Velodyne Lidar USA, Inc. v. Ouster, Inc.
Plaintiff: Velodyne Lidar USA, Inc.
Defendant: Ouster, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2022cv03490
Filed: June 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Referring Judge: Susan van Keulen
2 Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING #18 UNOPPOSED MOTION TO STAY PENDING RESOLUTION OF PROCEEDINGS AT THE INTERNATIONAL TRADE COMMISSION ***AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT*** by Judge Beth Labson Freeman. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2022) Modified on 8/4/2022 (blflc2, COURT STAFF).
August 4, 2022 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Pursuant to 28 U.S.C 1659, Pending Resolution of Proceedings at the International Trade Commission filed by Ouster, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/1/2022 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 8/18/2022. Replies due by 8/25/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Brigham, Matthew) (Filed on 8/4/2022) Modified on 8/4/2022 (slh, COURT STAFF).
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Related Case Order: 16-cv-5251-EJD is not related to 22-cv-3490-BLF. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/12/2022. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2022)
June 29, 2022 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AFTER REASSIGNMENT. Case Management Statement due by 10/6/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/13/2022 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2022)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REGARDING #14 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND #10 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/28/2022. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2022)
June 28, 2022 Filing 14 STIPULATION Extending Time For Ouster Inc. To Respond To Complaint filed by Velodyne Lidar USA, Inc.. (Levitan, Steven) (Filed on 6/28/2022)
June 27, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Change of Address by Steven Mark Levitan (Levitan, Steven) (Filed on 6/27/2022)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by The Clerk on 06/27/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jrs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2022)
June 24, 2022 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2022)
June 24, 2022 #Electronic filing error re: #10 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed by Velodyne Lidar USA, Inc. Document filed in wrong case. [err401] Please re-file in its entirety in the earlier case 5:16-cv-05251-EJD. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2022)
June 23, 2022 Filing 10 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed by Velodyne Lidar USA, Inc.. Responses due by 6/27/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mammen, Christian) (Filed on 6/23/2022)
June 23, 2022 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Velodyne Lidar USA, Inc... (Mammen, Christian) (Filed on 6/23/2022)
June 17, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Velodyne Lidar USA, Inc.. Ouster, Inc. served on 6/16/2022, answer due 7/7/2022. (Mammen, Christian) (Filed on 6/17/2022)
June 14, 2022 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/14/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/21/2022 at 1:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2022)
June 14, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Ouster, Inc.. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2022)
June 14, 2022 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/28/2022. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2022)
June 14, 2022 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND L.R. 3-15 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS filed by Velodyne Lidar USA, Inc. (Levitan, Steven) (Filed on 6/14/2022)
June 14, 2022 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Patents. (cc: form mailed to register). (Levitan, Steven) (Filed on 6/14/2022)
June 14, 2022 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Levitan, Steven) (Filed on 6/14/2022)
June 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR 1. PATENT INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NO. 7,969,558; AND 2. PATENT INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NO. 9,983,297; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Ouster, Inc., (Filing Fee: $402.00, receipt number ACANDC-17262042). Filed by Velodyne Lidar USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Levitan, Steven) (Filed on 6/14/2022) Modified on 6/14/2022 (tn, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Velodyne Lidar USA, Inc. v. Ouster, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Velodyne Lidar USA, Inc.
Represented By: Steven Mark Levitan
Represented By: Carrie J. Richey
Represented By: Christian Emile Mammen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ouster, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew J. Brigham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?