Rakofsky v. Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC
Plaintiff: Jospeh Rakofsky and Joseph Rakofsky
Defendant: Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, Mercedes-Benz of Monterey, Wienik Bleyenberg, Devon Thompson and Daimler Aktiengesellschaft
Case Number: 5:2022cv04427
Filed: July 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Edward J Davila
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2022 Filing 20 CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/3/2022 at 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/24/2022. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (crr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2022)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 9/20/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2022)
September 19, 2022 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2022)
September 1, 2022 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE RE: Consent or Declination. Plaintiffs and Defendant Daimler Atiengesellschaft are requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 9/15/2022. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2022)
August 16, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by David Robert Sidran Notice of Appearance of Thomas M. Crowell (Sidran, David) (Filed on 8/16/2022)
August 15, 2022 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE. The Order to Show Cause, Dkt. 7, is satisfied by the response, Dkt. #10 . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2022)
August 12, 2022 Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC.. (Tahsildoost, Soheyl) (Filed on 8/12/2022)
August 11, 2022 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement of Defendant Euromotors Monterey, Inc. dba Mercedes-Benz of Monterey, erroneously sued herein as Mercedes Benz of Monterey by Mercedes-Benz of Monterey. (Sidran, David) (Filed on 8/11/2022) Modified on 8/15/2022 (gba, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2022 Filing 12 ANSWER to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Tahsildoost, Soheyl) (Filed on 8/10/2022)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DENYING Defendant's Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Re: ECF #9 . Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2022)
August 8, 2022 Filing 10 Declaration of Soheyl Tahsildoost in Response to the Court's Order to Show Cause Why this Action Should not be Remanded by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Tahsildoost Declaration - Statement of Information, #2 Exhibit B to Tahsildoost Declaration - Form LLC-12, #3 Exhibit C to Tahsildoost Declaration - Declaration of Thomas M. Crowell) (Tahsildoost, Soheyl) (Filed on 8/8/2022) Modified on 8/9/2022 (gba, COURT STAFF).
August 5, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Soheyl Tahsildoost) (Tahsildoost, Soheyl) (Filed on 8/5/2022)
August 2, 2022 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Wienik Bleyenberg, Mercedes-Benz of Monterey, Devon Thompson.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Sidran, David) (Filed on 8/2/2022)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why case should not be remanded. Re: ECF #1 . MBUSA to show cause in writing by 8/8/2022. The Court also reminds all parties to consent or decline magistrate judge jurisdiction by 8/15/2022. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 8/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Declination form)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2022)
August 1, 2022 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/26/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/2/2022 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2022)
August 1, 2022 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, (Tahsildoost, Soheyl) (Filed on 8/1/2022)
August 1, 2022 Filing 4 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Notice of Removal, and have been added to this case: Mercedes-Benz of Monterey, Wienik Bleyenberg, Devon Thompson and Daimler Aktiengesellschaft. (This is a text-only entry.) (Tahsildoost, Soheyl) (Filed on 8/1/2022)
August 1, 2022 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/15/2022. (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2022)
July 29, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Daimler North America Corporation for Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Tahsildoost, Soheyl) (Filed on 7/29/2022)
July 29, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Action from Monterey County Superior Court. Their case number is 22CV000577. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number ACANDC-17398353). Filed by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Tahsildoost, Soheyl) (Filed on 7/29/2022) Modified on 8/1/2022 (gba, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rakofsky v. Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jospeh Rakofsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Rakofsky
Represented By: James D. Cuzzolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC
Represented By: Soheyl Tahsildoost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercedes-Benz of Monterey
Represented By: David Robert Sidran
Represented By: Thomas M. Crowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wienik Bleyenberg
Represented By: David Robert Sidran
Represented By: Thomas M. Crowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devon Thompson
Represented By: David Robert Sidran
Represented By: Thomas M. Crowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daimler Aktiengesellschaft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?