Forrest v. Facebook, Inc.
Plaintiff: Dr. Andrew Forrest
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2022cv03699
Filed: June 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward J Davila
Referring Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2023 Filing 72 NOTICE by Facebook, Inc. of Withdrawal by Counsel (Smith, Mark) (Filed on 3/17/2023)
February 22, 2023 Filing 71 EXHIBITS re #69 Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 [Redacted Exhibits to J. Heath Decl. Dkt. 48-1] filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C_Redacted, #2 Exhibit D_Redacted, #3 Exhibit F_Redacted)(Related document(s) #69 ) (Heath, Jacob) (Filed on 2/22/2023)
February 17, 2023 Filing 70 REPLY (re #48 MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Resolution of Plaintiff's Criminal Proceeding ) filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Heath, Jacob) (Filed on 2/17/2023)
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER Granting #68 Administrative Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Documents. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/15/2023. (ejdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2023)
February 9, 2023 Filing 68 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO REMOVE INCORRECTLY FILED DOCUMENTS filed by Facebook, Inc.. Responses due by 2/13/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jacob M. Heath, #2 Proposed Order)(Heath, Jacob) (Filed on 2/9/2023)
February 3, 2023 Filing 67 Request for Judicial Notice re #66 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byAndrew Forrest. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Criminal Code Act 1995 (Cth), #2 Exhibit B - Crimes Act 1914 (Cth), #3 Exhibit C - Taylor v Attorney-General for the Commonwealth (2019) 268 CLR 224, #4 Exhibit D - Judiciary Act 1903 (Cth), #5 Exhibit E - Evidence Act 1995 (Cth), #6 Exhibit F - Director of Public Prosecutions Act 1983 (Cth), #7 Exhibit G - Environmental Protection Authority v Caltex Refining Co Pty Limited (1993) 178 CLR 477)(Related document(s) #66 ) (Brueckner, Leslie) (Filed on 2/3/2023)
February 3, 2023 Filing 66 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #48 MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Resolution of Plaintiff's Criminal Proceeding ) filed byAndrew Forrest. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek G. Howard, #2 Exhibit 1 - Memorandum of Advice of Darren Renton, #3 Exhibit 2 - Letter from Attorney General, #4 Appendix of Authorities)(Brueckner, Leslie) (Filed on 2/3/2023)
January 23, 2023 Filing 65 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING HEARING. PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that the 3/9/2023 Case Management Conference has been VACATED - NO APPEARANCE NECESSARY. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (crr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2023)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 64 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. (vkdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2023)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Granting #62 Stipulation and Joint Request to Extend Time to Respond to Facebook's Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/19/2023. (ejdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2023)
January 19, 2023 Filing 62 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #48 MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Resolution of Plaintiff's Criminal Proceeding filed by Andrew Forrest. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek G. Howard)(Brueckner, Leslie) (Filed on 1/19/2023)
January 19, 2023 Reset Deadlines as to #48 MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Resolution of Plaintiff's Criminal Proceeding. Opposition due by 2/3/2023. Reply due by 2/17/2023. (crr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2023)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER by Judge Edward J. Davila Granting in Part and Denying in Part #53 Administrative Motion for Stay of Discovery Orders Pending Review. (ejdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2023)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Granting #58 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Benjamin Hogan. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/18/2023. (crr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2023)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER Granting #57 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Katherine Charonko. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/18/2023. (crr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2023)
January 18, 2023 Filing 58 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Benjamin Hogan ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17907205.) filed by Andrew Forrest. (Hogan, Benjamin) (Filed on 1/18/2023)
January 18, 2023 Filing 57 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Katherine Charonko ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17907166.) filed by Andrew Forrest. (Charonko, Katherine) (Filed on 1/18/2023)
January 13, 2023 Filing 56 MOTION Motion For Relief From Nondispositive Pretrial Order Of Magistrate Judge re #43 Order on Discovery Letter Brief filed by Facebook, Inc.. Responses due by 1/27/2023. Replies due by 2/3/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Jacob M. Heath In Support Of Defendant Facebook, Inc.s Motion For Relief From Nondispositive Pretrial Order Of Magistrate Judge, #2 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Facebook, Inc.s Motion For Relief From Nondispositive Pretrial Order Of Magistrate Judge)(Heath, Jacob) (Filed on 1/13/2023)
January 13, 2023 Filing 55 MOTION Motion For Relief From Nondispositive Pretrial Order Of Magistrate Judge re #42 Order on Discovery Letter Brief filed by Facebook, Inc.. Responses due by 1/27/2023. Replies due by 2/3/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Jacob M. Heath In Support Of Defendant Facebook, Inc.s Motion For Relief From Nondispositive Pretrial Order Of Magistrate Judge, #2 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Facebook, Inc.s Motion For Relief From Nondispositive Pretrial Order Of Magistrate Judge)(Heath, Jacob) (Filed on 1/13/2023)
January 13, 2023 Filing 54 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING HEARING. PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that the hearing on #13 Motion to Dismiss and #17 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint set for 2/2/2023 has been VACATED, and a Status Conference is set for 7/20/2023 at 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. A Joint Status Report is due by 7/7/2023. #50 Motion to Continue 2/2/2023 Hearing and #51 Motion to Shorten Time are Terminated as MOOT. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(crr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2023)
January 11, 2023 Filing 53 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Stay of Discovery Orders Pending Review and For an Admin. Stay Pending Decision on Motion To Stay filed by Facebook, Inc. Responses due by 1/17/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Jacob Heath Decl. ISO Facebooks Admin. Motion for Stay of Discovery Orders Pending Review and For an Admin. Stay Pending Decision on Motion To Stay, #2 Proposed Order)(Heath, Jacob) (Filed on 1/11/2023) Modified on 1/12/2023 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
January 11, 2023 Filing 52 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Andrew Forrest. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redlined Protective Order, #2 Exhibit Clean Protective Order)(Brueckner, Leslie) (Filed on 1/11/2023)
January 9, 2023 Filing 51 MOTION to Shorten Time to Brief and Hear Plaintiff's Motion to Continue the February 2, 2023 Hearing filed by Andrew Forrest. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Leslie A. Brueckner, #2 Proposed Order)(Howard, Derek) (Filed on 1/9/2023)
January 9, 2023 Filing 50 MOTION to Continue February 2, 2023 Hearing on Motions to Dismiss and to Amend the Complaint Until After the Supreme Court Issues a Decision in Gonzalez v. Google LLC filed by Andrew Forrest. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Howard, Derek) (Filed on 1/9/2023)
January 6, 2023 Filing 49 Request for Judicial Notice re #48 MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Resolution of Plaintiff's Criminal Proceeding filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit B to Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit C to Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Exhibit D to Request for Judicial Notice, #5 Exhibit E to Request for Judicial Notice, #6 Exhibit F to Request for Judicial Notice)(Related document(s) #48 ) (Heath, Jacob) (Filed on 1/6/2023)
January 6, 2023 Filing 48 MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Resolution of Plaintiff's Criminal Proceeding filed by Facebook, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/23/2023 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 1/20/2023. Replies due by 1/27/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Jacob M. Heath Declaration ISO Facebook's Motion to Stay, #2 Exhibit A to Heath Decl ISO Motion to Stay, #3 Exhibit B to Heath Decl ISO Motion to Stay, #4 Exhibit C to Heath Decl ISO Motion to Stay, #5 Exhibit D to Heath Decl ISO Motion to Stay, #6 Exhibit E to Heath Decl ISO Motion to Stay, #7 Exhibit F to Heath Decl ISO Motion to Stay, #8 Exhibit G to Heath Decl ISO Motion to Stay, #9 Exhibit H to Heath Decl ISO Motion to Stay, #10 Exhibit I to Heath Decl ISO Motion to Stay, #11 Exhibit J to Heath Decl ISO Motion to Stay, #12 Proposed Order)(Heath, Jacob) (Filed on 1/6/2023)
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Granting #45 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Elizabeth Ryan. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/5/2023. (crr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2023)
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Granting #44 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to John Roddy. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/5/2023. (crr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2023)
January 4, 2023 Filing 45 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Elizabeth Ryan ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17870116.) filed by Andrew Forrest. (Ryan, Elizabeth) (Filed on 1/4/2023)
January 4, 2023 Filing 44 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - John Roddy ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17870047.) filed by Andrew Forrest. (Roddy, John) (Filed on 1/4/2023)
January 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi re #41 December 19, 2022 Discovery Dispute re Protective Order. (vkdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2023)
January 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi re #39 December 13, 2022 Discovery Dispute. (vkdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2023)
December 19, 2022 Filing 41 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Andrew Forrest. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Redlined Protective Order, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Protective Order, #3 Exhibit Defendant's Draft Protective Order, #4 Exhibit Defendant's Redlined Draft Protective Order)(Brueckner, Leslie) (Filed on 12/19/2022)
December 14, 2022 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Corcoran Smith (Smith, Mark) (Filed on 12/14/2022)
December 13, 2022 Filing 39 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Andrew Forrest. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Facebook Initial Disclosures)(Brueckner, Leslie) (Filed on 12/13/2022)
December 13, 2022 Filing 38 CLERK'S NOTICE. Dkt. No. #37 is missing "Exhibit A", referenced on page 2 of the Joint Discovery Letter Brief. The Court asks the parties to re-file the Letter Brief with the missing exhibit included. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vkdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2022)
December 12, 2022 Filing 37 Discovery Letter BriefRe Rule 26(a) Disclosures filed by Andrew Forrest. (Brueckner, Leslie) (Filed on 12/12/2022)
November 3, 2022 #Electronic filing error. Per Order, attorney Leslie Agnes Brueckner has been entered on the docket. However, attorney Leslie Agnes Brueckner needs to update the profile as th e docket shows that she is with 'Public Justice' at 475 14th Street, Suite 610, Oakland, CA 94612. Attorney is reminded to update the ECF account if there's any change of firm name or address. Re: #36 Order authorizing substitution of counsel. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2022).
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER authorizing substitution of counsel. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/2/2022. (ejdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2022)
October 26, 2022 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley Romero (Romero, Ashley) (Filed on 10/26/2022)
October 26, 2022 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek G. Howard (Howard, Derek) (Filed on 10/26/2022)
October 24, 2022 Filing 33 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel ; [PROPOSED] Order by Arthur H. Bryant (Bryant, Arthur) (Filed on 10/24/2022) Modified on 10/24/2022 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 14, 2022 Filing 32 REPLY (re #13 MOTION to Dismiss CORRECTION OF DOCKET #11 ) -CORRECTION OF DOCKET #31 filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Heath, Jacob) (Filed on 10/14/2022)
October 14, 2022 Filing 31 REPLY (re #13 MOTION to Dismiss CORRECTION OF DOCKET #11 ) filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Heath, Jacob) (Filed on 10/14/2022)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Order Granting #29 Stipulation to reset Briefing Deadline. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/12/2022. (ejdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2022)
October 12, 2022 Filing 29 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO RESET FB REPLY DEADLINE filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jacob M. Heath in Support of Stipulation)(Heath, Jacob) (Filed on 10/12/2022)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Order approving stipulation #27 and resetting initial cmc to Thursday, March 9, 2023 at 10:00 a.m. The parties' joint statement is due Feb. 27, 2023. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/19/2022. (ejdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2022)
September 19, 2022 Filing 27 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 10 Clerk's Notice,, Stipulation and Joint Request to Continue Initial Case Management Conference filed by Andrew Forrest. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian E. Klein)(Klein, Brian) (Filed on 9/19/2022)
September 15, 2022 Filing 26 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Heath, Jacob) (Filed on 9/15/2022)
September 15, 2022 Filing 25 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Klein, Brian) (Filed on 9/15/2022)
September 7, 2022 Filing 24 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #13 MOTION to Dismiss CORRECTION OF DOCKET #11 ) PLAINTIFF DR. ANDREW FORRESTS OPPOSITION TO FACEBOOKS MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed byAndrew Forrest. (Klein, Brian) (Filed on 9/7/2022)
August 22, 2022 Filing 23 REPLY (re #17 MOTION for Leave to File MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT ) REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF DR. ANDREW FORRESTS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND filed byAndrew Forrest. (Klein, Brian) (Filed on 8/22/2022)
August 17, 2022 Reset Hearing per #21 Order: Hearings as to #17 Motion for Leave to Amend Second Amended Complaint, and #13 Motion to Dismiss set for 1/19/2023 are Continued to 2/2/2023 at 9:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. (crr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2022)
August 12, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss CORRECTION OF DOCKET #11 . Responses due by 9/7/2022. Replies due by 10/12/2022. Motion Hearing set for 1/19/2023 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. (crr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2022)
August 12, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #17 MOTION for Leave to File MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Replies due by 8/22/2022. Motion Hearing set for 1/19/2023 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. (crr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2022)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting #14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Abigail Colella. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/11/2022. (crr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2022)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order Granting #20 Stipulation and Joint Request to Reset Briefing Deadlines and Hearing Dates. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/11/2022. (ejdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2022)
August 11, 2022 Filing 20 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO RESET BRIEFING DEADLINES AND HEARING DATES filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jacob M. Heath ISO of Stipulation and Joint Request to Reset Deadlines)(Heath, Jacob) (Filed on 8/11/2022)
August 9, 2022 Filing 19 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #17 MOTION for Leave to File MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT ) filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Heath, Jacob) (Filed on 8/9/2022)
July 25, 2022 Filing 18 Request for Judicial Notice re #17 MOTION for Leave to File MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed byAndrew Forrest. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #17 ) (Klein, Brian) (Filed on 7/25/2022)
July 25, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to File MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Andrew Forrest. (Attachments: #1 DECLARATION OF JOSE R. NUO IN SUPPORT OF DR. ANDREW FORRESTS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, #2 Proposed Order)(Klein, Brian) (Filed on 7/25/2022)
July 25, 2022 Filing 16 Certificate of Interested Entities by Andrew Forrest (Klein, Brian) (Filed on 7/25/2022)
July 25, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Jose R. Nuno (Nuno, Jose) (Filed on 7/25/2022)
July 20, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number CCANDC-17368518.) filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Colella, Abigail) (Filed on 7/20/2022)
July 19, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss CORRECTION OF DOCKET #11 filed by Facebook, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/19/2023 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 8/17/2022. Replies due by 8/31/2022. (Heath, Jacob) (Filed on 7/19/2022)
July 19, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Sena Guerra (Guerra, Daniel) (Filed on 7/19/2022)
July 19, 2022 Reset Deadlines pursuant to #6 Order as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint. Opposition due by 8/17/2022. Reply due by 8/31/2022. (crr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2022)
July 18, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Facebook, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/29/2022 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 8/1/2022. Replies due by 8/8/2022. (Heath, Jacob) (Filed on 7/18/2022)
July 12, 2022 Set Hearing per 10 Clerk's Notice: Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/6/2022 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. (crr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2022)
July 1, 2022 Filing 10 CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/6/2022 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/26/2022. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (crr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2022)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 7/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2022)
June 30, 2022 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2022)
June 30, 2022 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Facebook, Inc... (Heath, Jacob) (Filed on 6/30/2022)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting #5 Stipulation and Joint Request to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint and Set Briefing Schedule. (vkdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2022)
June 29, 2022 Filing 5 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jacob M. Heath ISO of Stipulation and Joint Request to Extend Time, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Heath, Jacob) (Filed on 6/29/2022)
June 23, 2022 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/20/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/27/2022 01:30 PM. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2022)
June 23, 2022 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/7/2022. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2022)
June 23, 2022 Filing 2 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by FACEBOOK, INC., a Delaware corporation (Heath, Jacob) (Filed on 6/23/2022)
June 23, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Mateo County Superior Court. Their case number is 21-CIV-05055. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ACANDC-17289499). Filed byFACEBOOK, INC., a Delaware corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 * Second Amended Complaint attached - Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Heath, Jacob) (Filed on 6/23/2022) Modified on 6/23/2022 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
June 23, 2022 #Electronic filing error. Parties' names have been corrected. 'a Delaware corporation' should not be entered as part of the name. It should be entered in the 'party text' field. Similarly, 'Dr.' should not be part of plaintiff's first name. It should be entered in the 'Title' field. The County Code in the case opening screen has also been corrected to 'Outside US' and not San Mateo as it refers to plaintiff's county of residence. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Facebook, Inc. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2022)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Forrest v. Facebook, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Andrew Forrest
Represented By: Brian E. Klein
Represented By: Donald Ross Pepperman
Represented By: Jose R. Nuo
Represented By: Jose R. Nuno
Represented By: Derek G. Howard
Represented By: Ashley Romero
Represented By: Arthur H. Bryant
Represented By: Leslie Agnes Brueckner, Ms.
Represented By: John J Roddy
Represented By: Elizabeth Ryan
Represented By: Benjamin J Hogan
Represented By: Katherine E. Charonko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: Jacob Marcus Heath
Represented By: Abigail Colella
Represented By: Daniel Sena Guerra
Represented By: Mark Corcoran Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?