LoganTree, LP v. Apple, Inc.
Plaintiff: LoganTree LP
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2022cv02892
Filed: May 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2022 Filing 41 CLERK'S NOTICE ADVANCING Initial Case Management Conference to 6/8/2022, at 10:00 AM by telephone. Case Management Statement due by 6/1/2022. All parties are requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 6/1/2022. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2022)
May 16, 2022 Filing 40 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/10/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/17/2022 at 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2022)
May 16, 2022 Filing 39 Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 6:21-cv-00397. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING #23 Motion to Transfer Case; GRANTING #24 Motion to Transfer Case to NDCA. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (sm3)
May 3, 2022 Text Order DENYING #26 Motion to Strike and in the alternative, Motion for Leave to File a Surreply. The Court DENIES the Motion to Strike on two grounds. First, LoganTree failed to confer with Apple in an attempt to resolve this dispute before filing its Motion, and also failed to include a certification to that effect as required by W.D. Tex. Loc. R. CV-7(g). Second, the Court will not punish Apple for following: the timeline identified in the Court's June 8, 2021 Amended Standing Order Regarding Venue and Jurisdictional Discovery Limits for Patent Cases; and the page limits for "other motions" provided for in W.D. Tex. Loc. R. CV-7(e)(3), given that it filed its #25 Reply prior to the issuance of OGP 3.5. The Court DENIES LoganTree's alternative Motion for Leave because its proposed surreply does more than simply address Apple's arguments and evidence LoganTree alleges to be "new." It, by and large, treads a path already cut by its #24 Opposition and otherwise introduces a new declaration to "correct any evidentiary [shortcomings] to appease Apple's arguments." This does not justify the entry of LoganTree's proposed surreply. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (RRlc)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Standing Order Regarding Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright.
March 10, 2022 Parties shall comply with Judge Albright's updated #standing orders and # COVID-19 standing order available by clicking the included hyperlinks. The updated orders are as follows:1. #Standing Order Regarding Notice of Readiness for Patent Cases 030722,2. #Standing Order on Pretrial Procedures and Requirements in Civil Cases 030722,3. #Standing Order Governing Proceedings 4.0 - Patent Cases 030722,4. #Amended Standing Order Regarding Coronavirus (COVID-19) and Court Proceedings,5. #Amended Standing Order Regarding Joint Or Unopposed Request To Change Deadlines 030722,6. #Amended Standing Order Regarding Filing Documents Under Seal and Redacted Public Versions 030722. (jkda)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Markman Hearing set for 6/10/2022 09:00 AM before Judge Alan D Albright. Joinder of Parties due by 7/20/2022. Amended Pleadings due by 9/30/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 4/14/2023. Pretrial Conference set for 7/19/2023 before Judge Alan D Albright. Jury Selection set for 7/10/2023 before Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Jury Trial set for 7/10/2023 before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jc5)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER, (Markman Hearing set for 3/4/2022 09:00 AM before Judge Alan D Albright). Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bot2)
February 4, 2022 Filing 34 Joint MOTION for Entry of Scheduling Order Deadlines JOINT MOTION TO ENTER AN AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER by LoganTree, LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shokouhi, Arnold)
January 14, 2022 Filing 33 RESPONSE Defendant Apple Inc.'s Reply to Plaintiff LoganTree LP's Responsive Claim Construction Brief by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Mark Schafer in Support of Defendant Apple Inc.'s Reply to Plaintiff LoganTree LP's Responsive Claim Construction Brief, #2 Exhibit U, #3 Exhibit V, #4 Exhibit W, #5 Exhibit X, #6 Exhibit Y)(Ravel, J.)
December 23, 2021 Filing 32 RESPONSE in Support, filed by LoganTree, LP, re #26 MOTION to Strike #25 Reply to Response to Motion,, PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS LATE-FILED REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE AND IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE PLAINTIFFS SURREPLY IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOT filed by Plaintiff LoganTree, LP (Shokouhi, Arnold)
December 20, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue to NDCA by Apple, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ravel, J.)
December 17, 2021 Filing 30 BRIEF Plaintiff's Responsive Claim Construction Brief by LoganTree, LP. (Shokouhi, Arnold)
November 19, 2021 Filing 29 Opening Claim Construction Brief by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Mark D. Schafer Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T)(Ravel, J.)
October 15, 2021 Filing 28 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Apple, Inc., re #26 MOTION to Strike #25 Reply to Response to Motion,, PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS LATE-FILED REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE AND IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE PLAINTIFFS SURREPLY IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOT filed by Plaintiff LoganTree, LP and in the Alternative Motion for Leave to File a Surreply (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Ravel, J.)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Standing Order Regarding Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright.
October 8, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION to Strike #25 Reply to Response to Motion,, PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS LATE-FILED REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE AND IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE PLAINTIFFS SURREPLY IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE by LoganTree, LP. (Attachments: #1 SURREPLY, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Proposed Order)(Shokouhi, Arnold)
October 1, 2021 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Apple, Inc., re #24 Opposed MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of California filed by Plaintiff LoganTree, LP Apple Inc.s Reply in Support of its Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Mark Rollins, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Ryan Schletzbaum, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G)(Ravel, J.)
September 17, 2021 Filing 24 Opposed MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of California by LoganTree, LP. (Shokouhi, Arnold)
September 3, 2021 Filing 23 Opposed MOTION to Transfer Case Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Mark Rollins, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Ryan Schletzbaum, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Proposed Order)(Ravel, J.)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER: Markman Hearing set for 3/4/2022 09:00 AM before Judge Alan D Albright. Joinder of Parties due by 4/15/2022. Amended Pleadings due by 6/24/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 1/6/2023. Pretrial Conference set for 3/10/2023 before Judge Alan D Albright. Jury Selection set for 3/31/2023 before Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Jury Trial set for 3/31/2023 AM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jc5)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER: Markman Hearing set for 3/4/2022 09:00 AM before Judge Alan D Albright. Joinder of Parties due by 4/15/2022. Amended Pleadings due by 6/24/2022. Motions due by 1/6/2023. Pretrial Conference set for 3/10/2023 before Judge Alan D Albright. Jury Selection set for 3/31/2023 before Judge Alan D Albright. Jury Trial set for 3/31/2023 before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jc5)
August 6, 2021 Filing 20 Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order Joint Motion to Enter Scheduling Order by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ravel, J.)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (re)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Christopher Michael Barkley for LoganTree. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jc5)
July 26, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by J. Stephen Ravel on behalf of Maxwell C. McGraw ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15050739) by on behalf of Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ravel, J.)
July 22, 2021 Filing 18 ANSWER to #10 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL ANSWER TO DEFENDANT APPLE, INCS COUNTERCLAIMS by LoganTree, LP.(Shokouhi, Arnold)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ryan Schletzbaum for Apple, Inc. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Lauren Douville for Apple, Inc. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney B. Trent Webb for Apple, Inc. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mark D. Schafer for Apple, Inc. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6)
July 15, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Arnold Shokouhi MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15017756) by on behalf of LoganTree, LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shokouhi, Arnold)
July 9, 2021 Filing 16 STATUS REPORT CASE READINESS STATUS REPORT by LoganTree, LP. (Shokouhi, Arnold)
July 2, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by J. Stephen Ravel on behalf of Mark D. Schafer ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14979661) by on behalf of Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ravel, J.)
July 2, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by J. Stephen Ravel on behalf of Lauren Douville ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14979650) by on behalf of Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ravel, J.)
July 2, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by J. Stephen Ravel on behalf of Ryan J. Schletzbaum ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14979637) by on behalf of Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ravel, J.)
July 2, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by J. Stephen Ravel on behalf of B. Trent Webb ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14979478) by on behalf of Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ravel, J.)
July 2, 2021 Filing 11 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Apple, Inc.. (Ravel, J.)
July 2, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand Answer, Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM against LoganTree, LP by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Ravel, J.)
July 2, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J. Stephen Ravel on behalf of Apple, Inc. Pro Hac Vice will be added once an Order on motion is granted. (Ravel, J.)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Standing Order regarding Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright.
May 18, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Apple, Inc. answer due 7/2/2021. (mc5)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. It is therefore ORDERED that Defendant Apple, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion is GRANTED, and Defendant's deadline to file a response to Plaintiff's Original Complaint is hereby extended through and including July 2, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (re)
May 11, 2021 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ravel, J.)
May 11, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J. Stephen Ravel on behalf of Apple, Inc.. Attorney J. Stephen Ravel added to party Apple, Inc.(pty:dft) (Ravel, J.)
April 27, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LoganTree, LP. Apple, Inc. served on 4/27/2021, answer due 5/18/2021. (Shokouhi, Arnold)
April 23, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Apple, Inc.. (lad)
April 23, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Shokouhi, Arnold)
April 23, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by LoganTree, LP. (Shokouhi, Arnold) (Main Document 2 replaced on 4/23/2021) (lad).
April 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14731841), filed by LoganTree, LP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 AO 120)(Shokouhi, Arnold) (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/23/2021) (lad).
April 23, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad)
April 23, 2021 All parties shall comply with the Standing Orders of Judge Alan D. Albright located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LoganTree, LP v. Apple, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LoganTree LP
Represented By: Christopher Michael Barkley
Represented By: James Eamonn Sherry
Represented By: Arnold Shokouhi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Represented By: B. Trent Webb
Represented By: J Stephen Ravel
Represented By: Lauren Douville
Represented By: Mark D. Schafer
Represented By: Ryan Schletzbaum
Represented By: Kelly Ransom
Represented By: Maxwell C. McGraw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?