Pomogaibo v. United Airlines, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kateryna Pomogaibo
Defendant: United Airlines, Inc. and Alaska Airlines, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2022cv06278
Filed: October 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Tort/Non-Motor Vehicle
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2022 Filing 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Plaintiff Pomogaibo appeared for the remand hearing 11/30 and was informed that the hearing was taken off calendar because of the noticed settlement. Not recorded. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/30/2022)
November 2, 2022 Filing 19 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kateryna Pomogaibo. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2022)
October 31, 2022 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE RE: #13 . In light of the Notice of Settlement, parties are to file a dismissal or joint settlement status report by 12/30/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 31, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE by Alaska Airlines, Inc., United Airlines, Inc. re #16 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge re Proof of Service (Cutler, Michael) (Filed on 10/31/2022)
October 31, 2022 Filing 16 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Alaska Airlines, Inc., United Airlines, Inc... (Cutler, Michael) (Filed on 10/31/2022)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order terminating #10 Motion to Remand entered by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. This termination is without prejudice, in light of the noticed settlement. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 28, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE by Alaska Airlines, Inc., United Airlines, Inc. re #13 Notice (Other) re Proof of Service (Cutler, Michael) (Filed on 10/28/2022)
October 28, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE by Alaska Airlines, Inc., United Airlines, Inc. re Settlement (Cutler, Michael) (Filed on 10/28/2022)
October 26, 2022 Filing 12 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Please take notice Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, Dkt. #10 , is set for 11/30/2022, at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/nc General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in forma pauperis. Re: Dkt. No. #8 . Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 25, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand filed by Kateryna Pomogaibo. Responses due by 11/8/2022. Replies due by 11/15/2022. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2022)
October 25, 2022 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kateryna Pomogaibo. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2022)
October 25, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kateryna Pomogaibo. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2022)
October 24, 2022 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alaska Airlines, Inc., United Airlines, Inc. re #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, #5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, #3 Certificate of Interested Entities, #1 Notice of Removal, 4 Case Assigned by Intake,, (Lazenby, Richard) (Filed on 10/24/2022)
October 24, 2022 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE RE: Consent or Declination. All parties are requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 11/7/2022. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Part icipants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 21, 2022 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/11/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/18/2023 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 21, 2022 Answer to Removed Complaint (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2022)
October 20, 2022 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/3/2022. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2022)
October 20, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alaska Airlines, Inc., United Airlines, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent United Airlines Holdings, Inc. for United Airlines, Inc.; Corporate Parent Alaska Air Group, Inc. for Alaska Airlines, Inc.. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Lazenby, Richard) (Filed on 10/20/2022)
October 20, 2022 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Alaska Airlines, Inc., United Airlines, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent United Airlines Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Various underwriters in the aviation insurance market for United Airlines, Inc.; Corporate Parent Alaska Air Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Various underwriters in the aviation insurance market for Alaska Airlines, Inc.. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Lazenby, Richard) (Filed on 10/20/2022)
October 20, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Santa Clara Superior Court. Their case number is 22CV403288. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ACANDC-17647380). Filed byUnited Airlines, Inc., Alaska Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lazenby, Richard) (Filed on 10/20/2022)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pomogaibo v. United Airlines, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kateryna Pomogaibo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Anthony Lazenby
Represented By: Dana Zokaeim
Represented By: Michael Cutler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alaska Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Anthony Lazenby
Represented By: Dana Zokaeim
Represented By: Michael Cutler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?