April 19, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Language Line Services, Inc.. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2022)
April 19, 2022 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/12/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/19/2022 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2022)
April 19, 2022 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/3/2022. (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2022)
April 18, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Language Line Services, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17097217). Filed by Sharon Oliveira. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Karnikian, Shant) (Filed on 4/18/2022)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oliveira v. Language Line Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Oliveira
Represented By: Shant Arthur Karnikian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Language Line Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?