Huang v. Small Business Administration et al
Plaintiff: Jingli Huang
Defendant: Small Business Administration, Janet Yellen, United States of America and Isabel Guzman
Case Number: 5:2022cv03363
Filed: June 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SCREENING #14 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1915. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/4/2022. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DENYING #15 SECOND MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by Judge Beth Labson Freeman. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Second MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Jingli Huang. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit)(Huang, Jingli) (Filed on 7/28/2022)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed byJingli Huang. (Huang, Jingli) (Filed on 7/20/2022)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DENYING #12 MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by Judge Beth Labson Freeman. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and or Permanent Injunction filed by Jingli Huang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2_"Q to X")(Huang, Jingli) (Filed on 7/1/2022) Modified on 7/1/2022 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #2 MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS; DENYING #3 MOTION TO APPOINT COUNSEL; SCREENING #1 COMPLAINT UNDER 28 USC 1915 by Judge Beth Labson Freeman. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AFTER REASSIGNMENT. Case Management Statement due by 9/29/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/6/2022 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on Clerk on 6/24/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2022)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jingli Huang.. (Huang, Jingli) (Filed on 6/24/2022)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING PLAINTIFF to Pro Se Help Desk. Re: ECF #3 Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 6/21/2022. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Declination form)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE RE: Consent or Declination. Plaintiff is requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 6/24/2022. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/31/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/7/2022 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Jingli Huang. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2022)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jingli Huang. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2022)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Small Business Administration, United States of America, Janet Yellen. Filed byJingli Huang. Consent/Declination due by 6/22/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2022)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huang v. Small Business Administration et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jingli Huang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Small Business Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Yellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isabel Guzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?